California Central District Court
Judge:Michael W Fitzgerald
Referred: Stephanie S Christensen
Case #: 2:24-cv-03623
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:May 01, 2024
Terminated:Jan 16, 2025
Last checked: Monday Oct 28, 2024 1:27 AM PDT
Defendant
Bachar Investments, LLC
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Moises Villalobos
Represented By
Jason T Yoon
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Kevin Hyunjong Hong
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason J Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason T. Yoon
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason J. Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Noho Collision Center, Inc
Terminated: 06/12/2024


Docket last updated: 04/27/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, January 16, 2025
24 24 judgmentCV Judgment - Default by Judge Fri 01/17 2:45 PM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION AGAINST DEFENDANT BACHAR INVESTMENTS, LLC by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff Moises Villalobos and against Defendant Bachar Investments, LLC. Plaintiff Moises Villalobos is awarded $2,550.00 in attorneys' fees. Plaintiff Moises Villalobos is awarded $585.00 in costs. ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (iv)
Related: [-]
23 23 order Default Judgment Fri 01/17 2:39 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT21 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Motion is GRANTED in part. Plaintiff is therefore AWARDED $2,550.00 in attorneys' fees and $585.00 in costs. Plaintiff's request for injunctive relief is GRANTED. (iv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
22 22 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 11/20 3:29 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE and ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7-15, the Court finds MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT21 suitable for submission on the papers without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing set on this motion for November 25, 2024 is vacated and taken off calendar. If the Court determines that a hearing is necessary, one will be reset at a later date. IT IS SO ORDERED.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
21 21 motion Default Judgment Thu 10/24 4:15 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant BACHAR INVESTMENTS, LLC filed by plaintiff Moises Villalobos. Motion set for hearing on 11/25/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Declaration,
Att: 3 Declaration,
Att: 4 Proposed Order,
Att: 5 Proposed Order,
Att: 6 proof of service
Thursday, September 26, 2024
20 20 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Thu 09/26 9:36 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Show Cause Hearing set for 10/28/2024 at 11:30 a.m. before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (smom)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
19 19 order Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form Mon 09/16 11:56 AM
DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Bachar Investments, LLC. (iv)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Clerk to Enter Default Fri 09/13 12:12 PM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant Bachar Investments, LLC filed by plaintiff Moises Villalobos. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
17 17 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Thu 08/15 4:26 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to show cause why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. In response to this Order to Show Cause, the Court will accept the following no later than SEPTEMBER 13, 2024. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Thu 08/15 2:28 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DECLINING TO EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER PLAINTIFF'S STATE LAW CLAIMS by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald.In light of the foregoing, the Court, in its discretion, declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiffs state claims asserted in the Complaint. The Court therefore dismisses any such claims without prejudice. (iv)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
15 15 misc Response Fri 08/02 10:22 AM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Moises Villalobosto Order to Show Cause,13 re: Supplemental Jurisdiction(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Declaration
Friday, July 19, 2024
14 14 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Fri 07/19 11:49 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE PROSECUTION OF CERTAIN CASES UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. This Order serves as the Courts notice to Plaintiff that it will dismiss this action without prejudice on its own motion and without further notice to Plaintiff for failure to comply with this Order. The Court finds these sanctions sufficient and necessary to deter violations of the timely prosecution of these cases without unnecessary intervention by the Court. (rolm)
Related: [-]
13 13 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Fri 07/19 11:47 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Response shall be filed on or before AUGUST 2, 2024. Failure to timely or adequately respond to this Order to Show Cause may, without further warning, result in the dismissal of the entire action without prejudice or the Court's declining to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act claim and the dismissal of that claim pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1367(c). (rolm)
Related: [-]
12 12 adr Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20) Fri 07/19 9:23 AM
NOTICE to Parties Re (ADR-20) ADA Disability Access Litigation/Application for Stay and Early Mediation: PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED to serve the ADA Packet on Defendant(s) at the same time the summons and complaint are served, if possible. If, upon receipt of this Notice to Parties, Plaintiff has already served Defendant(s), Plaintiff must serve the ADA Packet no later than fourteen (14) days after this Notice to Parties is filed by the Court. Within three (3) days of serving Defendant(s), Plaintiff must file with the Court a proof of service indicating that the ADA Packet was served on Defendant(s). *See Notice for further details.* (smom)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Reassignment (CV-87) of Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Thu 07/18 11:31 AM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Stephanie S. Christensen. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:24-cv-03623 MWF(SSCx). (rn)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
10 10 misc Notice to Counsel (CV-14) Reminder re MJ Civil Consent Pilot Project-optional html form Fri 06/14 2:43 PM
REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (vam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
9 9 notice Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1)) Wed 06/12 2:04 PM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by PLAINTIFF Moises Villalobos pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Noho Collision Center, Inc. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
8 8 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 06/06 10:21 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Moises Villalobos, upon Defendant Noho Collision Center, Inc served on 6/4/2024, answer due 6/25/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Martin Babaian - Authorized Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
7 7 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 05/29 2:10 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Moises Villalobos, upon Defendant Bachar Investments, LLC served on 5/28/2024, answer due 6/18/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Guy Bachar - Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 05/02 10:36 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Bachar Investments, LLC, Noho Collision Center, Inc. (ghap)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form Thu 05/02 10:25 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 CV-11C Statement of Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
4 4 notice Summons Request Wed 05/01 4:12 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Moises Villalobos. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 05/01 4:11 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 05/01 4:11 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Moises Villalobos. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 05/01 4:10 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37392666 - Fee: $405. (Attorney Jason J. Kim added to party Moises Villalobos(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]