Weiss v. Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd.
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Rodolfo A Ruiz, II |
Referred: | Lauren Fleischer Louis |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-21712 |
Nature of Suit | 340 Torts - Personal Injury - Marine |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity |
Case Filed: | May 02, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jun 28, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Jun 16, 2024 6:25 AM EDT |
Defendant
Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gloria Weiss
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party
Wed 07/31 10:29 AM
ORDER Dismissing Case (With Prejudice) . Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 7/30/2024. See attached document for full details. (kgs) |
|
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal - aty
Tue 07/30 4:06 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd.(Ginsberg, Randy) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Tue 07/30 3:50 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 8/2/2024 . Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 7/30/2024. See attached document for full details. (kgs) |
|
Friday, June 28, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
order
Administrative Order
Fri 06/28 3:54 PM
Order Administratively Closing Case. Appropriate dismissal documents due on or before July 29, 2024 . Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 6/28/2024. See attached document for full details. (kgs) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Settlement - aty
Fri 06/28 1:48 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd. (Ginsberg, Randy) |
|
Thursday, June 20, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
order
Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Mediation Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Thu 06/20 2:04 PM
ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: (Jury Trial set for 5/19/2025 in Miami Division before Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz II, Calendar Call set for 5/13/2025 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz II, Amended Pleadings due by 8/1/2024, Discovery due by 1/21/2025, Expert Discovery due by 1/21/2025, Fact Discovery due by 1/21/2025, Joinder of Parties due by 8/1/2024, Mediation Deadline 1/28/2025, In Limine Motions due by 3/4/2025, Dispositive Motions due by 2/4/2025, Motions due by 2/4/2025, Pretrial Stipulation due by 3/4/2025), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 1/28/2025), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 6/20/2024. See attached document for full details. (ebz) |
|
Wednesday, June 19, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1
Wed 06/19 2:28 PM
Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Gloria Weiss(Hanson, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Joint Scheduling form, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Election to Jurisdiction | ||
Wednesday, May 29, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report
Wed 05/29 5:31 PM
Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, Corporate Disclosure Statements, and Certificates of Interested Parties. Joint Scheduling Report due on or before June 20, 2024 . Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 5/29/2024. See attached document for full details. (kgs) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 05/29 1:27 PM
Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd. (Ginsberg, Randy) |
|
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 05/29 1:02 PM
ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd.. Attorney Randy Scott Ginsberg added to party Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd.(pty:dft). (Ginsberg, Randy) |
|
Friday, May 24, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 05/24 7:25 AM
Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Gloria Weiss (Hanson, Mark) |
|
Thursday, May 16, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Thu 05/16 7:04 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Gloria Weiss. Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd. served on 5/8/2024, response/answer due 5/29/2024. (Hanson, Mark) |
|
Friday, May 03, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 05/03 9:06 AM
Summons Issued as to Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd.. (amb) |
|
Thursday, May 02, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Fri 05/03 9:03 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 05/02 4:08 PM
COMPLAINT against Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd., A Liberian Corporation. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17499056, filed by Gloria Weiss.(Hanson, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summon(s) |