Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Michelle V Larson
Case #: 8:24-bk-80045
Case Filed:May 10, 2024
Plan Confirmed:Jun 24, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
KidKraft, Inc.
4630 Olin Rd
Dallas, TX 75244-4615
Represented By
Matthew David Struble
Vinson & Elkins
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75202


Docket last updated: 26 minutes ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
462 462 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Thu 04/24 1:11 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 24-80055 Solowave International Inc. for the Quarter Ending: 03/31/2025 filed by Interested Party SierraConstellation Partners, LLC, as Wind Down Administrator. (Binford, Jason)
Related: [-]
461 461 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Thu 04/24 1:09 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 24-80054 Solowave Design LP for the Quarter Ending: 03/31/2025 filed by Interested Party SierraConstellation Partners, LLC, as Wind Down Administrator. (Binford, Jason)
Related: [-]
460 460 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Thu 04/24 1:07 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 24-80052 Solowave Design Holdings Limited for the Quarter Ending: 03/31/2025 filed by Interested Party SierraConstellation Partners, LLC, as Wind Down Administrator. (Binford, Jason)
Related: [-]
459 459 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Thu 04/24 1:05 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 24-80051 Solowave Design Corp. for the Quarter Ending: 03/31/2025 filed by Interested Party SierraConstellation Partners, LLC, as Wind Down Administrator. (Binford, Jason)
Related: [-]
458 458 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Thu 04/24 1:03 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 24-80050 KidKraft International IP Holdings, LLC for the Quarter Ending: 03/31/2025 filed by Interested Party SierraConstellation Partners, LLC, as Wind Down Administrator. (Binford, Jason)
Related: [-]
457 457 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Thu 04/24 1:02 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 24-80049 KidKraft Partners, LLC for the Quarter Ending: 03/31/2025 filed by Interested Party SierraConstellation Partners, LLC, as Wind Down Administrator. (Binford, Jason)
Related: [-]
456 456 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Thu 04/24 1:00 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 24-80048 KidKraft International Holdings, Inc. for the Quarter Ending: 03/31/2025 filed by Interested Party SierraConstellation Partners, LLC, as Wind Down Administrator. (Binford, Jason)
Related: [-]
455 455 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Thu 04/24 12:57 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 24-80047 KidKraft Intermediate Holdings, LLC for the Quarter Ending: 03/31/2025 filed by Interested Party SierraConstellation Partners, LLC, as Wind Down Administrator. (Binford, Jason)
Related: [-]
454 454 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Thu 04/24 12:55 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 24-80046 KidKraft Europe, LLC for the Quarter Ending: 03/31/2025 filed by Interested Party SierraConstellation Partners, LLC, as Wind Down Administrator. (Binford, Jason)
Related: [-]
453 453 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Thu 04/24 12:53 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 24-80053 Solowave Design Inc. for the Quarter Ending: 03/31/2025 filed by Interested Party SierraConstellation Partners, LLC, as Wind Down Administrator. (Binford, Jason)
Related: [-]
452 452 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Thu 04/24 12:51 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for the Quarter Ending: 03/31/2025 Case Number 24-80045 KidKraft, Inc. filed by Interested Party SierraConstellation Partners, LLC, as Wind Down Administrator. (Binford, Jason)
Related: [-]
451 451 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Thu 04/24 11:28 AM
Amended Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 24-80053 Solowave Design Inc. for the Quarter Ending: 12/31/2024 filed by Interested Party SierraConstellation Partners, LLC, as Wind Down Administrator Related [+]. (Binford, Jason)
Related: [-] 422 Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report
450 450 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Thu 04/24 11:26 AM
Amended Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 24-80053 Solowave Design Inc. for the Quarter Ending: 09/30/2024 filed by Interested Party SierraConstellation Partners, LLC, as Wind Down Administrator Related [+]. (Binford, Jason)
Related: [-] 417 Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report
449 449 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Thu 04/24 11:22 AM
Amended Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for the Quarter Ending: 12/31/2024 Case Number 24-80045 KidKraft, Inc. filed by Interested Party SierraConstellation Partners, LLC, as Wind Down Administrator Related [+]. (Binford, Jason)
Related: [-] 421 Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report
448 448 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Thu 04/24 11:20 AM
Amended Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for the Quarter Ending: 09/30/2024 Case Number 24-80045 KidKraft, Inc. filed by Interested Party SierraConstellation Partners, LLC, as Wind Down Administrator Related [+]. (Binford, Jason)
Related: [-] 416 Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report
Monday, April 21, 2025
447 447 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Mon 04/21 4:47 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for the Quarter Ending: 03/31/2025 filed by Interested Party Jiangang Ou, the GUC Trustee for the GUC Trust. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
446 446 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Fri 04/18 2:15 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 24-80055 Solowave International Inc. for the Quarter Ending: 12/31/2024 filed by Interested Party SierraConstellation Partners, LLC, as Wind Down Administrator. (Binford, Jason)
Related: [-]
445 445 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Fri 04/18 2:13 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 24-80044 Solowave International Inc. for the Quarter Ending: 09/30/2024 filed by Interested Party SierraConstellation Partners, LLC, as Wind Down Administrator. (Binford, Jason)
Related: [-]
444 444 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Fri 04/18 2:09 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 24-80054 Solowave Design LP for the Quarter Ending: 12/31/2024 filed by Interested Party SierraConstellation Partners, LLC, as Wind Down Administrator. (Binford, Jason)
Related: [-]
443 443 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Fri 04/18 2:07 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 24-80054 Solowave Design LP for the Quarter Ending: 09/30/2024 filed by Interested Party SierraConstellation Partners, LLC, as Wind Down Administrator. (Binford, Jason)
Related: [-]
442 442 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Fri 04/18 2:04 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 24-80052 Solowave Design Holdings Limited for the Quarter Ending: 12/31/2024 filed by Interested Party SierraConstellation Partners, LLC, as Wind Down Administrator. (Binford, Jason)
Related: [-]
441 441 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Fri 04/18 2:02 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 24-80052 Solowave Design Holdings Limited for the Quarter Ending: 09/30/2024 filed by Interested Party SierraConstellation Partners, LLC, as Wind Down Administrator. (Binford, Jason)
Related: [-]
440 440 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Fri 04/18 2:00 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 24-80051 Solowave Design Corp. for the Quarter Ending: 12/31/2024 filed by Interested Party SierraConstellation Partners, LLC, as Wind Down Administrator. (Binford, Jason)
Related: [-]
439 439 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Fri 04/18 1:58 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 24-80051 Solowave Design Corp. for the Quarter Ending: 09/30/2024 filed by Interested Party SierraConstellation Partners, LLC, as Wind Down Administrator. (Binford, Jason)
Related: [-]
438 438 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Fri 04/18 1:56 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 24-80050 KidKraft International IP Holdings, LLC for the Quarter Ending: 12/31/2024 filed by Interested Party SierraConstellation Partners, LLC, as Wind Down Administrator. (Binford, Jason)
Related: [-]
437 437 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Fri 04/18 1:54 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 24-80050 KidKraft International IP Holdings, LLC for the Quarter Ending: 09/30/2024 filed by Interested Party SierraConstellation Partners, LLC, as Wind Down Administrator. (Binford, Jason)
Related: [-]
436 436 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Fri 04/18 1:52 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 24-80049 KidKraft Partners, LLC for the Quarter Ending: 12/31/2024 filed by Interested Party SierraConstellation Partners, LLC, as Wind Down Administrator. (Binford, Jason)
Related: [-]
435 435 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Fri 04/18 1:50 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 24-80049 KidKraft Partners, LLC for the Quarter Ending: 09/30/2024 filed by Interested Party SierraConstellation Partners, LLC, as Wind Down Administrator. (Binford, Jason)
Related: [-]
434 434 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Fri 04/18 1:48 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 24-80048 KidKraft International Holdings, Inc. for the Quarter Ending: 12/31/2024 filed by Interested Party SierraConstellation Partners, LLC, as Wind Down Administrator. (Binford, Jason)
Related: [-]
433 433 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Fri 04/18 1:45 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 24-80047 KidKraft Intermediate Holdings, LLC for the Quarter Ending: 12/31/2024 filed by Interested Party SierraConstellation Partners, LLC, as Wind Down Administrator. (Binford, Jason)
Related: [-]
432 432 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Fri 04/18 1:42 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 24-80048 KidKraft International Holdings, Inc. for the Quarter Ending: 09/30/2024 filed by Interested Party SierraConstellation Partners, LLC, as Wind Down Administrator. (Binford, Jason)
Related: [-]
431 431 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Fri 04/18 1:39 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 24-80047 KidKraft Intermediate Holdings, LLC for the Quarter Ending: 09/30/2024 filed by Interested Party SierraConstellation Partners, LLC, as Wind Down Administrator. (Binford, Jason)
Related: [-]
430 430 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Fri 04/18 1:37 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 24-80046 KidKraft Europe, LLC for the Quarter Ending: 12/31/2024 filed by Interested Party SierraConstellation Partners, LLC, as Wind Down Administrator. (Binford, Jason)
Related: [-]
429 429 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Fri 04/18 1:34 PM
Amended Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 24-80046 KidKraft Europe, LLC for the Quarter Ending: 09/30/2024 filed by Interested Party SierraConstellation Partners, LLC, as Wind Down Administrator Related [+]. (Binford, Jason)
Related: [-] 428 Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report
428 428 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Fri 04/18 1:29 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 24-80046 KidKraft Europe, LLC for the Quarter Ending: 12/31/2024 filed by Interested Party SierraConstellation Partners, LLC, as Wind Down Administrator. (Binford, Jason)
Related: [-]