Watford et al v. The 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-02898 |
Nature of Suit | 245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | May 09, 2024 |
Case in other court: | New York Southern, 1:24-cv-03085 |
Last checked: Sunday Jun 23, 2024 5:29 AM EDT |
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
The 3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products, LP
|
|
Defendant
E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Doe Defendants 1-20
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
as successor in interest to Sandoz Chemical Corporation 4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Plaintiff
Walter Rogers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jerry Stallworth
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Willard Slaughter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wesley Sellers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Handley Sayre
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Sarll
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fred Tennison
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Herbert Roberts
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Randy Reese
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Claudia Ponko
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George Parrish
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dominic Pagliuso
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Neal Nesset
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott Whitmer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rose Talbot
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Watford
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Withrow
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Louis Walker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Derry Upshaw
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Valenzuela
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Greg Vanhooser
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Yannuzzi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patsy Young
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Wrisley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Curtis Wright
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Womble
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Vaughan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kathleen Villalobos
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Darius Cook
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Hayes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roderick Green
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gregory Frazier
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Susan Finucane
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Ferebee
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Falzone
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew Crochet
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Corwin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ralph Hensley II
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dale Chester
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gail Caldwell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larry Bynum
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Linwood Brown
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Doe Bridge
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vernon Betts Sr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cheryl Bergan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bruce Baker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott Kochendorfer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Victor Munoz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gene Moore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Middleton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Arthur Maes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary Mack
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Peter Liles
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Lawson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Zane Mustion
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven Kajley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dennis Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leah Janisieksi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Terry Hurko
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tinesha Houston
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alan Holmes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ray Hicks
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
Ray Kyler
Terminated: 06/05/2024
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, September 10, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 09/10 3:56 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Raymond Tardif, Larry Bynum, Neal Nesset, Laurie Urias, Timothy Waldrep, Gloria Mendoza NOTICE OF DISMISSAL BY LISTED PLAINTIFFS ONLY, WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(a)(1)(A)(i) & SECOND AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 28Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Mindicino, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Tuesday, May 28, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 05/28 1:10 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Ray Kyler Without Prejudice Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:24-cv-02898-RMG(Lanciotti, Patrick) |
|
Friday, May 10, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Fri 05/10 2:18 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern (associated as of 5/9/2024), 1:24-cv-03085, Watford et al v. The 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-02898-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
5 | 5
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Fri 05/10 2:08 PM
Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:24-cv-03085. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Thursday, May 09, 2024 | ||
4 | 4 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina. (Signed by MDL Panel on 5/7/2024) (vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/10/2024.] | |
MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina.(vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/10/2024.] | ||
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/10/2024.] | ||
Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/10/2024.] | ||
Case Designated ECF. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/10/2024.] | ||
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
3 | 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The 3M Company..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/10/2024.] | |
2 | 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/10/2024.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 152081/2024. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29256385).Document filed by The 3M Company..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/10/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Watford Complaint |