Fairly Odd Treasures, LLC v. Fulton DS
Original Case: 1:21-cv-06136
Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-01748 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Case Filed: | May 01, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday May 02, 2024 5:16 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellant
FULTON DS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
FAIRLY ODD TREASURES, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 3:55 AM CDT |
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
1 | 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Fulton DS by 05/07/2024. Transcript information sheet due by 05/15/2024. Appellant's brief due on or before 06/10/2024 for Fulton DS. [1] [7379631] 24-1748 (CG) [Entered: 05/01/2024 11:28 AM] | |
Att: 1 46 pgs Civil Case | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing | ||
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice to District Court |