New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jennifer E Willis
Case #: 1:24-cv-03134
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2024
Last checked: Monday Oct 21, 2024 4:32 AM EDT
Defendant
Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By
Lisa Bentley Andrzejewski
Robinson & Cole
contact info
Plaintiff
Re-Steel Supply Company, Inc.
Represented By
Henry Chan
Wilson & Chan LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Voluntary Dismissal Wed 03/12 11:20 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Henry Chan. RE-FILE Document No. 23 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the stipulation of dismissal is not pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Re-file the document using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed (scanned signature image) PDF. (tp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
23 23 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 03/11 11:01 AM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Liberty Mutual Insurance Company and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Re-Steel Supply Company, Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Chan, Henry)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Voluntary Dismissal Tue 02/25 9:46 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Henry Chan. RE-FILE Document No. 22 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the voluntary dismissal is against was/were selected. Re-file the document using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed PDF. (km)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
22 22 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 02/24 2:19 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Re-Steel Supply Company, Inc. and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Re-Steel Supply Company, Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Chan, Henry)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
21 21 order Case Management Plan Tue 10/15 2:25 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND REPORT OF RULE 26(f) MEETING: Last date to amend the Complaint: 9/25/2024. At this time, the parties do not anticipate utilizing experts. The parties have discussed the possibility of settlement. The parties request a bench trial. The parties consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction at this time. The jointly proposed plan is adopted. Plaintiff is to produce documentation verifying notice to Defendant by December 1st, 2024. SO ORDERED. Deposition due by 2/14/2025. Fact Discovery due by 3/28/2025. Ready for Trial by 3/28/2025. Estimate length of trial 3 days. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer E. Willis on 10/15/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 14, 2024
20 20 discov Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Report Mon 10/14 5:24 PM
RULE 26(f) DISCOVERY PLAN REPORT.Document filed by Re-Steel Supply Company, Inc...(Chan, Henry)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
19 19 1 pgs order Order Fri 10/11 6:41 PM
ORDER The Court is reminding the Parties that they were directed to complete the Proposed Management Plan and Report of Rule 26(f) Meeting at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jennifer-e-willis and file it on ECF one week before the scheduled conference on October 15, 2024. As of October 11, 2024, no plan was filed. The Court directs the Parties to file the plan and report on ECF by 9:00 AM on October 15, 2024. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer E. Willis on 10/11/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
18 18 2 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Fri 08/30 11:48 AM
INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT TELEPHONE CONFERENCE ORDER: Counsel is directed to call the court's telephone conference line at the scheduled time. Please dial (646) 453-4442 and enter the passcode 858980103#. As further set forth by this Order. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 10/15/2024 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jennifer E. Willis. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer E. Willis on 8/29/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
17 17 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 08/28 2:01 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint. Document filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company..(Andrzejewski, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
16 16 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Tue 08/27 12:21 PM
CONSENT TO JURISDICTION BY A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Re-Steel Supply Company, Inc. (Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge) CASE ASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Jennifer E. Willis. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 8/27/2024) (vfr)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
15 15 notice Notice (Other) Mon 08/26 4:52 PM
NOTICE of Consent and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge re:14 Order,,. Document filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company..(Andrzejewski, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
14 14 2 pgs order Order Fri 08/23 1:29 PM
ORDER: The initial pretrial conference currently set for August 28, 2024, is hereby canceled. The parties have indicated on their proposed case management plan that they consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge. If the parties in fact consent, they should file a fully executed Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge(attached) by Monday, August 26, 2024. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 8/23/2024) (vfr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
13 13 misc Preliminary Pretrial Statement Thu 08/22 4:42 PM
FIRST PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT . Document filed by Re-Steel Supply Company, Inc...(Chan, Henry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order
Thursday, July 25, 2024
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Thu 07/25 2:03 PM
ORDER granting11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time; granting11 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application granted. The initial pretrial conference will take place on August 28, 2024, at 11:30 AM. The dial-in information remains the same. THERE WILL BE NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS, including for settlement. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at Dkt. 11. SO ORDERED. ( Initial Conference set for 8/28/2024 at 11:30 AM before Judge Arun Subramanian.). (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 7/25/2024) (vfr)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 07/25 2:04 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company answer due 8/28/2024. (vfr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
11 11 motion Extension of Time Adjourn Conference Wed 07/24 5:11 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, on Consent, addressed to Judge Arun Subramanian from Lisa B. Andrzejewski dated July 24, 2024., LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled for July 31, 2024 at 12:00pm, on Consent addressed to Judge Arun Subramanian from Lisa B. Andrzejewski dated July 24, 2024. Document filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company..(Andrzejewski, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 07/15 2:55 PM
ORDER granting9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint. Application granted.The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at Dkt. 9. SO ORDERED. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company answer due 7/29/2024. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 7/15/2024) (sgz)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 07/12 4:17 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint : Request for an Extension of Time for Defendant to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Arun Subramanian from Lisa B. Andrzejewski dated July 12, 2024. Document filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company..(Andrzejewski, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 07/08 6:58 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lisa Bentley Andrzejewski on behalf of Liberty Mutual Insurance Company..(Andrzejewski, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
7 7 respoth Response (non-motion) Wed 05/29 4:08 PM
INTERIM RESPONSE . Document filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company..(Trunkes, Virginia)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
6 6 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Fri 05/03 11:49 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company served on 5/2/2024, answer due 5/23/2024. Service was accepted by Department of Financial Services on Behalf of Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. Document filed by Re-Steel Supply Company, Inc...(Chan, Henry)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 04/30 4:15 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Liberty Mutual Insurance Company..(jgo)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 04/29 12:59 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Re-Steel Supply Company, Inc...(Chan, Henry)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
3 3 3 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Thu 04/25 2:43 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The parties should dial in by calling (646) 453-4442 and entering the Phone Conference ID: 728 583 552, followed by the pound (#) sign. Absent leave of Court obtained by letter-motion filed before the conference, all pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as Lead Trial Counsel. As further set forth by this Order. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 7/31/2024 at 12:00 PM before Judge Arun Subramanian. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 4/25/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 04/25 12:48 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Chan, Henry)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney to Submit/File Civil Cover Sheet Thu 04/25 9:53 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Henry Chan. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Thu 04/25 9:57 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Henry Chan. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 09:203 Jurisdiction; amount in controversy; Dollar Demand $113458000; County code Albany; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1332 Diversity Action; the Dollar Demand has been modified to $113,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (vf)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Thu 04/25 9:59 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Arun Subramanian. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Thu 04/25 9:59 AM
Magistrate Judge Jennifer Willis is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 04/25 9:59 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
1 1 4 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 04/24 2:36 PM
COMPLAINT against Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29266189)Document filed by Re-Steel Supply Company, Inc...(Chan, Henry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet