Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Cecilia M Altonaga
Referred: Lisette M Reid
Case #: 1:24-cv-21716
Nature of Suit340 Torts - Personal Injury - Marine
Cause28:1332 Diversity
Case Filed:May 02, 2024
Terminated:Oct 15, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Nov 02, 2024 7:00 AM EDT
Defendant
ROYAL CARIBBEAN CRUISES, LTD.
Represented By
Charlotte Paige Zubizarreta
Hamilton Miller & Birthisel
contact info
Mediator
Elisabeth M. Rock
EMC Mediation Solutions, Inc. 1516 Trevino Avenue
Coral Gables, FL 33134
Plaintiff
AUDREY GUNN
Represented By
Jacqueline Garcell
Lipcon, Margulies, Alsina, Winkleman, P.A.
contact info
Elizabeth Irazabal
Lipcon, Margulies, And Winkleman, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Tue 10/15 5:07 PM
ORDER granting14 Joint MOTION to Stay the Case Pending Completion of Plaintiff's Medical Treatment filed by AUDREY GUNN. Closing Case. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 10/15/2024. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Stay Tue 10/15 2:08 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay the Case Pending Completion of Plaintiff's Medical Treatment by AUDREY GUNN. Responses due by 10/29/2024.(Irazabal, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, June 14, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order Scheduling Mediation Fri 06/14 11:25 AM
ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Elisabeth M. Rock; Mediation Hearing set for 10/17/2024 10:00 AM. The parties are reminded that a report of their mediation must be filed within seven (7) days thereafter. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/14/2024. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
Related: [-]
12 12 adr Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing Fri 06/14 10:09 AM
NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Elisabeth M. Rock as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 10/17/2024 at 10:00 a.m..(Irazabal, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, June 10, 2024
11 11 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Mediation Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 06/11 9:11 AM
ORDER Setting Trial and Pretrial Schedule, Requiring Mediation, and Referring Certain Matters to Magistrate Judge: Trial set for two-week period beginning 4/21/2025 in Miami Division before Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Calendar Call set for 4/15/2025 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Motions to amend pleadings or join parties due by 7/22/2024. All discovery, including expert discovery, due by 12/23/2024. Mediation Deadline 12/30/2024. In Limine Motions due by 2/4/2025. Motions due by 1/7/2025. Pretrial Stipulation due by 2/4/2025. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid for Discovery Matters. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/10/2024. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1 Mon 06/10 2:33 PM
Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by AUDREY GUNN (Irazabal, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
9 9 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 06/06 5:30 PM
Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by AUDREY GUNN (Irazabal, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs order Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Thu 06/06 3:27 PM
Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties by 6/14/2024. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/6/2024. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 06/06 12:50 PM
Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by ROYAL CARIBBEAN CRUISES, LTD. identifying Other Affiliate Paul Hehir for ROYAL CARIBBEAN CRUISES, LTD. (Zubizarreta, Charlotte)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 06/06 12:49 PM
ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by ROYAL CARIBBEAN CRUISES, LTD.. Attorney Charlotte Paige Zubizarreta added to party ROYAL CARIBBEAN CRUISES, LTD.(pty:dft). (Zubizarreta, Charlotte)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
5 5 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Mon 05/20 6:43 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by AUDREY GUNN. ROYAL CARIBBEAN CRUISES, LTD. served on 5/16/2024, response/answer due 6/6/2024. (Irazabal, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
4 4 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Fri 05/17 2:50 PM
ORDER that on or before July 31, 2024, Plaintiff shall perfect service upon the Defendant or show cause why this action should not be dismissed for failure to perfect service of process. Failure to file proof of service or show good cause by July 31 will result in a dismissal without prejudice and without further notice.on or before July 31, 2024, Plaintiff shall perfect service upon the Defendant or show cause why this action should not be dismissed for failure to perfect service of process. Failure to file proof of service or show good cause by July 31 will result in a dismissal without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/16/2024. See attached document for full details. (wc)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 05/03 10:02 AM
Summons Issued as to ROYAL CARIBBEAN CRUISES, LTD. (nwn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Fri 05/03 10:00 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (nwn)
Related: [-]
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 05/02 5:14 PM
COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against ROYAL CARIBBEAN CRUISES, LTD.. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17499557, filed by AUDREY GUNN.(Irazabal, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s)