Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-00187
Case Filed:May 08, 2024
Last checked: Friday May 10, 2024 2:24 AM CDT
Defendant
Leonardo De Leon-Rosales (1)
Represented By
Corpus Christi Interpreter
contact info
Federal Public Defender - Corpus Christi
contact info
Christopher Atkinson Jenkins
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Young Min C. Burkett
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/10/2024 3:45 AM CDT
Monday, April 15, 2024
Arrest of Leonardo De Leon-Rosales. (asm2) [2:24-mj-00146]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Leonardo De Leon-Rosales (1), filed. (Nueces) Initial Appearance set for 4/17/2024 at 09:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Mitchel Neurock (asm2) [2:24-mj-00146]
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B. Libby) Parties notified. (mej2) [2:24-mj-00146]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
Interpreter needed as to Leonardo De Leon-Rosales. Language: SPANISH. Corpus Christi Interpreter for Leonardo De Leon-Rosales added. (asm2) [2:24-mj-00146]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mitchel Neurock: INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Leonardo De Leon-Rosales (Defendant informed of rights) held on 4/17/2024. Defendant requests appointed counsel. Court grants request for appointment of counsel. Defendant consents to this hearing by video conference. Government moves for detention and requests a continuance. Rights to consular notification given. The Court, on their own motion, grants continuance and sets a detention hearing. Preliminary Examination & Detention Hearing set for 4/22/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Mitchel Neurock Appearances: Liesel Roscher, AUSA; Elizabeth O'Connell for Defendant; USPO: Jesus Botello; USM: Deputy Bailes. (Digital # 9:47-9:52) (ERO: Nelda Garcia) (Interpreter: C. Raber/used) Deft remanded to custody. (asm2) [2:24-mj-00146]
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Christopher Atkinson Jenkins, Federal Public Defender, in case as to Leonardo De Leon-Rosales, filed. (Jenkins, Christopher) [2:24-mj-00146]
Related: [-]
3 3 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Leonardo De Leon-Rosales. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchel Neurock) Parties notified. (asm2) [2:24-mj-00146]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
US ATTORNEY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE. Young Min C. Burkett appearing for USA, filed. (Burkett, Young Min) [2:24-mj-00146]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mitchel Neurock: PRELIMINARY EXAMINATION & DETENTION HEARING as to Leonardo De Leon-Rosales held on 4/22/2024 Defendant waives both hearings in open court. Court accepts waivers. Appearances: Young Min C. Burkett, AUSA; Christopher Jenkins f/Defendant; USPO: Rebecca Cavazos; USM: Deputy Oliver & Tepera. (Digital # 100210:03) (ERO: Martin Solis) (Interpreter: M. Macossay/used) Deft remanded to custody. (asm2) [2:24-mj-00146]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
4 4 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Leonardo De Leon-Rosales, filed. (es6) [2:24-mj-00146]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
5 5 INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Leonardo De Leon-Rosales (1) count(s) 1, filed. (ms2)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment
6 6 US Attys Criminal Docket Sheet as to Leonardo De Leon-Rosales, filed. (ms2)
Related: [-]
7 7 SCHEDULING ORDER as to Leonardo De Leon-Rosales. Motions to Continue the Final Pretrial Conference and Jury Trial, Motions in Limine, Exhibit and Witness Lists, and Proposed Jury Instructions due no later than three (3) days before the Final Pretrial Conference. Arraignment set for 5/15/2024 at 11:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B. Libby.. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/26/2024 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jason B. Libby.. Jury Trial set for 7/8/2024 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B. Libby) Parties notified. (ms2)
Related: [-]