Marshall et al v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03025 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | May 14, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Alabama Northern, 2:24-cv-00458 |
Last checked: Saturday Jun 29, 2024 8:49 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
|
|
Defendant
Allstar Fire Equipment
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
CB Garment Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corp
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Daikin America Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
EI Du Pont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Fire Service Plus Inc
|
|
Defendant
Fire-Dex LLC
780 Progress Dr.
Medina, OH 44256 |
|
Defendant
Globe Manufacturing Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Products USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
Innotex Corp
|
|
Defendant
Johnson Controls Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC
|
|
Defendant
LN Curtis & Sons
|
|
Defendant
Lion Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
Mallory Safety and Supply LLC
|
|
Defendant
Milliken & Company
|
|
Defendant
Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Municipal Emergency Services Inc
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
PBI Performance Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Perimeter Solutions LP
|
|
Defendant
Ricochet Manufacturing Co Inc
|
|
Defendant
Safety Components Fabric Technologies Inc
|
|
Defendant
Southern Mills Inc
|
|
Defendant
Stedfast USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Veridian Limited
|
|
Defendant
WL Gore & Associates Inc
|
|
Defendant
Witmer Public Safety Group
|
|
Plaintiff
George P Keary
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Kellianen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Kelly
234560 MacDougall Correctional Institution 1516 Old Gilliard Road
Ridgeville, SC 29472 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lawrence Kempert
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patrick Kerley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gregory Gerard Kernan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Killen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ken Kingman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeff Kinkaid
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James J Klegman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Earl Michael Patrick Knox
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary Koch
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Kollar
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timothy Mickey Kozar
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephen John Kubricki
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bernard Kupiec
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Allen Lain
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Wayne Lancaster
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Curtis R Landon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George E Lange
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Randy K Larson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Janson Lasalle
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wendy Lattimer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Lavigne
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Arthur Edward Leecock Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Legg
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Orson Lemos
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Craig Leonard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Adrienne Lewis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donald Libby
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ryan Lightle
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephen Liptak Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Reuben Little
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Russell W Livingston Sr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Lockner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeremy Long
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Long
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Harold W Longacre
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jason Francis Lupiani
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alan Machiela
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Dale Macy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Johnathan Maddox
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Albert W Maki
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Malone
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shawn Manning
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles C Marshall
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Martin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Martin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kelly A Martinez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kendel Mays
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James McGregor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Lee Mccalmon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jessica Mcclellan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patrick Mcclellan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Mcconnel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Lamar Mccrary
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Mcdonald
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Mcgough
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Naomi Mcintosh
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Peter Mckinney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Henry J Melvin III
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Paul Meyerhoefer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Grant Michael
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Seddrick Miley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pat Miller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sherlock Miller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steve Miller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Miller Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vahl Mills
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Allen Milner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gregory Mims
421 Seccession St
Abbeville, SC 29620 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donna Molleur
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Money
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Howard Montaigne Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Corry Moore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Randall Perry Moore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Moore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timothy Lee Moose
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Jason Morgan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donald Morley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew P Morrow
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dora Jane Mose
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Isidoro Munoz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian P Murphy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wunnie Murray Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Nance
Greenville County Detention Center 20 McGee Street
Greenville, SC 29601 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Needham
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffrey Nelson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Craig Newsome
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jerald Norvell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Nuzzolo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George O'gar
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alan J O'neal Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel O'neill
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jordan Oakes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shanneal Ocular
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert W Oliver
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William L Oliver
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Oravitz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bruce Owens
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sheree Owens
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patrick Palifka
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Peter Anthony Palluccio
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trevor Palmer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Harvey Parker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Parker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roy Elliot Pearl
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Clarence Perry
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Perry
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sherman Peters
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Peterson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Pierce
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Piskura
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrew Plumlee
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Isaac Poling
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rudolph Postell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fard Potts
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kendra D Powell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul W Pownall
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eddie T Prewitt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dennis E Pringle
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Propes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeff La Viola
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, September 09, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 09/09 10:22 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kenneth Charles Shaw Et al., Edwin Gomez, Sr, Ronald Spontak Et al., Brian James Rizner Et al., Terri Smith, Robert Turley, Christopher Burris Et al., John Dunn, Kathy Battle, David C Bolt, Paul A Brady, Raegan Dowdell, Tommie Reese, Sharon Sizer, Joseph Michauskas Et al., Gary Hanna Et al., John Belton Et al., Craig Tully, Abel Perez, Allen Kairis, Andrew Plumlee, RUSSELL LEE LORD, Teresa Harrell, Nina Jones, John Perez, Benjamin Smith, Jr, Dwight Taylor, Steve Dubosky, Larry Beemer Et al., Keith Alan Bluestein, James Ouzts Et al. Carl Sarvey as to Hanna, et al; Robert Raymond Bonomini as to Shaw, et al; Ellis Nakamura as to Shaw, et al; Melvin Alex Garcia as to Beemer, et al; Kevin Hinzo as to Burris, et al; Randall Jones, Jr., as to Ouzts, et al; Alonzo E. Lagle as to Ouzts, et al; Mitchell Feller as to Belton, et al; Robert C. Powell, Sr. as to Rizner, et al; Joey Rios, III as to Rizner, et al; Chris Ban Noy as to Spontak, et al; Will A. Peden, Jr. as to Spontak, et al; James Desmond Bocek as to Michauskas, et al; Raymond Chenevert as to Michauskas, et al; Eric Cordy as to Michauskas, et al; WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Status Report
Tue 08/27 11:51 PM
STATUS REPORT - General Denial and Statement of Affirmative Defenses by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/27 11:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC, Globe Manufacturing Co LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 08/27 10:26 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent MSA Safety Inc. for Globe Manufacturing Company LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/27 6:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC, Globe Manufacturing Co LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 08/16 10:21 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Roy Prince, Aaron Philip Warnick, William Carlson, Stephen Chick, Michael A Diotte, Jerel Butler, George Culbreth, David Curtis Gorman, Joshua Hamman, Christopher Hulliger, John Belton Et al., Kelly A Martinez, Shanneal Ocular, Richard J. Timmerman, Michelle West, Amanda Young, Shyla Johnson, Vernon Johnson, Christopher Kirschke, April Bijak, Jazemine Adams, Shanti Koko, Ray Leete, Shallen Yazett McKiness, Felix Lang Auguster, Robert Becker, Darryl C Hair, Joseph Heinley, Michael Humphrey, Donald Martin, Richard Parler, Kenneth R Plain, Tracy Dewayne Richards, Daniel W Wilborn, III, Larkin Batten, Jr, Nathaniel Brazell, Glenn Brian, James H Roberts, Dennis Shock Ronald Gayle as to Belton, et al; Lennox Garvin Glft as to Belton, et al; Roy Gilbert as to Belton, et al; Jeffery Milton Gissendanner as to Belton, et al; Everett Grant as to Belton, et al; Jerome James Grasso as to Belton, et al; Donald David Gray as to Belton, et al; Clayton Allen Hall as to Belton, et al; Martin Hall as to Belton, et al; David Allan Hamman as to Belton, et al; James Hanlon as to Belton, et al; WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Friday, June 21, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 06/21 11:34 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by August J Matteis, Jr on behalf of Clarence Perry, Dennis E Pringle(Matteis, August) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Thursday, May 16, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Thu 05/16 9:45 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Alabama Northern (associated as of 5/14/2024), 2:24-cv-00458, Marshall et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-03025-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
6 | 6
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Thu 05/16 9:43 AM
Case transferred in from District of Alabama Northern; Case Number 2:24-cv-00458. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Tuesday, May 14, 2024 | ||
5 | 5 ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of South Carolina for inclusion in MDL 2873; record electronically transferred to Clerk of Court in District of South Carolina. (KAM) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 5/16/2024.] | |
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
4 | 4 TEXT ORDER granting the unopposed3 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants are ORDERED to respond to the complaint within 28 days after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation renders a final decision concerning the transfer of this action to the In re: Aqueous Film-Forming Foams Products Liability Litigation, MDL No. 2873. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden on 04/19/2024. (SUH) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 5/16/2024.] | |
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
3 | 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time 3M Company's Unopposed Initial Motion for Extension of Time by 3M Company. (Radney, W) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 5/16/2024.] | |
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 405, receipt_number AALNDC-4569523. related document1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by 3M Company from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 01-CV-2024-901005.(KNS). (Radney, W) Modified on 4/15/2024.ALND rec#B11043 (KAM). [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 5/16/2024.] | ||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement by 3M Company. (KNS) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 5/16/2024.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by 3M Company from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 01-CV-2024-901005.(KNS) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 5/16/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |