New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Sanket J Bulsara
Case #: 2:24-cv-03342
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause29:754 Discrimination
Case Filed:May 06, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Nov 02, 2024 5:08 AM EDT
Defendant
Island Park Union Free School District
99 Radcliffe Road
Island Park, NY 11558
Represented By
Blair Hendricks
contact info
Adam I. Kleinberg
Guercio & Guercio LLP
contact info
Defendant
Allison Offerman-Celentano
(in their individual capacities pursuant to NYEL §§290 et seq.) 99 Radcliffe Road
Island Park, NY 11558
Represented By
Blair Hendricks
contact info
Adam I. Kleinberg
Guercio & Guercio LLP
contact info
Defendant
Vincent Randazzo
99 Radcliffe Road
Island Park, NY 11558
Represented By
Blair Hendricks
contact info
Adam I. Kleinberg
Guercio & Guercio LLP
contact info
Defendant
Jacob Russum
99 Radcliffe Road
Island Park, NY 11558
Represented By
Blair Hendricks
contact info
Adam I. Kleinberg
Guercio & Guercio LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Cynthia Cameron
Represented By
Scott M. Mishkin
Scott Michael Mishkin, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 52 minutes ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
order Order Dismissing Case Mon 04/28 12:09 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: In light of the stipulation of dismissal18 , the Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. So Ordered by Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 4/28/2025. (MPG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
18 18 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 04/24 1:14 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Cynthia Cameron (Mishkin, Scott)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 01/31 10:26 AM
Case reassigned to Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Judge Joan M. Azrack no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (LF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
order Order Re: Notice of Consent to Change Attorney Tue 10/01 10:33 AM
Order re: Notice of Consent to Change Attorney re17 Notice of Consent to Change Attorney filed by Jacob Russum, Vincent Randazzo, Allison Offerman-Celentano, Island Park Union Free School District: So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 10/1/2024. (DM)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
17 17 notice Notice of Consent to Change Attorney Mon 09/30 3:03 PM
NOTICE of Consent to Change Attorney by Adam I. Kleinberg Substitution of Counsel (Kleinberg, Adam)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 09/13 2:21 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by All Defendants. (Kleinberg, Adam)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Letter Fri 09/13 1:54 PM
Letter Joint Request to Cancel Pre Motion Conference by Cynthia Cameron (Mishkin, Scott)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 09/13 1:48 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Breach of Contract Claim by Cynthia Cameron (Mishkin, Scott)
Related: [-]
order Scheduling Order Fri 09/13 2:20 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: In light of DE15 , the telephonic pre-motion conference scheduled for 9/18/2024 is CANCELLED. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 9/13/2024. (JSB) Modified on 9/13/2024 to correct conference date (LC)
Related: [-]
order Order(Other) Fri 09/13 4:28 PM
ORDER re14 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Cynthia Cameron. The stipulation is So Ordered. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 9/13/2024. (LP)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
13 13 minutes Initial Conference Hearing Tue 09/10 10:02 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields:Initial Conference Hearing held on 9/9/2024 (FTR Log #12:07-12:10.) (JT)
Related: [-]
order Scheduling Order Mon 09/09 12:18 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: As stated on the record during the initial conference held today, the parties shall complete the Employment Protocols found at Appendix F of this Court's Individual Rules by October 9, 2024. Fact discovery shall be completed by July 11, 2025. Expert discovery shall be completed by October 10, 2025. Any party seeking to make a dispositive motion shall initiate that process, consistent with the Individual Rules of the assigned District Judge, on or before November 14, 2025. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 9/9/2024. (DM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
12 12 misc Letter Thu 09/05 4:10 PM
Letter (Joint) by Island Park Union Free School District, Allison Offerman-Celentano, Vincent Randazzo, Jacob Russum (Kleinberg, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix
Thursday, August 29, 2024
order Scheduling Order Thu 08/29 10:51 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Due to a change in this Court's calendar, the telephone pre-motion conference scheduled for 9/26/2024 is ADVANCED to 9/18/2024 at 12:30 PM. Dial in remains the same. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 8/29/2024. (LP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
order Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference Tue 08/20 4:14 PM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. A telephonic Pre Motion Conference is set for 9/26/2024 at 3:00 PM before Judge Joan M. Azrack. Counsel shall dial 571-353-2301 and enter access code 279933568 at the prompt. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 8/20/2024. (JSB)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
11 11 misc Letter Mon 08/05 3:10 PM
Letter in Response to Defendants' Pre Motion Letter by Cynthia Cameron (Mishkin, Scott)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 08/05 8:27 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (AC)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
10 10 motion Pre Motion Conference Fri 08/02 8:44 AM
Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Island Park Union Free School District, Allison Offerman-Celentano, Vincent Randazzo, Jacob Russum. (Kleinberg, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A- 6.18.24 Appointment letter
misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge - Declined Fri 08/02 5:38 PM
NOTICE to Assign District Judge: The Clerk of Court is directed to reassign this case to a district judge. (DM)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 07/01 11:49 AM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Island Park Union Free School District answer due 8/5/2024; Allison Offerman-Celentano answer due 8/5/2024; Vincent Randazzo answer due 8/5/2024; Jacob Russum answer due 8/5/2024. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 7/1/2024. (DM)
Related: [-]
Saturday, June 29, 2024
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Sat 06/29 10:11 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Island Park Union Free School District, Allison Offerman-Celentano, Vincent Randazzo, Jacob Russum. (Kleinberg, Adam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 05/14 4:13 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Vincent Randazzo, Allison Offerman-Celentano, Island Park Union Free School District, Jacob Russum. Vincent Randazzo waiver sent on 5/14/2024, answer due 7/15/2024; Allison Offerman-Celentano waiver sent on 5/14/2024, answer due 7/15/2024; Island Park Union Free School District waiver sent on 5/14/2024, answer due 7/15/2024; Jacob Russum waiver sent on 5/14/2024, answer due 7/15/2024. (Kleinberg, Adam)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Scheduling Order Tue 05/14 1:42 PM
ORDER: An IN-PERSON Initial Conference is set for 9/9/2024 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 840 before Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. See order and attachment. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 5/14/2024. (JT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 AYS RULES
Monday, May 13, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 05/13 10:17 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Blair Hendricks on behalf of Island Park Union Free School District, Allison Offerman-Celentano, Vincent Randazzo, Jacob Russum (aty to be noticed) (Hendricks, Blair)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 05/13 10:11 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Adam I. Kleinberg on behalf of Island Park Union Free School District, Allison Offerman-Celentano, Vincent Randazzo, Jacob Russum (aty to be noticed) (Kleinberg, Adam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 05/07 10:58 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (LJ)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Opportunity to Consent Tue 05/07 10:51 AM
Clerks Notice Re: Consent. A magistrate judge has been assigned as the presiding judge in this case as part of a Pilot Program, governed by EDNY Administrative Order 2023-23. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form is also available here:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. Unless all parties consent to the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by the deadline set forth in the Administrative Order 2023-23, a District Judge will be assigned to the case. The parties are directed to review the terms of Administrative Order 2023-23 and other materials related to the Pilot Program on the Courts website:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] (LJ)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Tue 05/07 10:47 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (LJ)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 05/07 10:50 AM
Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (LJ)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 05/06 2:56 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-17845165 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by Cynthia Cameron. (Mishkin, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet