South Carolina District Court
Judge:Henry M Herlong, Jr
Case #: 8:24-cv-02724
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:May 01, 2024
Terminated:Jul 02, 2024
Last checked: Monday Oct 28, 2024 4:49 AM EDT
Defendant
Dawn Crump
Defendant
Richard Crump
Defendant
Merit Transport Inc
Plaintiff
United Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By
Kevin M O'Brien
Phelps Dunbar LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, August 26, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 08/26 12:46 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by United Specialty Insurance Company (O'Brien, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
9 9 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case 60 Day Settlement Order Tue 07/02 2:29 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE without costs and without prejudice to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 7/2/24. (kmca)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed - Complaint Served Fri 05/24 1:07 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by United Specialty Insurance Company. Merit Transport Inc served on 5/22/2024, answer due 6/12/2024. (O'Brien, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
6 6 service Summons Reissued Mon 05/06 3:49 PM
Summons Reissued as to Merit Transport Inc. (arut)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 05/01 3:25 PM
Summons Issued as to Dawn Crump, Richard Crump, Merit Transport Inc.(arut)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Dawn Crump,
Att: 2 Summons Richard Crump
3 3 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Wed 05/01 3:18 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by United Specialty Insurance Company.(arut)
Related: [-]
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 05/01 3:16 PM
COMPLAINT against Dawn Crump, Richard Crump, Merit Transport Inc ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-11739791.), filed by United Specialty Insurance Company. Service due by 7/30/2024.(arut)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Policy,
Att: 2 Exhibit B: Underlying Complaint