Hill et al v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03026 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1442 Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | May 14, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Alabama Northern, 2:24-cv-00459 |
Last checked: Saturday Jun 29, 2024 8:49 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
Allstar Fire Equipment
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
CB Garment Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corp
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Daikin America Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company
974 Centre Road
Wilmington, DE 19805 |
|
Defendant
Fire Service Plus Inc
|
|
Defendant
Fire-Dex LLC
|
|
Defendant
Globe Manufacturing Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Products USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
Innotex Corp
|
|
Defendant
Johnson Controls Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC
|
|
Defendant
L.N. Curtis & Sons
|
|
Defendant
Lion Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
Mallory Safety and Supply LLC
|
|
Defendant
Milliken & Company
|
|
Defendant
Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Municipal Emergency Services Inc
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
PBI Performance Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Perimeter Solutions LP
|
|
Defendant
Ricochet Manufacturing Co Inc
|
|
Defendant
Safety Components Fabric Technologies Inc
|
|
Defendant
Southern Mills Inc
|
|
Defendant
Stedfast USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Veridian Limited
|
|
Defendant
W.L. Gore & Associates Inc
|
|
Defendant
Witmer Public Safety Group
|
|
Plaintiff
Stephen Donald Delcuze
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Julio Delgado
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Desantis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew T. Dillon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maurice Diluzio
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Dimartino
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dennis Dolgin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larry Doswell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Raegan Dowdell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Aaron Dowell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Downing
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Dunning
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John W. Earley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew Easterbrook
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eddie Wesley Edwards
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vernon Edwards
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Irvin Egan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert E Elmore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Eshnaur
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eric Estrada
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffrey N Ewing
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jamie Mark Farkas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Farmer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fred Fatute
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jackie L. Fears
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dennis Fechter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Fennell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Danny Allen Ferguson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Ferguson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Fernandez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Ferriera
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Fisher
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Flanagan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jerie Fletcher
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gabriel Flores
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edgar Fortes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Fowlkes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Arthur Franklin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Fraser
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carlton Frazier
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carlton Freeman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fred Frey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Buren Fronebarger
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gregory Dale Frykman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony William Furbush
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fred R. Gambrill
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dewayne Eddie Gamez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew Gargagliano
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Garland
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Keith Gerlach
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Ray Gilman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Gilmore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donald Godwin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lakaisha Gooden
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Johnarfin Goodjoint
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Kasse Gordon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Curtis Gorman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Gozowsky
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trustee Mail Courier Ronald Graham
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wayne Michael Granit
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Green
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kyle Greene
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Damian Guptill
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rouben Gutierrez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Martie Hale
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James P. Halpin, Sr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joshua Hamman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larry Duane Hammond
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Pescud Hanes, III
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Byron Hardman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chris Harman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nicholas Wendel Harper
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Langston Harrell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Harrelson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dennis Harris
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Harris
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marvin Hart
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gregory Harte
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Hartley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roger Hartnett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mr Stephen Harvey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Hauck
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gerard Hayes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William L. Hayes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Quinton Heard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eric Henley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tracy Hensel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Hernandez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Hester
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert E. Hildenbrand, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert D. Hill
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vito Hill
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Etosha D. Hinton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jesse L. Hobbs
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jackie Hollen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chrissy Hollett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tony Hollis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ben A. Holmes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bobbi Hood
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Herman C. Hood
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Craig Houghton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Huff
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Craig Hulett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Hulkonen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Hulliger
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fritz Hundley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenyatta Hunter
#240774 Lee Correctional Institution 990 Wisacky Highway
Bishopville, SC 29010 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Keith Hurley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Don Wayne Jackson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Antwan James
272749 Perry Correctional Institution 430 Oaklawn Road
Pelzer, SC 29669 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donald James
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donald C. Jasch
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lareta Jenkins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Milton Ray Jennings
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Calvin Bernard Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William J. Johnson, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elbert L. Johnston
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marvin Dewitt Jolly
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alene Watkins Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Casey Louis Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Keith Jones
216471 Evans Correctional Institution 610 Highway 9 West
Bennettsville, SC 29512 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Captain Percy Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tierney Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Jones
286863 Lee Correctional Institution 990 Wisacky Highway
Bishopville, SC 29010 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Jupiter
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, September 09, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 09/09 10:22 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kenneth Charles Shaw Et al., Edwin Gomez, Sr, Ronald Spontak Et al., Brian James Rizner Et al., Terri Smith, Robert Turley, Christopher Burris Et al., John Dunn, Kathy Battle, David C Bolt, Paul A Brady, Raegan Dowdell, Tommie Reese, Sharon Sizer, Joseph Michauskas Et al., Gary Hanna Et al., John Belton Et al., Craig Tully, Abel Perez, Allen Kairis, Andrew Plumlee, RUSSELL LEE LORD, Teresa Harrell, Nina Jones, John Perez, Benjamin Smith, Jr, Dwight Taylor, Steve Dubosky, Larry Beemer Et al., Keith Alan Bluestein, James Ouzts Et al. Carl Sarvey as to Hanna, et al; Robert Raymond Bonomini as to Shaw, et al; Ellis Nakamura as to Shaw, et al; Melvin Alex Garcia as to Beemer, et al; Kevin Hinzo as to Burris, et al; Randall Jones, Jr., as to Ouzts, et al; Alonzo E. Lagle as to Ouzts, et al; Mitchell Feller as to Belton, et al; Robert C. Powell, Sr. as to Rizner, et al; Joey Rios, III as to Rizner, et al; Chris Ban Noy as to Spontak, et al; Will A. Peden, Jr. as to Spontak, et al; James Desmond Bocek as to Michauskas, et al; Raymond Chenevert as to Michauskas, et al; Eric Cordy as to Michauskas, et al; WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Status Report
Tue 08/27 11:51 PM
STATUS REPORT - General Denial and Statement of Affirmative Defenses by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/27 11:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC, Globe Manufacturing Co LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 08/27 10:26 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent MSA Safety Inc. for Globe Manufacturing Company LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/27 6:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC, Globe Manufacturing Co LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 08/16 10:21 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Roy Prince, Aaron Philip Warnick, William Carlson, Stephen Chick, Michael A Diotte, Jerel Butler, George Culbreth, David Curtis Gorman, Joshua Hamman, Christopher Hulliger, John Belton Et al., Kelly A Martinez, Shanneal Ocular, Richard J. Timmerman, Michelle West, Amanda Young, Shyla Johnson, Vernon Johnson, Christopher Kirschke, April Bijak, Jazemine Adams, Shanti Koko, Ray Leete, Shallen Yazett McKiness, Felix Lang Auguster, Robert Becker, Darryl C Hair, Joseph Heinley, Michael Humphrey, Donald Martin, Richard Parler, Kenneth R Plain, Tracy Dewayne Richards, Daniel W Wilborn, III, Larkin Batten, Jr, Nathaniel Brazell, Glenn Brian, James H Roberts, Dennis Shock Ronald Gayle as to Belton, et al; Lennox Garvin Glft as to Belton, et al; Roy Gilbert as to Belton, et al; Jeffery Milton Gissendanner as to Belton, et al; Everett Grant as to Belton, et al; Jerome James Grasso as to Belton, et al; Donald David Gray as to Belton, et al; Clayton Allen Hall as to Belton, et al; Martin Hall as to Belton, et al; David Allan Hamman as to Belton, et al; James Hanlon as to Belton, et al; WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 08/02 9:24 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Raymond Mims, Ronald Spontak Et al., Frank Rivas, Robert J Zdenek Et al., Bryan Stuart Lenk, Dewayne Eddie Gamez, Karen Louise Montgomery, Joseph Michauskas Et al. William George Middleton as to Spontak, et al; John Leslie Moise as to Spontak, et al; Mark L. Morgan as to Spontak, et al; David Lee Morrison as to Spontak, et al; Daniel John Muder as to Spontak, et al; Robert Dean Murphy as to Spontak, et al; Alan Nelson as to Spontak, et al; Benedict Austin O'Bryan as to Spontak, et al; Ronald Scott Strickland as to Zdenek, et al; Eugene Dyson Taylor as to Zdenek, et al; Alphonso David Thomas as to Zdenek, et al; Jerry Joseph Trstensky, Jr. as to Zdenek, et al; Robert Dwayne Upshaw as to Zdenek, et al; Thurston Randolph Vann as to Zdenek, et al; Robert James Wall as to Zdenek, et al; Ralph Nathaniel Washington as to Zdenek, et al; Donald Weeks as to Zdenek, et al; Randy Welsh as to Zdenek, et al; Donald Carey Whatley as to Zdenek, et al; Roy Fletcher Whitfield as to Zdenek, et al; Jimmie Louis Williams as to Zdenek, et al; Michael Eugene Williams as to Zdenek, et al; Gerald Lamont Wilson as to Zdenek, et al; Alfred Edwin Wollenburg as to Zdenek, et al; James Cecil Young, Jr. as to Zdenek, et al; Ross Zahara as to Zdenek, et al; Richard Allen as to Michauskas, et al; Doye Amerson as to Michauskas, et al; Richard S. Ashford as to Michauskas, et al; Vernard Beddingfield as to Michauskas, et al; John Berg as to Michauskas, et al; William H. Blanchard, Jr. as to Michauskas, et al; Larry Marvin Boelte as to Michauskas, et al; Terry James Bonds as to Michauskas, et al; Bobby Bowden as to Michauskas, et al; Leo John Brand as to Michauskas, et al; Michael Brown as to Michauskas, et al; Jeffrey Brum as to Michauskas, et al; Thomas Burleson as to Michauskas, et al; Henry Junior Cade as to Michauskas, et al; Paul Carney as to Michauskas, et al; Douglas Gordon Corbett as to Michauskas, et al; Edwin Charles Crosby as to Michauskas, et al; WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Thursday, May 16, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Thu 05/16 11:45 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Alabama Northern (associated as of 5/14/2024), 2:24-cv-00459, Hill et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-03026-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
8 | 8
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Thu 05/16 11:41 AM
Case transferred in from District of Alabama Northern; Case Number 2:24-cv-00459. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Tuesday, May 14, 2024 | ||
7 | 7 ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of South Carolina for inclusion in MDL 2873; record electronically transferred to Clerk of Court in District of South Carolina. (KAM) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 5/16/2024.] | |
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
6 | 6 TEXT ORDER: The court GRANTS the unopposed motion for extension of time (doc.3 ) and DIRECTS Defendants to respond to Plaintiffs' complaint within TWENTY-EIGHT (28) after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation renders its final decision concerning transfer of this action. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 04/19/2024. (CLD) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 5/16/2024.] | |
5 | 5 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT : The above-styled civil action has been reassigned to the Honorable Annemarie Carney Axon. Please use case number 2:24-cv-00459- ACA on all subsequent pleadings. (DNW) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 5/16/2024.] | |
4 | 4 TEXT ORDER : The undersigned recuses from this case and asks the Clerk of Court to please randomly reassign this case to another judicial officer. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 4/19/2024. (DNW) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 5/16/2024.] | |
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
3 | 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time (Initial Motion) by 3M Company. (Radney, W) Modified title on 4/19/2024 (KWC, ). [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 5/16/2024.] | |
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 405, receipt_number AALNDC-4569425 (B-11042). related document1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M Company from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 01-cv-2024-901002. filed by 3M Company.(CLD). (Radney, W) Modified on 4/15/2024 (DNW). [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 5/16/2024.] | ||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by 3M Company (CLD) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 5/16/2024.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M Company from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 01-cv-2024-901002. filed by 3M Company.(CLD) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 5/16/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A |