Texas Western District Court
Judge:Alan D Albright
Case #: 6:24-cv-00249
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:100 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:May 10, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 06, 2024 4:03 AM CST
Defendant
Giga-Byte Technology Co., Ltd.
Represented By
David K. Ludwig
Hill, Kertscher & Wharton, LLP
contact info
Steven G. Hill
Hill, Kertscher & Wharton, LLP
contact info
Henry Artoush Ohanian
Ohanianip
contact info
Plaintiff
ACQIS LLC
a Texas limited liability company c/o 303 Colorado Street Suite 2400
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Paige Arnette Amstutz
Scott, Douglass & Mcconnico, LLP
contact info
Case L. Collard
Dorsey & Whitnay LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
31 31 motion Transfer Case Mon 04/28 6:23 PM
MOTION to Transfer Case by Giga-Byte Technology Co., Ltd.(a Taiwanese corporation).(Ohanian, Henry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Eric Lu,
Att: 2 Affidavit of NG Young,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
30 30 misc Response Tue 04/15 4:41 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition to27 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by ACQIS LLC. (Collard, Case)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
29 29 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/07 5:04 PM
ORDER GRANTING21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Robert J.M. Lee for ACQIS LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (cap)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
28 28 6 pgs order Order on Motion for Entry of Scheduling Order Wed 04/02 3:42 PM
ORDER GRANTING26 Motion for Entry of Scheduling Order. Consent to Trial by Magistrate due by 6/26/2026. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/28/2026 09:00 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Jury Selection set for 9/22/2026 09:00AM before Judge Derek T. Gilliland. Jury Trial set for 9/22/2026 09:00 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Markman Hearing set for 9/19/2025 09:00 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Amended Pleadings due by 1/26/2026. Joinder of Parties due by 10/31/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 6/26/2026. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (cav)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
27 27 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Tue 04/01 3:29 PM
AMENDED ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand and , COUNTERCLAIM against ACQIS LLC by Giga-Byte Technology Co., Ltd..(Ohanian, Henry)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Entry of Scheduling Order Tue 04/01 2:26 PM
Joint MOTION for Entry of Scheduling Order Deadlines by ACQIS LLC.(Collard, Case)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
25 25 misc Status Report Tue 04/01 2:24 PM
STATUS REPORT (Case Readiness) by ACQIS LLC. (Collard, Case)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
24 24 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Counterclaim Fri 03/21 3:52 AM
Giga-Byte Technology Co., Ltd.'s ANSWER to15 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against ACQIS LLC by Giga-Byte Technology Co., Ltd..(Ohanian, Henry)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
23 23 transcript Transcript Filed Thu 03/13 12:30 PM
Transcript filed of Proceedings held on 3-10-25, Proceedings Transcribed: Motion Hearing. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kristie Davis (kmdaviscsr@yahoo.com), Telephone number: 2546660904. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 4/3/2025, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/14/2025, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/11/2025, (kd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 03/11 10:56 AM
Text Order DENYING16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim entered by Judge Alan D Albright. For the reasons stated on the record at the Motion Hearing held on 3/10/2025, the Court DENIED the Motion on the record. No written order forthcoming. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (zelc)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
22 22 minutes Motion Hearing Mon 03/10 2:31 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alan D Albright. Motion Hearing held (Public Zoom) on 3/10/2025. PARTIES ANNOUNCE READY. STATEMENTS AND ARGUMENTS OF COUNSEL HEARD. THE 12(b)6 MOTION DENIED. PARTIES WILL CONFER AND SUBMIT A SCHEDULING ORDER. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter Kristie Davis.) (cap)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/10 12:36 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Case L. Collard for Robert J.M. Lee ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-19891949) by on behalf of ACQIS LLC. (Collard, Case)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
20 20 1 pgs order Order Setting Hearing on Motion Fri 03/07 2:57 PM
ORDER Setting Hearing on16 Second Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant To Rule 12(b)(6) : Motion Hearing set for 3/10/2025 01:30 PM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (cav)
Related: [-]
19 19 1 pgs order Order Setting Hearing on Motion Fri 03/07 2:38 PM
ORDER SETTING MOTION HEARING [PUBLIC ZOOM] on16 Second Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant To Rule 12(b)(6) : Motion Hearing set for 3/10/2025 01:00 PM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (cav)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 03/07 2:00 PM
Text Order MOOTING12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in light of Amended Complaint entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (zelc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
18 18 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 11/26 5:07 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Giga-Byte Technology Co., Ltd., re16 Second Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant To Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Giga-Byte Technology Co., Ltd. (Ohanian, Henry)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
17 17 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 11/19 6:09 PM
Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by ACQIS LLC, re16 Second Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant To Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Giga-Byte Technology Co., Ltd.(Collard, Case)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
16 16 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 11/05 1:56 PM
Second Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant To Rule 12(b)(6) by Giga-Byte Technology Co., Ltd..(Ohanian, Henry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
15 15 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 10/22 5:01 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement against Giga-Byte Technology Co., Ltd. amending, filed by ACQIS LLC.(Amstutz, Paige)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 10/02 2:53 PM
ORDER GRANTING11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David K. Ludwig. Attorney added for Giga-Byte Technology Co., Ltd. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District . Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot2)
Related: [-]
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 10/02 2:52 PM
ORDER GRANTING10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Steven G. Hill. Attorney added for Giga-Byte Technology Co., Ltd. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District . Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
12 12 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 10/01 5:39 PM
Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Giga-Byte Technology Co., Ltd..(Ohanian, Henry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 10/01 5:27 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Henry Artoush Ohanian for David K. Ludwig ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-19295592) by on behalf of Giga-Byte Technology Co., Ltd..(Ohanian, Henry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit DKL Attorney Court Admission List,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
10 10 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 10/01 5:24 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Henry Artoush Ohanian for Steven G. Hill ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-19295573) by on behalf of Giga-Byte Technology Co., Ltd..(Ohanian, Henry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit SGH Attorney Court Admission List,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Saturday, September 28, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Sat 09/28 12:53 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Henry Artoush Ohanian on behalf of Giga-Byte Technology Co., Ltd.. Attorney Henry Artoush Ohanian added to party Giga-Byte Technology Co., Ltd.(pty:dft) (Ohanian, Henry)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 07/19 12:09 PM
Text Order GRANTING8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. BEFORE THE COURT is the Unopposed Motion for Extension of Deadline for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint for Patent Infringement (the Unopposed Motion). The Court has considered the Unopposed Motion and finds that it should be and is hereby GRANTED. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the deadline for Defendant Giga-Byte Technology Co., Ltd. to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint for Patent Infringement is extended until October 4, 2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (walc)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Answer Deadline Fri 07/19 1:54 PM
Reset Deadlines: Giga-Byte Technology Co., Ltd. answer due 10/4/2024. (zv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 07/18 8:14 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, Unopposed Motion for Extension of Deadline for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint for Patent Infringement by ACQIS LLC.(Amstutz, Paige)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
7 7 service Acknowledgment of Service Wed 07/10 10:58 AM
Acknowledgment of Service returned by ACQIS LLC. Giga-Byte Technology Co., Ltd. served on 7/1/2024, answer due 7/31/2024.(Amstutz, Paige)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1
Monday, May 13, 2024
5 5 notice Notice Mon 05/13 11:45 AM
NOTICE Plaintiff's Notice of Related Cases by ACQIS LLC (Amstutz, Paige)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued Mon 05/13 4:25 PM
Summons Issued as to Giga-Byte Technology Co., Ltd. (zv)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 05/10 3:55 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by ACQIS LLC. (Amstutz, Paige)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7) Fri 05/10 3:53 PM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by ACQIS LLC identifying Corporate Parent ACQIS Technology, Inc. for ACQIS LLC. (Amstutz, Paige)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Fri 05/10 3:51 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Amstutz, Paige)
Related: [-]
1 1 46 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 05/10 3:48 PM
COMPLAINT Complaint for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-18751150), filed by ACQIS LLC.(Amstutz, Paige)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 2,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 3,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 4
misc Remark (No Doc#) Mon 05/13 9:52 AM
Please remember to comply with the standing orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (zv)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 05/13 3:31 PM
Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (zv)
Related: [-]