Georgia Southern District Court
Judge:Lisa G Wood
Referred: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Case #: 4:24-cv-00085
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1346(b) Federal Tort Claims Act
Case Filed:May 07, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Nov 03, 2024 3:40 AM EST
Defendant
Balfour Beatty Communities, LLC
Represented By
Susan J. Levy
Levy Pruett Carter
contact info
Defendant
Balfour Beatty Military Housing Development, LLC
Represented By
Susan J. Levy
Levy Pruett Carter
contact info
Defendant
Balfour Beatty Military Housing Investments, LLC
Represented By
Susan J. Levy
Levy Pruett Carter
contact info
Defendant
Balfour Beatty Military Housing Management, LLC
Represented By
Susan J. Levy
Levy Pruett Carter
contact info
Defendant
Stewart Hunter Housing, LLC
Represented By
Susan J. Levy
Levy Pruett Carter
contact info
Defendant
Christine E. Wormuth
Plaintiff
Ashley Linker
Represented By
Linnie L. Darden, III
Jones, Osteen, Jones & Arnold
contact info
Plaintiff
Henry Linker
Represented By
Linnie L. Darden, III
Jones, Osteen, Jones & Arnold
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/27/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, March 21, 2025
50 50 order Order on Motion for Leave of Absence Fri 03/21 10:14 AM
TEXT ORDER granting [48, 49] Motions for Leaves of Absence by Susan Levy for the dates of: April 7, 2025 through and including April 17, 2025; May 1, 2025 through and including May 9, 2025; September 30, 2025 through and including October 11, 2025; November 25, 2025 through and including December 13, 2025; and December 19, 2025 through and including January 16, 2026. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on March 21, 2025. (edd)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
49 49 motion Leave of Absence Mon 03/17 3:13 PM
Second MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Balfour Beatty Communities, LLC for dates of : April 7, 2025 to April 17, 2025; May 1, 2025 to May 9, 2025; December 19, 2025 to January 16, 2026 by Balfour Beatty Communities, LLC. Responses due by 3/31/2025. (Levy, Susan)
Related: [-]
48 48 motion Leave of Absence Mon 03/17 3:10 PM
MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Balfour Beatty Communities, LLC by Balfour Beatty Communities, LLC. Responses due by 3/31/2025. (Levy, Susan)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Mon 03/17 3:41 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED:49 Second MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Balfour Beatty Communities, LLC for dates of : April 7, 2025 to April 17, 2025; May 1, 2025 to May 9, 2025; December 19, 2025 to January 16, 2026,48 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Balfour Beatty Communities, LLC (cmr)
Related: [-]