Leal v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-02610 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 26, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Texas Western, 1:24-cv-00363 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 11, 2024 6:28 AM EDT |
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products L.P.
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
Raytheon Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
John Does 1-49
|
|
Defendant
E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Incorporated
Agent Schok K. Moza 12321 Hatcherville
Baytown, TX 77520 |
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma U.S. Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AGC Inc
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemical Americas, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Henry Leal
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, May 08, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
service
Summons Issued
Wed 05/08 3:08 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Mon 04/29 1:32 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Texas Western (associated as of 4/26/2024), 1:24-cv-00363, Leal v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-02610-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
10 | 10
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Mon 04/29 1:27 PM
Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 1:24-cv-00363. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
9 | 9 Conditional Transfer Order entered by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation per MDL 2873, CTO-183. (klw) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/29/2024.] | |
Case reassigned to Judge Robert Pitman. Judge Docket II - Austin no longer assigned to the case. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (klw) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/29/2024.] | ||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
Text Order GRANTING8 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that all Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before the 28th day after the Judicial Panel for Multidistrict Litigation issues a final order determining whether to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the District of South Carolina for coordinated or consolidated pre-trial proceedings in In re: Aqueous Film-Forming Foams (AFFF) Products Liability Litigation, MDL No. 2873, Case No. 2:18-mn-02873-RMG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sslc) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/29/2024.] | ||
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
8 | 8 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by 3M Company.(Smith, Jonathan) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/29/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
7 | 7 ORDER that the removing party, if it has not already done so, shall within ten (10) days from the date of this order supplement the record with state court pleadings. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (kp) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/29/2024.] | |
6 | 6 ORDER Directing Louise R. Caro to File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice within 14 days. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (kp) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/29/2024.] | |
5 | 5 ORDER Directing Philip F. Cossich, Jr. to File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice within 14 days. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (kp) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/29/2024.] | |
4 | 4 ORDER Directing Brett Land to File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice within 14 days. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (kp) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/29/2024.] | |
3 | 3 ORDER Directing Carla Burke Pickrel to File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice within 14 days. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (kp) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/29/2024.] | |
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
2 | 2 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by 3M Company. (Christian, Randall) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/29/2024.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M Company (Filing fee $405 receipt number ATXWDC-18616520), filed by 3M Company.(Christian, Randall) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/29/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Supplement Supplement to JS 44 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Case assigned to Judge Docket II - Austin. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (kp) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/29/2024.] | ||
If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin Howell. (kp) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/29/2024.] | ||
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Henry Leal. (kp) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/29/2024.] |