New York Southern District Court
Judge:J Paul Oetken
Case #: 1:24-cv-03814
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:May 16, 2024
Terminated:Aug 07, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 12, 2024 3:37 AM EST
Defendant
Top Guard Technologies, LLC
Plaintiff
Donna Hedges
On Behalf Of Herself And All Other Persons Similarly Situated c/o Gottlieb & Assoiciates PLLC 150 E. 18 St.
New York, NY 10003
Represented By
Jeffrey Michael Gottlieb
Jeffrey M. Gottlieb, Esq.
contact info
Michael A. LaBollita
Gottlieb & Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 08/07 1:09 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Top Guard Technologies, LLC. Document filed by Donna Hedges. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(LaBollita, Michael)
Related: [-]
Sunday, July 28, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Settlement Sun 07/28 1:05 AM
NOTICE of Settlement . Document filed by Donna Hedges..(Gottlieb, Dana)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
5 5 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 05/17 5:19 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(LaBollita, Michael)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 05/17 3:35 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Top Guard Technologies, LLC..(pc)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/17 12:10 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Michael Gottlieb on behalf of Donna Hedges..(Gottlieb, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Fri 05/17 2:42 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 05/17 2:42 PM
Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 05/17 2:42 PM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Fri 05/17 2:43 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Michael A. LaBollita. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney to Submit/File Civil Cover Sheet Fri 05/17 2:43 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Michael A. LaBollita. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 05/16 11:13 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Top Guard Technologies, LLC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Donna Hedges..(LaBollita, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 29 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 05/16 10:15 PM
COMPLAINT against Top Guard Technologies, LLC. Document filed by Donna Hedges..(LaBollita, Michael)
Related: [-]