California Southern District Court
Judge:Benjamin J Cheeks
Referred: Allison H Goddard
Case #: 3:24-cv-00751
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1332bc Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 26, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Oct 27, 2024 2:05 AM PDT
Defendant
Kisco Senior Living, LLC
Represented By
Marcus McCutcheon
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
G. G.
Represented By
Michael F. Ram
Morgan & Morgan
contact info
Ryan Dennis Maxey
Maxey Law Firm, P.A.
contact info
Patrick A. Barthle, II
Morgan & Morgan Mass Tort Dept.
contact info
Plaintiff
Gayle Gois
Represented By
Michael F. Ram
Morgan & Morgan
contact info
Ryan Dennis Maxey
Maxey Law Firm, P.A.
contact info
Patrick A. Barthle, II
Morgan & Morgan Mass Tort Dept.
contact info
Plaintiff
Paul Gois
Represented By
Michael F. Ram
Morgan & Morgan
contact info
Ryan Dennis Maxey
Maxey Law Firm, P.A.
contact info
Patrick A. Barthle, II
Morgan & Morgan Mass Tort Dept.
contact info
Plaintiff
Ronald Cox
Represented By
John J. Nelson
Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman PLLC
contact info
Patrick A. Barthle, II
Morgan & Morgan Mass Tort Dept.
contact info
Plaintiff
Matthew Taylor
Represented By
Patrick A. Barthle, II
Morgan & Morgan Mass Tort Dept.
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/27/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
33 33 order Order Tue 02/25 3:13 PM
ORDER: The Court has received and reviewed the parties' joint status report (ECF No.31 ). With respect to Defendant Kisco Senior Living's pending Motion to Dismiss (ECF No.23 ), the Court finds this matter can be appropriately decided on the papers without oral argument. Additionally, the Court denies Defendant's request for leave to file a reply brief in support of its motion to dismiss. Defendant's reply brief was due on November 8, 2024 (ECF No. 22 ), and Defendant failed to articulate any extraordinary circumstances that warrant an additional extension. Signed by District Judge Benjamin J. Cheeks on 2/25/2025. (no document attached) (axp)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
32 32 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/21 4:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel for Defendant Kisco Senior Living, LLC by Alexis Bastian Cruz on behalf of Kisco Senior Living, LLC (Cruz, Alexis)Attorney Alexis Bastian Cruz added to party Kisco Senior Living, LLC(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
31 31 misc Status Report Fri 02/21 11:45 AM
STATUS REPORT /Joint Status Report Re: Mediation by Kisco Senior Living, LLC. (Cruz, Alexis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
30 30 order Order of Judge Transfer Wed 01/29 11:04 AM
MINUTE ORDER OF TRANSFER. District Judge Andrew G. Schopler is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to District Judge Benjamin J. Cheeks for all further proceedings. Pending hearings previously set before the original Judge have been transferred to the newly assigned Judge. The new case number is 24cv0751 BJC-AHG.(no document attached) (mef)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
29 29 order Order on Motion to Stay Mon 12/16 4:41 PM
ORDER (AGS): The parties' stay request (ECF28 ) is granted. This case is stayed until February 7, 2025, and the parties must file a joint status report by February 21, 2025. Signed by District Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 12/16/2024. (no document attached) (emp)
Related: [-]
28 28 motion Stay Mon 12/16 2:05 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay /Stipulation for Stay Pending Scheduled Mediation by Kisco Senior Living, LLC. (McCutcheon, Marcus)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
27 27 order Order ~Util - Motions Submitted Mon 12/09 3:37 PM
ORDER (AGS): Defendant's motion to dismiss (ECF23 ) is taken under submission, and the previously scheduled hearing is vacated. Signed by District Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 12/09/2024. (no document attached) (emp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
26 26 2 pgs order Order re Pro Hac Vice Application Thu 10/24 8:53 AM
ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Ryan D. Maxey, re25 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 10/24/2024.(exs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
25 25 notice Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 10/22 12:13 PM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, No payment Submitted. (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Maxey, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
24 24 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 10/18 1:13 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re23 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendant Kisco Senior Living, LLC's Motion To Dismiss filed by Ronald Cox, G. G., Gayle Gois, Paul Gois, Matthew Taylor. (Barthle, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
23 23 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 09/20 4:33 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendant Kisco Senior Living, LLC's Motion To Dismiss by Kisco Senior Living, LLC. (McCutcheon, Marcus)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
22 22 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 08/22 3:33 PM
MINUTE ORDER (AGS): The second joint motion to extend time to respond to the amended complaint (ECF21 ) is granted in part. By September 20, 2024, defendant must answer or otherwise respond. If that response is other than an answer, plaintiffs must file their opposition by October 18, 2024, and defendant must file any reply by November 8, 2024. Absent extraordinary circumstances, no further extensions will be granted. Signed by District Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 08/22/2024. (no document attached) (raw)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 08/22 10:10 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re17 Amended Complaint *Second Joint Motion to Extend Defendant's Time to Respond to CCAC* by Kisco Senior Living, LLC.(McCutcheon, Marcus)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
20 20 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 08/14 9:52 AM
MINUTE ORDER (AGS): The joint motion to extend time to respond to the amended complaint (ECF19 ) is granted. By August 21, 2024, defendant must answer or otherwise respond. If that response is other than an answer, plaintiffs must file their opposition by September 20, 2024, and defendant must file any reply by October 11, 2024. Signed by District Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 08/14/2024. (no document attached) (raw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
19 19 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 08/13 3:46 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re17 Amended Complaint *Joint Motion to Extend Defendant's Time to Respond to CCAC* by Kisco Senior Living, LLC.(McCutcheon, Marcus)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, July 29, 2024
18 18 notice Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 07/29 9:15 AM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 224 receipt number ACASDC-19052579.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Maxey, Ryan) (QC Mailer sent re: incomplete application) (exs)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
17 17 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 06/21 12:56 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Kisco Senior Living, LLC, filed by Paul Gois, G. G., Ronald Cox, Gayle Gois, Matthew Taylor. (Barthle, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Friday, May 24, 2024
16 16 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 05/24 4:16 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kisco Senior Living, LLC. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (McCutcheon, Marcus)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Withdrawal of Document Fri 05/24 4:13 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Kisco Senior Living, LLC re11 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Kisco Senior Living, LLC *Defendant Kisco Senior Living, LLC's Notice of Withdrawal of Incorrectly Filed Document, ECF No. 11* . (McCutcheon, Marcus)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Withdrawal of Document Fri 05/24 4:07 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Kisco Senior Living, LLC re10 Notice of Party With Financial Interest, filed by Kisco Senior Living, LLC *Defendant Kisco Senior Living, LLC's Notice of Withdrawal of Incorrectly Filed Document, ECF No. 10* . (McCutcheon, Marcus)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Withdrawal of Document Fri 05/24 4:02 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Kisco Senior Living, LLC re9 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Kisco Senior Living, LLC *Defendant Kisco Senior Living, LLC's Notice of Withdrawal of Incorrectly Filed Document, ECF No. 9* . (McCutcheon, Marcus)
Related: [-]
12 12 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases Fri 05/24 2:34 PM
ORDER Granting In Part Motion To Consolidate (ECF7 ) And Granting Leave To Amened. Signed by District Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 5/24/2024. (ddf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
11 11 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 05/23 5:41 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kisco Senior Living, LLC. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (McCutcheon, Marcus)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Party With Financial Interest Thu 05/23 5:37 PM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Kisco Senior Living, LLC . Identifying Other Affiliate Andrew S. Kohlberg Trust dtd 4/4/89, Other Affiliate Kisco Management Group, LLC for Kisco Senior Living, LLC. (McCutcheon, Marcus)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 05/23 5:15 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kisco Senior Living, LLC. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (McCutcheon, Marcus)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Party With Financial Interest Thu 05/23 5:06 PM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Kisco Senior Living, LLC . Identifying Other Affiliate Andrew S. Kohlberg Trust dtd 4/4/89, Other Affiliate Kisco Management Group, LLC for Kisco Senior Living, LLC. (McCutcheon, Marcus)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Consolidate Cases Thu 05/23 7:08 AM
Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases by G. G., Gayle Gois, Paul Gois. (Barthle, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
6 6 2 pgs order Order re Pro Hac Vice Application Mon 05/20 1:01 PM
ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Patrick A. Barthle, II Related [+]. Signed by District Judge Andrew G. Schopler.(jrd)
Related: [-] ECF No.4 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Friday, May 10, 2024
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 05/10 12:50 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paul Gois, G. G., Gayle Gois. Kisco Senior Living, LLC served. (Ram, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
4 4 notice Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/09 2:37 PM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 224 receipt number ACASDC-18835539.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Barthle, Patrick) (exs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 04/30 2:54 PM
AMENDED Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (axc1) (anh)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 04/26 2:20 PM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (axc1)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 04/26 2:07 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Kisco Senior Living, LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-18796673.), filed by Paul Gois, G. G., Gayle Gois. The new case number is 3:24-cv-751-AGS-AHG. Judge Andrew G. Schopler and Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard are assigned to the case. (Ram, Michael F.)(axc1)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1