Hammer et al v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-02623 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Apr 29, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jun 05, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Alabama Northern, 2:24-cv-00461 |
Last checked: Thursday Jun 13, 2024 6:16 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Amercas Inc
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Archroma U.S. Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
EI Du Pont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products L.P.
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Plaintiff
David Bain
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Barnes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
J Kim Blackwell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chris Bodin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronnie Bratt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Brown
#187742 Kershaw Correctional Institution 4848 Goldmine Highway
Kershaw, SC 29067 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cory Bryant
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Bulmer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Torry Burk
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Isham Conner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Cordova
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jorge Curi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph L Dabbs
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Greg Dooley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Drennan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Early
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jason Engel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ricky Espree
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Fisher
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Billy Lumus Frank
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Terry Frost
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rodney Gandy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hank Garcia-Mino
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephen Gardner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James George
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Giblin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Gilmore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Gray
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Grob
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larry Groth
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Haller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joel Hammer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donald Hannsz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Hardin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Austin Hargrove
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Johnnie Ben Harvey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Hayes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Henry
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Hinkle
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Norman Holden
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Douglas Holderman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Walter Huston
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Isley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Preston Jeffers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Frederick Jeffreys
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Albert Jensen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gene Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rodney Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Karlinsey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Katusa
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Erica Khamvongsa
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles King
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Zachary Kirchner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roy Kloeber
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles F Kuhn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Lambert
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Landry
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Lawson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jesse Lay
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Russell Ledbetter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gregory Lee
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Letson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary Lewis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Lowe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Teresa Luneau
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gordon Lyons
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
THOMAS MAYNARD
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Craig Martin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pete Maul
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jonathon McCabe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael McDermott
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephen Miller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Moore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carey Morgan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dr. Donald Morgan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Glen Mulvaney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patrick Musard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Nixon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Oliver
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Allen Pack
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kyle Patterson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Perry Perlman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Pettit
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Philo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chester Pleasant
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kimberly Pope
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alphonse Rainer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sophia Randall
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roger Riley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Albert Ruelas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jimmy Runnels
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Sansone
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Frank Saumty
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shannen Saylor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Allen Scarborough
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Scheffler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Schubert
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Phillip Schuyler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Schwane
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roy Schwickerath
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Phillip Selke
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Francis Sellers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carlo Shields
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Henry Simms
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thad Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George Sowell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephan Steffanides
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Sterling
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Darla Stewart
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kurtis Switzer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Floyd Sykes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Tenczar
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Thomack
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lawrence Thompson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Albert Thurston
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kiley Turnbaugh
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenmoore Tyson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Salvatore Valerio
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Villasanz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joel Vinson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Volta
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hakili Washington
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Claude White
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sonya Wilcox
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kelli Wilhite
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sparkle Williams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jason Womack
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Young
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, June 05, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 06/05 12:02 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:24-cv-02623-RMG(Murrill, James) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Mon 04/29 1:44 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Alabama Northern (associated as of 4/29/2024), 2:24-cv-00461, Joel Hammer et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-02623-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
3 | 3
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Mon 04/29 1:39 PM
Case transferred in from District of Alabama Northern; Case Number 2:24-cv-00461. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
2 | 2
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 04/29 9:16 AM
ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of South Carolina for inclusion in MDL No. 2873; Certified copy of docket entries and documents requested by transferee clerk sent electronically to Clerk of Court in District of South Carolina. (AKD) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 405, receipt_number AALNDC-4576077 (ALND receipt# B-11179). related document1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kimberly Pope, Carey Morgan, Charles F Kuhn, Perry Perlman, Michael Brown, Thomas Giblin, Claude White, Jorge Curi, Frederick Jeffreys, Gary Lewis, Jason Engel, Joel Vinson, Kiley Turnbaugh, Kyle Patterson, Greg Dooley, Jesse Lay, Daniel Young, Phillip Selke, Thomas Maynard, John Gilmore, Sonya Wilcox, Roy Schwickerath, Charles King, Austin Hargrove, Johnnie Ben Harvey, Donald Hannsz, Larry Groth, Francis Sellers, Alphonse Rainer, William Sterling, John Hinkle, Mark Lowe, Albert Thurston, Norman Holden, Thad Smith, Phillip Schuyler, Craig Martin, Russell Ledbetter, Robert Tenczar, Stephen Gardner, Jimmy Runnels, Robert Thomack, Henry Simms, Allen Pack, Charles Landry, Roger Riley, Allen Scarborough, Patrick Musard, Kenneth Henry, Kelli Wilhite, Albert Jensen, David Pettit, Torry Burk, Isham Conner, John Philo, Rodney Johnson, Robert Fisher, Stephen Miller, Rodney Gandy, Zachary Kirchner, J Kim Blackwell, Donald Morgan, David Karlinsey, Shannen Saylor, Thomas Drennan, Christopher Sansone, David Schubert, Robert Gray, John Letson, Jonathon McCabe, Mark Lambert, Chris Bodin, Pete Maul, David Volta, Hakili Washington, Darla Stewart, Robert Isley, Daniel Hayes, Gregory Lee, Kevin Moore, Frank Saumty, William Oliver, Kenmoore Tyson, Thomas Grob, Gene Johnson, James George, Teresa Luneau, Robert Hardin, David Villasanz, Joel Hammer, John Haller, Walter Huston, Michael McDermott, Daniel Schwane, George Sowell, Floyd Sykes, Erica Khamvongsa, Terry Frost, John Cordova, Joseph L Dabbs, Glen Mulvaney, Billy Lumus Frank, Mark Scheffler, Jason Womack, Chester Pleasant, Salvatore Valerio, Sophia Randall, Sparkle Williams, David Nixon, Kurtis Switzer, Mark Bulmer, David Bain, Hank Garcia-Mino, Ronnie Bratt, William Lawson, Douglas Holderman, Stephan Steffanides, Preston Jeffers, Carlo Shields, Gordon Lyons, Lawrence Thompson, James Barnes, William Early, James Katusa, Ricky Espree, Albert Ruelas, Roy Kloeber.(KAM). (Murrill, James) Modified on 4/29/2024 (AKD). [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/29/2024.] | ||
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kimberly Pope, Carey Morgan, Charles F Kuhn, Perry Perlman, Michael Brown, Thomas Giblin, Claude White, Jorge Curi, Frederick Jeffreys, Gary Lewis, Jason Engel, Joel Vinson, Kiley Turnbaugh, Kyle Patterson, Greg Dooley, Jesse Lay, Daniel Young, Phillip Selke, Thomas Maynard, John Gilmore, Sonya Wilcox, Roy Schwickerath, Charles King, Austin Hargrove, Johnnie Ben Harvey, Donald Hannsz, Larry Groth, Francis Sellers, Alphonse Rainer, William Sterling, John Hinkle, Mark Lowe, Albert Thurston, Norman Holden, Thad Smith, Phillip Schuyler, Craig Martin, Russell Ledbetter, Robert Tenczar, Stephen Gardner, Jimmy Runnels, Robert Thomack, Henry Simms, Allen Pack, Charles Landry, Roger Riley, Allen Scarborough, Patrick Musard, Kenneth Henry, Kelli Wilhite, Albert Jensen, David Pettit, Torry Burk, Isham Conner, John Philo, Rodney Johnson, Robert Fisher, Stephen Miller, Rodney Gandy, Zachary Kirchner, J Kim Blackwell, Donald Morgan, David Karlinsey, Shannen Saylor, Thomas Drennan, Christopher Sansone, David Schubert, Robert Gray, John Letson, Jonathon McCabe, Mark Lambert, Chris Bodin, Pete Maul, David Volta, Hakili Washington, Darla Stewart, Robert Isley, Daniel Hayes, Gregory Lee, Kevin Moore, Frank Saumty, William Oliver, Kenmoore Tyson, Thomas Grob, Gene Johnson, James George, Teresa Luneau, Robert Hardin, David Villasanz, Joel Hammer, John Haller, Walter Huston, Michael McDermott, Daniel Schwane, George Sowell, Floyd Sykes, Erica Khamvongsa, Terry Frost, John Cordova, Joseph L Dabbs, Glen Mulvaney, Billy Lumus Frank, Mark Scheffler, Jason Womack, Chester Pleasant, Salvatore Valerio, Sophia Randall, Sparkle Williams, David Nixon, Kurtis Switzer, Mark Bulmer, David Bain, Hank Garcia-Mino, Ronnie Bratt, William Lawson, Douglas Holderman, Stephan Steffanides, Preston Jeffers, Carlo Shields, Gordon Lyons, Lawrence Thompson, James Barnes, William Early, James Katusa, Ricky Espree, Albert Ruelas, Roy Kloeber.(KAM) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 4/29/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |