California Central District Court
Judge:Consuelo B Marshall
Referred: Alicia G Rosenberg
Case #: 2:24-cv-04078
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:May 16, 2024
Terminated:Sep 13, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 12, 2024 12:16 AM PST
Defendant
Systems and Services Technologies, Inc.
Plaintiff
Jason Sandford
Represented By
Matthew R. Snyder
Law Offices Of Todd M. Friedman, P.C.
contact info
Todd M Friedman
Law Offices Of Todd Friedman PC
contact info
Adrian Robert Bacon
Law Offices Of Todd Friedman PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, September 13, 2024
11 11 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Fri 09/13 11:52 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Jason Sandford. Dismissal is With Prejudice. (Friedman, Todd)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
10 10 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Order to Show Cause Tue 07/30 11:51 AM
IN CHAMBERS - Order To Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. In the present case, it appears that one or more of these time periods has not been met. Accordingly, the court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing on or before SEPTEMBER 13, 2024 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. As an alternative to a written response by plaintiff(s), the Court will consider the filing of one of the following, as an appropriate response to this Order To Show Cause, on or before the above date, as evidence that the matter is being prosecuted diligently: Proof(s) of service of summons and complaint on the defendant(s):An answer by the following defendant(s): In cases removed from State Court, responsive pleadings filed by all defendants; Plaintiff's application for entry of default pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; Plaintiff's request that the clerk enter default judgment or plaintiff's noticed motion for entry of default judgment pursuant to Rule 55b of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. It is plaintiff's responsibility to respond promptly to all Orders and to prosecute the action diligently, including filing proofs of service and stipulations extending time to respond. No oral argument of this matter will be heard unless ordered by the Court. The Order will stand submitted upon the of a responsive pleading or motion on or before the date upon which a response by plaintiff(s) is due. This action will be dismissed if the above mentioned documents are not filed by the date indicated above. IT IS SO ORDERED. See order for more information. (shb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 05/23 3:45 PM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. It controls this case and may differ in some respects from the Local Rules. See order for details. (ys)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 05/17 10:55 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Systems and Services Technologies, Inc.. (sh)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 05/17 10:53 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 05/17 10:52 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 05/17 10:52 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (sh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
4 4 notice Summons Request Thu 05/16 12:02 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Jason Sandford. (Friedman, Todd)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 05/16 12:00 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jason Sandford, identifying Sytems & Services Technologies, INC.. (Friedman, Todd)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 05/16 11:57 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jason Sandford. (Friedman, Todd)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 05/16 11:56 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37482495 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Jason Sandford. (Attorney Todd M Friedman added to party Jason Sandford(pty:pla))(Friedman, Todd)
Related: [-]