Re-Steel Supply Company, Inc. v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Pamela K Chen |
Referred: | Robert M Levy |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-03056 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 24, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jul 01, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 21, 2024 4:23 AM EDT |
Defendant
Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Re-Steel Supply Company, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 83 minutes ago |
Monday, July 01, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Re-Steel Supply Company, Inc. (Chan, Henry) |
|
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 07/01 11:24 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: The10 Stipulation of Dismissal is So Ordered. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 7/1/2024. (FG) |
||
Wednesday, June 26, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Letter to Discontinue Without Prejudice by Re-Steel Supply Company, Inc. (Chan, Henry) |
|
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 06/26 1:43 PM
ORDER RE9 : Parties report case has settled. The initial conference scheduled for July 10, 2024 is cancelled. A stipulation of discontinuance to be filed within 30 days . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 6/26/2024. (JM) |
||
Friday, May 24, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() SCHEDULING ORDER: An initial conference by telephone has been scheduled for July 10, 2024 at 11:30 a.m. , before the Hon. Robert M. Levy, USMJ. Parties are directed to dial 571-353-2301; and use Guest ID #: 623827231. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 5/24/2024. (JM) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Thursday, May 23, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Corporate Disclosure Statement by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings, Inc. for Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Dunn, Robert) |
|
6 | 6
![]() ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Dunn, Robert) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed by Re-Steel Supply Company, Inc.. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company served on 4/26/2024, answer due 5/17/2024. (Chan, Henry) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
![]() This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (SDM) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (SDM) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued as to Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (SDM) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against Liberty Mutual Insurance Company filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-17805034 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Re-Steel Supply Company, Inc.. (Chan, Henry) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |