Carr et al v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03027 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | May 14, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Alabama Northern, 2:24-cv-00460 |
Last checked: Saturday Jun 29, 2024 8:49 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
Allstar Fire Equipment
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
CB Garment Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corp
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Daikin America Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company
974 Centre Road
Wilmington, DE 19805 |
|
Defendant
Fire Service Plus Inc
|
|
Defendant
Fire-Dex LLC
780 Progress Dr.
Medina, OH 44256 |
|
Defendant
Globe Manufacturing Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Products USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
Innotex Corp
|
|
Defendant
Johnson Controls Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC
|
|
Defendant
L.N. Curtis & Sons
|
|
Defendant
Lion Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
Mallory Safety and Supply LLC
|
|
Defendant
Milliken & Company
|
|
Defendant
Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Municipal Emergency Services Inc
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
PBI Performance Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Perimeter Solutions LP
|
|
Defendant
Ricochet Manufacturing Co Inc
|
|
Defendant
Safety Components Fabric Technologies Inc
|
|
Defendant
Southern Mills Inc
|
|
Defendant
Stedfast USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Veridian Limited
|
|
Defendant
W.L. Gore & Associates Inc
|
|
Defendant
Witmer Public Safety Group
|
|
Plaintiff
Jazemine Adams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brandon D Alexander-Pryor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Allen
214274 Anderson County Detention Center 1009 County Home Road
Anderson, SC 29625 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Richard Allen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Alloway
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Allsberg
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Ammons
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Anderson, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Crockett Anderson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Anderson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Keith Anderson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Andrews
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donald G Anslow, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Clayton Edward Ard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Arthurs
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kayla Ann Atkinson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donald Austin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Ayala
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Blaine Baker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tracy Baker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Raymond C Balcer, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jaran Ball
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Terry Ballew
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dorian Banfield
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bradley J Banks
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Banta
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Leroy Barnes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brad Barnett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vaughn Eric Barrows
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Terry Bartley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Van Bass
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kathy Battle
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timothy Bauer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew Beard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Beebe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gregory Allen Beeson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Beighley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Peter Bekstrom
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gregory S Belsky
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Robert Bender
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ira Bennett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wade Bennett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven Benton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michel Berenson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Berry
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Franklin Biggs, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lonny Blankenship
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Todd Eugene Blankenship
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Bloodgood
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David C Bolt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Yvette R Bostic
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Boudreau
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Albert Bowmaster
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David A Boyce
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Bradley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul A Brady
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Todd Brady
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patrick Branco
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larry Brantley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Lynn Brewer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephen James Brockway
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Broderick
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bryan Brothers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bobby Brown
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edward Brown
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Lester Brown, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Melvin Denzil Brown
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trevor Clayton Bruce
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Curtis Bryan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James T Bryson, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven B Buckingham
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vincent Bulzomi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tony Wayne Bumgardner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Terrence Burgess
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fred Burnett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jerel Butler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Johnna Butler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Anthony Caldwell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Callihan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alexander Cameron
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Neal Campbell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Campbell
131941 Lieber Correctional Institution PO Box 205
Ridgeville, SC 29472 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lenvill Cantrell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eddie Carr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Carter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Kenneth Carter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Francis Caslin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tracey Casselman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott Castaneda
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Casto
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Acie Catron
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dana M Cella
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Norman B Chapman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Chaussee
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kristine Cihla
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Clark
#48277 A;vin S Glenn Detention Center 201 John Mark Dial Drive
Columbia, SC 29209 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dean Collins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Collins, Sr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mioshi Collins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Conrad Collison
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jerry Dean Combs, Sr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Richard Cometa
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Henry Joseph Comperchio
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edwin Constantine
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul Conway
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roger Cooley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Coon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Harry Ronald Copeland
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew Copeland
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Joseph Cordova
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Cornell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Frank Corso
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Billy Lee Courtney, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Franklin Edward Crawford
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shane Jay Crutcher
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eddie Cruz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George Culbreth
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gale Dalrymple
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Daniels
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Barry Darnall
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jack Daughterty
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Davi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dalton Davis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rhesa Ross Davis, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, September 09, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 09/09 10:22 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kenneth Charles Shaw Et al., Edwin Gomez, Sr, Ronald Spontak Et al., Brian James Rizner Et al., Terri Smith, Robert Turley, Christopher Burris Et al., John Dunn, Kathy Battle, David C Bolt, Paul A Brady, Raegan Dowdell, Tommie Reese, Sharon Sizer, Joseph Michauskas Et al., Gary Hanna Et al., John Belton Et al., Craig Tully, Abel Perez, Allen Kairis, Andrew Plumlee, RUSSELL LEE LORD, Teresa Harrell, Nina Jones, John Perez, Benjamin Smith, Jr, Dwight Taylor, Steve Dubosky, Larry Beemer Et al., Keith Alan Bluestein, James Ouzts Et al. Carl Sarvey as to Hanna, et al; Robert Raymond Bonomini as to Shaw, et al; Ellis Nakamura as to Shaw, et al; Melvin Alex Garcia as to Beemer, et al; Kevin Hinzo as to Burris, et al; Randall Jones, Jr., as to Ouzts, et al; Alonzo E. Lagle as to Ouzts, et al; Mitchell Feller as to Belton, et al; Robert C. Powell, Sr. as to Rizner, et al; Joey Rios, III as to Rizner, et al; Chris Ban Noy as to Spontak, et al; Will A. Peden, Jr. as to Spontak, et al; James Desmond Bocek as to Michauskas, et al; Raymond Chenevert as to Michauskas, et al; Eric Cordy as to Michauskas, et al; WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Status Report
Tue 08/27 11:51 PM
STATUS REPORT - General Denial and Statement of Affirmative Defenses by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/27 11:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC, Globe Manufacturing Co LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 08/27 10:26 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent MSA Safety Inc. for Globe Manufacturing Company LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/27 6:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC, Globe Manufacturing Co LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 08/16 10:21 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Roy Prince, Aaron Philip Warnick, William Carlson, Stephen Chick, Michael A Diotte, Jerel Butler, George Culbreth, David Curtis Gorman, Joshua Hamman, Christopher Hulliger, John Belton Et al., Kelly A Martinez, Shanneal Ocular, Richard J. Timmerman, Michelle West, Amanda Young, Shyla Johnson, Vernon Johnson, Christopher Kirschke, April Bijak, Jazemine Adams, Shanti Koko, Ray Leete, Shallen Yazett McKiness, Felix Lang Auguster, Robert Becker, Darryl C Hair, Joseph Heinley, Michael Humphrey, Donald Martin, Richard Parler, Kenneth R Plain, Tracy Dewayne Richards, Daniel W Wilborn, III, Larkin Batten, Jr, Nathaniel Brazell, Glenn Brian, James H Roberts, Dennis Shock Ronald Gayle as to Belton, et al; Lennox Garvin Glft as to Belton, et al; Roy Gilbert as to Belton, et al; Jeffery Milton Gissendanner as to Belton, et al; Everett Grant as to Belton, et al; Jerome James Grasso as to Belton, et al; Donald David Gray as to Belton, et al; Clayton Allen Hall as to Belton, et al; Martin Hall as to Belton, et al; David Allan Hamman as to Belton, et al; James Hanlon as to Belton, et al; WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Thursday, May 16, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Thu 05/16 11:53 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Alabama Northern (associated as of 5/14/2024), 2:24-cv-00460, Carr et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-03027-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
6 | 6
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Thu 05/16 11:51 AM
Case transferred in from District of Alabama Northern; Case Number 2:24-cv-00460. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Tuesday, May 14, 2024 | ||
5 | 5 ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of South Carolina for inclusion in MDL 2873; record electronically transferred to Clerk of Court in District of South Carolina. (KAM) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 5/16/2024.] | |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
4 | 4 TEXT ORDER granting Defendant 3M Company's3 unopposed motion for an extension of the time to file a responsive pleading until either the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("JPML") transfers this action or until twenty-eight days after the JPML declines to transfer the action. (KNS) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 5/16/2024.] | |
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
3 | 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time 3M Company's Unopposed Initial Motion for Extension of Time by 3M Company. (Radney, W) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 5/16/2024.] | |
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 405, receipt_number AALNDC-4569561. related document1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M Company from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 2024-900996 filed by 3M Company.(BST, ). (Radney, W) Modified on 4/15/2024. ALND Rec#B11044 (KAM). [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 5/16/2024.] | ||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by 3M Company (BST, ) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 5/16/2024.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M Company from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 2024-900996 filed by 3M Company.(BST, ) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 5/16/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A |