Illinois Central District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-10022
Case Filed:May 07, 2024
Last checked: Friday May 10, 2024 2:19 AM CDT
Defendant
Paul Graf (1)
Represented By
Karl W Bryning
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Christopher S McCall
Mccall Law Offices PC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Melissa Ortiz
Us Atty
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/10/2024 3:37 AM CDT
Thursday, April 18, 2024
Arrest of Paul Graf. (AEM) Modified on 4/19/2024 to correct spelling of last name (DW). [1:24-mj-06082-JEH]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Paul Graf (1). (DW) Modified on 4/19/2024 to correct spelling of last name (DW). [1:24-mj-06082-JEH]
Related: [-]
2 2 +++ SEALED DOCUMENT - ORIGINAL COMPLAINT UNREDACTED (DW) [1:24-mj-06082-JEH]
Related: [-]
4 4 +++ SEALED DOCUMENT - DEFENDANT INFORMATION SHEET. (DW) [1:24-mj-06082-JEH]
Related: [-]
5 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley: Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley present in Courtroom C. Parties present via video by AUSA Melissa Ortiz, AFPD Karl Bryning, and Defendant Paul Graf for Initial Appearance held on 4/18/2024. Defendant consents to proceeding via video conference. Defendant advised of the right to counsel. Defendant requests appointed counsel. Court finds Defendant qualifies for appointed counsel and appoints the office of the Federal Public Defender. Defendant advised of the charges against him. Defendant advised of the right to a Preliminary Hearing and right to waive said hearing. Defendant requests a Preliminary Hearing. Case set for Preliminary Hearing on 4/23/2024 at 1:00 PM in Courtroom C in Peoria before Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley. Government requests the detention of the Defendant. Defendant waives Detention Hearing and agrees to detention. Court orders Defendant detained pending resolution of this case. Detention Order to enter. Defendant remanded to the custody of the United States Marshal. Court gives Rule 5(f) advisement. Written Order to enter. Court orders Defendant's criminal history section of the Pretrial Services Report released to counsel. (Tape #PRC: 3:31 p.m.) (FDS) Modified on 4/19/2024 to indicate Defendant requests a Preliminary Hearing. (FDS). [1:24-mj-06082-JEH]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Paul Graf. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 4/18/24. (FDS) [1:24-mj-06082-JEH]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE 5(F) as to Paul Graf. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 4/18/24. (FDS) [1:24-mj-06082-JEH]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
6 6 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 4/18/2024 as to Paul Graf. (AEM) Modified on 4/19/2024 to correct spelling of last name (DW). [1:24-mj-06082-JEH]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
TEXT ORDER granting9 Motion to Substitute Attorney as to Paul Graf (1). Attorney Karl Bryning terminated as counsel of record as Attorney Chris McCall has entered his appearance. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 4/22/24. (WG) [1:24-mj-06082-JEH]
Related: [-]
9 9 MOTION to Substitute Attorney, Karl W. Bryning to be replaced by Christopher S. McCall, by Paul Graf. (McCall, Christopher) [1:24-mj-06082-JEH]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
ORAL MOTION for Detention Hearing by Paul Graf. (FDS) [1:24-mj-06082-JEH]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley: Parties present in open court by AUSA Melissa Ortiz, Attorney Christopher McCall, and Defendant Paul Graf for Preliminary Hearing on 4/23/24. Defendant waives Preliminary Hearing. Court finds there is probable cause and case is bound over to the Grand Jury. Defendant makes oral motion for a Detention Hearing. So Order. Detention Hearing set for 4/26/2024 at 11:30 AM via video conference before Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley. Parties, counsel, and witnesses to appear by video. Participants can log into the video hearing using the Zoom application or Zoom.com and entering the following Meeting ID: 16009516536. The Court will admit you from the waiting room once the hearing is ready to begin. For those participating by telephone, call (551) 285-1373 and enter the Meeting ID when prompted to do so. The public may not attend the hearing by video, but may attend the hearing in person at the United States Courthouse in Peoria, Illinois Courtroom C. Defendant remains in the custody of the United States Marshal. The previously entered Order of Detention remains in full force and effect. (Tape #PRC: 12:58 p.m.) (FDS) [1:24-mj-06082-JEH]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
TEXT ORDER granting10 Motion to Vacate as to Paul Graf (1). Detention Hearing set 4/26/24 at 11:30 AM is VACATED. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 4/26/24. (WG) [1:24-mj-06082-JEH]
Related: [-]
10 10 MOTION to Vacate Detention Hearing by Paul Graf. (McCall, Christopher) [1:24-mj-06082-JEH]
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
11 11 + + PRETRIAL SERVICES REPORT as to Paul Graf (JA) [1:24-mj-06082-JEH]
Related: [-]
12 12 +++ PRETRIAL SERVICES RECOMMENDATION as to Paul Graf. (JA) [1:24-mj-06082-JEH]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
13 13 INDICTMENT as to Paul Graf (1) count(s) 1. (FDS)
Related: [-]
14 14 +++ SEALED DOCUMENT - ORIGINAL DOCUMENT UNREDACTED Indictment (FDS)
Related: [-]
15 15 +++ SEALED DOCUMENT - DEFENDANT INFORMATION SHEET. (FDS)
Related: [-]