Lane v. Walsh et al
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Julia E Kobick |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-11275 |
Nature of Suit | 362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | May 13, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jul 08, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Jun 29, 2024 7:33 AM EDT |
Defendant
Nick Collins
|
|
Defendant
Doctor from Adolescent Department
|
|
Defendant
Joan Marie Duffy
|
|
Defendant
Randi H Goldman
|
|
Defendant
Principal Kendy Elementary School
|
|
Defendant
Supervisor, Training Inc - Sister
|
|
Defendant
Martin Joseph Walsh
|
|
Plaintiff
Luanita Lane
369 Centre Street
Dorchester, MA 02152 |
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
appeal
USCA Case Number
Thu 07/18 3:24 PM
USCA Case Number 24-1674 for7 Notice of Appeal filed by Luanita Lane. (Paine, Matthew) |
|
8 | 8
appeal
Abbreviated Electronic Appeal Record Sent to USCA
Thu 07/18 2:00 PM
Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re7 Notice of Appeal. (Paine, Matthew) |
|
7 | 7
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Thu 07/18 11:41 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to4 Memorandum and Order,5 Order Dismissing Case by Luanita Lane NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at[LINK:http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov] MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf. US District Court Clerk to deliver official record to Court of Appeals by 8/7/2024. (Kelly, Danielle) |
|
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Copy Mailed
Mon 07/08 7:22 PM
Copy mailed Order4 and5 TO: Luanita Lane 369 Centre Street Dorchester, MA 02122on 7-9-24. (Castilla, Francis) |
|
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 07/08 6:32 PM
District Judge Julia E. Kobick: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE(PSSA, 4) |
|
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 07/08 6:31 PM
District Judge Julia E. Kobick: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. This action is DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i). (PSSA, 4) |
|
Tuesday, May 14, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Tue 05/14 11:32 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Julia E. Kobick assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Cowan, Nicole) |
|
Monday, May 13, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 05/14 11:19 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Luanita Lane.(Phillips, Sophie) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 05/14 11:18 AM
COMPLAINT against Supervisor, Training Inc - Sister, Joan Marie Duffy, Principal Kendy Elementary School, Martin Joseph Walsh, Doctor from Adolescent Department, Randi H Goldman, Nick Collins, filed by Luanita Lane.(Phillips, Sophie) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Category Form |