Rutan v. Cast et al
Michigan Western District Court | |
Judge: | Paul L Maloney |
Referred: | Sally J Berens |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00488 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | May 09, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Jun 23, 2024 4:56 AM EDT |
defendant
Michelle Bianchi
|
|
defendant
Marney Cast
|
|
defendant
Abe Dane
|
|
defendant
Andrew Fink
|
|
defendant
Scott Hodsire
|
|
defendant
Stephenie Kyser
|
|
defendant
Brent Leininger
|
|
defendant
Michael Olsaver
|
|
defendant
Unknown Parties
|
|
plaintiff
Jon Paul Rutan
2228 Pondbrooke Dr.
Hillsdale, MI 49242 |
Docket last updated: 09/19/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, September 12, 2024 | ||
54 | 54
motion
Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document)
Mon 09/16 3:29 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to dismiss case without prejudice on defendant Michael Olsaver until the end of statue of limitations or until Plaintiff can find legal counsel with certificate of service thereon by plaintiff Jon Paul Rutan (mlc) Modified text on 9/16/2024 (mlc) |
|
53 | 53
motion
Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document)
Mon 09/16 3:27 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to dismiss case without prejudice on defendants Marney Kast, Abe Dane, Brent Leininger, Stephanie Kyser, Scott Hodshire, Michelle Bianchi until the end of statue of limitations or until Plaintiff can find legal counsel with certificate of service thereon by plaintiff Jon Paul Rutan (mlc) Modified text on 9/16/2024 (mlc) |
|
52 | 52
motion
Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document)
Mon 09/16 3:25 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to dismiss case without prejudice on defendant Andrew Fink until the end of statue of limitations or until Plaintiff can find legal counsel with certificate of service thereon by plaintiff Jon Paul Rutan (mlc) Modified text on 9/16/2024 (mlc) |
|
51 | 51
respm
Response in Opposition
Mon 09/16 3:19 PM
RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim in Lieu of Answer 34 filed by Jon Paul Rutan (mlc) |
|
50 | 50
respm
Response in Opposition
Mon 09/16 3:15 PM
RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim 31 filed by Jon Paul Rutan (mlc) |
|
utility
Copies Mailed
Thu 09/12 2:16 PM
Copy of Stipulation and Order49 sent via U.S. Mail to Jon Paul Rutan (mlc) |
||
Wednesday, September 11, 2024 | ||
49 | 49
order
Stipulation and Order
Wed 09/11 2:03 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal as to defendant Michael Olsaver; dismissing30 motion to dismiss as moot; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) |
|
48 | 48
motion
Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document)
Wed 09/11 9:42 AM
PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER for Dismissal as to Defendant Olsaver without Prejudice by defendant Michael Olsaver (Campbell, Donald) |