River Canyon Total Return Bond Fund et al v. Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | George H Wu |
Referred: | Charles F Eick |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03993 |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Cause | 15:77 Securities Fraud |
Case Filed: | May 13, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Jun 29, 2024 4:22 AM PDT |
Defendant
Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Canyon Distressed Opportunity Master Fund III, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Canyon NZ-Dof Investing L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
River Canyon Total Return Bond Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Canyon Distressed TX A LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Canyon Distressed TX B LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Canyon-EDOF Master L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Wed 09/04 1:28 PM
REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 20 filed by Defendant Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC.(Jacobsen, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Reply in Support of Request for Judicial Notice, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Paul Rugani in Support of Reply in Support of Request for Judicial Notice | ||
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
respm
Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Wed 08/14 5:32 PM
OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 20 filed by Plaintiffs Canyon Distressed Opportunity Master Fund III, L.P., Canyon Distressed TX A LLC, Canyon Distressed TX B LLC, Canyon NZ-Dof Investing L.P., Canyon-EDOF Master L.P., River Canyon Total Return Bond Fund.(Gradman, Isaac) |
|
Att: 1 Opposition to RJN, | ||
Att: 2 Gradman Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Frazeur Declaration, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit A to Frazeur Declaration | ||
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 07/17 11:21 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, identifying Credit Suisse (USA) LLC, Credit Suisse Holdings (USA), Inc., UBS Americas Holding LLC; UBS AG, UBS Group AG. (Jacobsen, Richard) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
order
Dismiss Case
Wed 07/17 11:20 AM
ORDER by Judge George H Wu: Granting20 Parties' MOTION to Dismiss Briefing Schedule. The hearing on Defendants Motion to Dismiss is set for September 19, 2024 at 8:30 am PT. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb) |
|
22 | 22
3
pgs
stip
Order
Tue 07/16 11:40 AM
Joint STIPULATION for Order Granting Parties' Motion To Dismiss Briefing Schedule filed by Defendant Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC.(Jacobsen, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
21 | 21
notice
Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Tue 07/16 9:00 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 20 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7-1.1 no notice of interested parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (aco) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Dismiss Case
Mon 07/15 7:03 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC. Motion set for hearing on 9/19/2024 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Jacobsen, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 to Memorandum of Points and Authorities, | ||
Att: 3 Request for Judicial Notice, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit A to Request for Judicial Notice, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit B to Request for Judicial Notice, | ||
Att: 6 Proposed Order | ||
19 | 19
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 07/15 10:41 AM
ORDER by Judge George H Wu: granting18 Non-Resident Attorney Richard Jacobsen APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendant Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, designating Paul Rugani as local counsel. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY (ak) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Fri 07/12 2:40 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Richard A. Jacobsen to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 7/11/2024, Receipt No. 37812563) filed by Defendant Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC. (Rugani, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
17 | 17
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 07/12 12:11 PM
ORDER by Judge George H Wu: granting15 Non-Resident Attorney Jennifer M. Keighley APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendant Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, designating Paul Rugani as local counsel. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY (ak) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form
Fri 07/12 12:02 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Richard A. Jaccobsen to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-37812563)14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Docket text and document conflict; re name of attorney. (ak) |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Thu 07/11 11:25 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jennifer M. Keighley to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-37812774) filed by Defendant Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC. (Rugani, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
14 | 14
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Thu 07/11 11:20 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Richard A. Jaccobsen to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-37812563) filed by Defendant Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC. (Attorney Paul Francis Rugani added to party Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC (pty:dft)) (Rugani, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, May 20, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
10
pgs
order
Order
Mon 05/20 1:09 PM
STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth "Local Rules") 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco) |
|
Friday, May 17, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 05/17 10:51 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Canyon Distressed Opportunity Master Fund III, L.P., River Canyon Total Return Bond Fund, Canyon Distressed TX B LLC, Canyon Distressed TX A LLC, Canyon NZ-Dof Investing L.P., Canyon-EDOF Master L.P.. upon Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/16/2024, answer due 7/15/2024. Waiver of Service signed by Richard Jacobsen. (Gradman, Isaac) |
|
Wednesday, May 15, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Issued
Wed 05/15 9:35 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC. (aco) |
|
Tuesday, May 14, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Summons Request
Tue 05/14 4:25 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,1 filed by Plaintiffs Canyon Distressed Opportunity Master Fund III, L.P., Canyon Distressed TX A LLC, Canyon Distressed TX B LLC, Canyon NZ-Dof Investing L.P., Canyon-EDOF Master L.P., River Canyon Total Return Bond Fund. (Gradman, Isaac) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Deficiency in Summons
Tue 05/14 3:42 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request,4 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. Please remove et al from the caption. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Tue 05/14 2:56 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) |
|
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 05/14 2:55 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 05/14 2:54 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (ghap) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Tue 05/14 9:15 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael Tracht counsel for Plaintiffs Canyon Distressed Opportunity Master Fund III, L.P., Canyon Distressed TX (A) LLC, Canyon Distressed TX (B) LLC, Canyon NZ-Dof Investing L.P., Canyon-EDOF (Master) L.P., River Canyon Total Return Bond Fund. Adding Michael E. Tracht as counsel of record for River Canyon Total Return Bond Fund, Canyon NZ-DOF Investing L.P., Canyon Distressed TX (A) LLC, Canyon Distressed TX (B) LLC, Canyon-EDOF (Master) L.P., and Canyon Distressed Opportunity Master Fund III, L.P. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs River Canyon Total Return Bond Fund, Canyon NZ-DOF Investing L.P., Canyon Distressed TX (A) LLC, Canyon Distressed TX (B) LLC, Canyon-EDOF (Master) L.P., and Canyon Distressed Opportunity Master Fund III, L.P.. (Attorney Michael Tracht added to party Canyon Distressed Opportunity Master Fund III, L.P.(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Tracht added to party Canyon Distressed TX (A) LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Tracht added to party Canyon Distressed TX (B) LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Tracht added to party Canyon NZ-Dof Investing L.P.(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Tracht added to party Canyon-EDOF (Master) L.P.(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Tracht added to party River Canyon Total Return Bond Fund(pty:pla))(Tracht, Michael) |
|
Monday, May 13, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Mon 05/13 7:55 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,1 filed by Plaintiffs Canyon Distressed Opportunity Master Fund III, L.P., Canyon Distressed TX (A) LLC, Canyon Distressed TX (B) LLC, Canyon NZ-Dof Investing L.P., Canyon-EDOF (Master) L.P., River Canyon Total Return Bond Fund. (Gradman, Isaac) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 05/13 7:50 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Canyon Distressed Opportunity Master Fund III, L.P., Canyon Distressed TX (A) LLC, Canyon Distressed TX (B) LLC, Canyon NZ-Dof Investing L.P., Canyon-EDOF (Master) L.P., River Canyon Total Return Bond Fund, identifying listed parties. (Gradman, Isaac) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 05/13 7:42 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Canyon Distressed Opportunity Master Fund III, L.P., Canyon Distressed TX (A) LLC, Canyon Distressed TX (B) LLC, Canyon NZ-Dof Investing L.P., Canyon-EDOF (Master) L.P., River Canyon Total Return Bond Fund. (Gradman, Isaac) |
|
1 | 1
81
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 05/13 7:37 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37462305 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Canyon Distressed Opportunity Master Fund III, L.P., River Canyon Total Return Bond Fund, Canyon Distressed TX (B) LLC, Canyon Distressed TX (A) LLC, Canyon NZ-Dof Investing L.P., Canyon-EDOF (Master) L.P.. (Attorney Isaac M Gradman added to party Canyon Distressed Opportunity Master Fund III, L.P.(pty:pla), Attorney Isaac M Gradman added to party Canyon Distressed TX (A) LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Isaac M Gradman added to party Canyon Distressed TX (B) LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Isaac M Gradman added to party Canyon NZ-Dof Investing L.P.(pty:pla), Attorney Isaac M Gradman added to party Canyon-EDOF (Master) L.P.(pty:pla), Attorney Isaac M Gradman added to party River Canyon Total Return Bond Fund(pty:pla))(Gradman, Isaac) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 9, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 |