Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 4:24-mj-00160
Case Filed:Apr 12, 2024
Terminated:Apr 19, 2024
Last checked: Sunday May 12, 2024 2:23 AM CDT
Plaintiff
USA
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Elijah Johnson (1)
Terminated: 04/19/2024
Represented By
Federal Public Defender - Houston
contact info
Marjorie A Meyers
Federal Public Defender
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2024 2:51 AM CDT
Friday, April 12, 2024
Arrest (Rule 40) of Elijah Johnson, filed. (glk4)
Related: [-]
***Set/Reset Hearings as to Elijah Johnson: Initial Appearance - Rule 40 set for 4/12/2024 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8B before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison (glk4)
Related: [-]
Arrest of Elijah Johnson, filed. (rrc3)
Related: [-]
INITIAL APPEARANCE IN RULE 5(c)(3) Minute Entry for proceedings held on 4/12/2024 before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison as to Elijah Johnson. Defendant first appearance on Superseding Indictment from the Ohio Northern District Court 1:23-cr-662 and advised of rights/charges. Defendant requests appointed counsel, Financial Affidavit executed on the record, Defendant appeared with counsel. Order appointing FPD to be entered, Order of Temporary Detention to be entered. Identity and Detention Hearing set for 4/16/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray Parties orally consented to appear by video on the record. Rule 5(f) order orally given. Rule 5(f) written order to be entered. CJA-23 incomplete. Appearances: AUSA Anna Elizabeth Swanson for USA; AFPD Heather Hughes for Defendant.(ERO:Yes) (Interpreter: No) Defendant remanded to custody, filed. (rrc3)
Related: [-]
1 1 Superseding Indictment form Northern District of Ohio, Eastern Division as to Elijah Johnson, filed. (glk4)
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant issued 4/3/2024; Returned Executed on 4/11/2024 as to Elijah Johnson. Defendant was arrested in Houston, TX. Document restricted from PACER under privacy policy., filed. (glk4)
Related: [-]
3 3 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Elijah Johnson, filed.
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER. ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) Parties notified. (rrc3)
Related: [-]
5 5 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Elijah Johnson. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) Parties notified. (rrc3)
Related: [-]
6 6 Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing as to Elijah Johnson Identity and Detention Hearing set for 4/16/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) Parties notified. (rrc3)
Related: [-]