Custodia Bank v. Federal Reserve Board of Governors, et al
Original Case: 1:22-cv-00125
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-08024 |
Type | civil / usa as party |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Case Filed: | Apr 26, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Sep 13, 2024 8:00 PM MDT |
Amicus Curiae
REPRESENTATIVE WARREN E. DAVIDSON
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
WYOMING BANKERS ASSOCIATION
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
THE CLEARING HOUSE ASSOCIATIOIN, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
THE BANK POLICY INSTITUTE
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
FEDERAL RESERVE BANKS
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
AMERICAN BANKERS ASSOCIATION
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
CONSUMER BANKERS ASSOCIATION
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
INDEPENDENT COMMUNITY BANKERS OF AMERICA
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
PROFESSOR DAVID ZARING
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
WYOMING SECRETARY OF STATE
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
SENATOR STEVE DAINES
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
SENATOR CYNTHIA M. LUMMIS
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
BLOCKCHAIN ASSOCIATION
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
FORMER SENATOR PATRICK J. TOOMEY
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
GLOBAL BLOCKCHAIN BUSINESS COUNCIL-USA
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
THE DIGITAL CHAMBER
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
AMERICANS FOR PROSPERITY FOUNDATION-WYOMING
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
FEDERAL RESERVE BANK OF KANSAS CITY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD OF GOVERNORS
|
Represented By
|
Movant
WYOMING BANKERS ASSOCIATION
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
CUSTODIA BANK, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/13/2024 8:00 PM MDT |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
[11085318] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 04/26/2024. Fee, docketing statement, transcript order form notice of appearance and disclosure statement due by 05/10/2024 for Custodia Bank, Inc. Notice of appearance and disclosure statement due on 05/10/2024 for Federal Reserve Bank of Kansas City. Notice of appearance due 05/10/2024 for Federal Reserve Board of Governors. 24-8024 | ||
Att: 1 136 pgs Main Document | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil |