Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-00100
Case Filed:May 14, 2024
Last checked: Friday May 17, 2024 2:26 AM CDT
Defendant
Roberto Aviles-Rogel (6)
Represented By
Zaki Zehawi
Zehawi Law LLC
contact info
Defendant
Cain Botello, Sr (1)
Represented By
Jeffrey W Jensen
Law Offices Of Jeffrey W Jensen
contact info
Christopher J Cherella
Law Offices Of Christopher J Cherella
contact info
Defendant
Cain Botello, Jr (2)
Represented By
Michael J Steinle
Terschan Steinle Hodan & Ganzer Ltd
contact info
Richard H Hart, Jr
Hart Law Office
contact info
Defendant
Victoriano Botello (3)
Represented By
Natalie L Wisco
Richards & Associates Sc
contact info
Mark D Richards
Richards & Associates Sc
contact info
Victor E Plantinga
The Rose Group Sc
contact info
Defendant
Jayme Congleton (7)
Represented By
Thomas J Erickson
Thomas J Erickson Law Office
contact info
Defendant
Juan Carlos Espinoza (4)
Represented By
Gabriela A Leija
Federal Defender Services Of Wisconsin Inc
contact info
Ramuel R Figueroa
Federal Defender Services Of Wisconsin Inc
contact info
Defendant
Mario Garcia-Puentes (9)
Represented By
John Binder
John Binder Law LLC
contact info
Defendant
Marco Medel (5)
Represented By
John S Schiro
Schiro & Zarzynski
contact info
Jeffrey William Jensen, Jr
Schiro Criminal Defense
contact info
Defendant
Jaime Reyes Delgado (10)
Represented By
Martin J Pruhs
Pruhs & Donovan Sc
contact info
Defendant
Andrew Sabo (8)
Represented By
Jacob A Manian
Fox O'Neill & Shannon Sc
contact info
Defendant
Leonardo Tecpil (11)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Patricia I Daugherty
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Kevin C Knight
United States Department Of Justice (ed-Wi)
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/30/2024 6:40 PM CDT
Thursday, May 02, 2024
Arrest of Jayme Congleton, Jaime Reyes Delgado, Mario Garcia-Puentes, Juan Carlos Espinoza. (amb)
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Juan Carlos Espinoza, Jaime Reyes Delgado, Mario Garcia-Puentes. Initial Appearance on Criminal Complaint set for 5/2/2024 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 284, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI 53202 before Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries. (cc: all counsel)(amb)
Related: [-]
Case unsealed as to Cain Botello, Sr, Cain Botello, Jr, Victoriano Botello, Marco Medel, Roberto Aviles-Rogel, Andrew Sabo, Jayme Congleton, Jaime Reyes Delgado, Mario Garcia-Puentes, Juan Carlos Espinoza. (amb)
Related: [-]
Arrest of Cain Botello, Sr, Cain Botello, Jr. (amb)
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Cain Botello, Jr. Initial Appearance on Criminal Complaint set for 5/2/2024 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 284, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI 53202 before Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries. (cc: all counsel)(amb)
Related: [-]
Arrest of Victoriano Botello, Marco Medel. (amb)
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Victoriano Botello, Marco Medel, Jayme Congleton. Initial Appearance on Criminal Complaint set for 5/2/2024 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 284, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI 53202 before Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries. (cc: all counsel)(amb)
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Cain Botello, Sr. Initial Appearance on Criminal Complaint set for 5/2/2024 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 284, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI 53202 before Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries. (amb) (cc: all counsel)
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF HEARING CHANGE as to Cain Botello, Sr ONLY. The Initial Appearance on Criminal Complaint originally set for 5/2/2024 at 2:30 PM HAS BEEN CHANGED TO 5/2/2024 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 284, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI 53202 before Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries. (cc: all counsel)(amb)
Related: [-]
Arrest of Roberto Aviles-Rogel, Andrew Sabo. (amb)
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Andrew Sabo. Initial Appearance on Criminal Complaint set for 5/2/2024 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 284, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI 53202 before Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries. (cc: all counsel)(amb)
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Roberto Aviles-Rogel. Initial Appearance on Criminal Complaint set for 5/2/2024 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 284, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI 53202 before Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries. (cc: all counsel)(amb)
Related: [-]
2 2 213 pgs Redacted Complaint as toCain Botello, Sr, Cain Botello, Jr, Victoriano Botello, Marco Medel, Roberto Aviles-Rogel, Andrew Sabo, Jayme Congleton, Jaime Reyes Delgado, Mario Garcia-Puentes, Juan Carlos Espinoza. (amb)
Related: [-]
3 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries: Initial Appearance on Criminal Complaint as to Juan Carlos Espinoza, Roberto Aviles-Rogel, Jaime Reyes Delgado, Mario Garcia-Puentes held on 5/2/2024. Defendants advised of rights and charges. Government seeking three day hold for defendants Juan Carlos Espinoza, Mario Garcia-Puentes, Roberto Aviles-Rogel. Government seeking one day hold for defendant Jaime Reyes Delgado. Court temporarily detains all defendants for maximum of three days and sets detention hearing as to Jaime Reyes Delgado for 5/3/2024 at 10:00 AM in courtroom 284. The court ORDERS that pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 5(f) the government must produce all exculpatory information to the defendant(s) as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. Failure to comply with this order in a timely manner may result in sanctions, including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges and contempt proceedings. (Court Reporter Liberty) (amb)
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION and Scheduling a Detention Hearing as to Juan Carlos Espinoza signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries on 5/2/2024. Detention hearing to be set. (cc: all counsel) (amb)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION and Scheduling a Detention Hearing as to Roberto Aviles-Rogel signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries on 5/2/2024. Detention hearing to be set. (cc: all counsel) (amb)
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION and Scheduling a Detention Hearing as to Jaime Reyes Delgado signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries on 5/2/2024. Detention Hearing set for 5/3/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 284, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI 53202 before Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries. (cc: all counsel) (amb)
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION and Scheduling a Detention Hearing as to Mario Garcia-Puentes signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries on 5/2/2024. Detention hearing to be set. (cc: all counsel) (amb)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries: Initial Appearance on Criminal Complaint as to Victoriano Botello, Marco Medel, Andrew Sabo, Jayme Congleton held on 5/2/2024. Defendants advised of rights and charges. Government seeking three day hold as to all defendants. Court temporarily detains all defendants for a maximum of three days and directs parties to work with courtroom deputy to schedule detention hearings for either Monday 5/6/2024 or Tuesday 5/7/2024. The court ORDERS that pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 5(f) the government must produce all exculpatory information to the defendant(s) as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. Failure to comply with this order in a timely manner may result in sanctions, including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges and contempt proceedings. (Court Reporter Liberty) (amb)
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION and Scheduling a Detention Hearing as to Victoriano Botello signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries on 5/2/2024. Detention hearing to be set. (cc: all counsel) (amb)
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Marco Medel signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries on 5/2/2024. Detention hearing to be set. (cc: all counsel) (amb)
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION and Scheduling a Detention Hearing as to Andrew Sabo signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries on 5/2/2024. Detention hearing to be set. (cc: all counsel) (amb)
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION and Scheduling a Detention Hearing as to Jayme Congleton signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries on 5/2/2024. Detention hearing to be set. (cc: all counsel) (amb)
Related: [-]
13 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries: Initial Appearance on Criminal Complaint as to Cain Botello, Sr, Cain Botello, Jr held on 5/2/2024. Defendants advised of rights and charges. Government seeking three day hold for each defendant. Court temporarily detains defendants for a maximum of three days and directs parties to work with courtroom deputy to schedule detention hearings for either Monday 5/6/2024 or Tuesday 5/7/2024. The court ORDERS that pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 5(f) the government must produce all exculpatory information to the defendant(s) as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. Failure to comply with this order in a timely manner may result in sanctions, including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges and contempt proceedings.(Court Reporter Liberty) (amb)
Related: [-]
14 14 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Martin J Pruhs appearing for Jaime Reyes Delgado as CJA Counsel (Pruhs, Martin)
Related: [-]
15 15 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION and Scheduling a Detention Hearing as to Cain Botello, Sr signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries on 5/2/2024. Detention hearing to be set. (cc: all counsel) (amb)
Related: [-]
16 16 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION and Scheduling a Detention Hearing as to Cain Botello, Jr signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries on 5/2/2024. Detention hearing to be set. (cc: all counsel) (amb)
Related: [-]
20 20 1 pgs Warrant Returned Executed on 5/2/2024 as to Andrew Sabo. (kah) [2:24-mj-00368-SCD]
Related: [-]
21 21 Warrant Returned Executed on 5/2/2024 as to Marco Medel. (kah) [2:24-mj-00368-SCD]
Related: [-]
22 22 Warrant Returned Executed on 5/2/2024 as to Victoriano Botello. (kah) [2:24-mj-00368-SCD]
Related: [-]
23 23 Warrant Returned Executed on 5/2/2024 as to Cain Botello, Sr. (kah) [2:24-mj-00368-SCD]
Related: [-]
24 24 Warrant Returned Executed on 5/2/2024 as to Cain Botello, Jr. (kah) [2:24-mj-00368-SCD]
Related: [-]
25 25 Warrant Returned Executed on 5/2/2024 as to Roberto Aviles-Rogel. (kah) [2:24-mj-00368-SCD]
Related: [-]
26 26 Warrant Returned Executed on 5/2/2024 as to Jayme Congleton. (kah) [2:24-mj-00368-SCD]
Related: [-]
27 27 Warrant Returned Executed on 5/2/2024 as to Juan Carlos Espinoza. (kah) [2:24-mj-00368-SCD]
Related: [-]
28 28 Warrant Returned Executed on 5/2/2024 as to Jaime Reyes Delgado. (kah) [2:24-mj-00368-SCD]
Related: [-]
29 29 Warrant Returned Executed on 5/2/2024 as to Mario Garcia-Puentes. (kah) [2:24-mj-00368-SCD]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Cain Botello, Jr. Detention Hearing set for 5/6/2024 09:00 AM in Courtroom 284, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI 53202 before Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries. (cc: all counsel, USM, PTS)(kah)
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Cain Botello, Sr. Detention Hearing set for 5/6/2024 09:30 AM in Courtroom 284, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI 53202 before Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries. (cc: all counsel, USM, PTS)(kah)
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Andrew Sabo. Detention Hearing set for 5/6/2024 10:00 AM in Courtroom 284, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI 53202 before Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries. (cc: all counsel, USM, PTS)(kah)
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Jayme Congleton. Detention Hearing set for 5/6/2024 11:00 AM in Courtroom 284, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI 53202 before Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries. (cc: all counsel, USM, PTS)(kah)
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Marco Medel. Detention Hearing set for 5/6/2024 10:30 AM in Courtroom 284, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI 53202 before Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries. (cc: all counsel, USM, PTS)(kah)
Related: [-]
17 17 PRETRIAL SERVICES REPORT - BOND STUDY ( Restricted ) filed by US Pretrial Office as to Jaime Reyes Delgado ( NOTICE: Counsel for the defendant is required to provide a copy of this document to the defendant. Parties allowed to view this document may do so by logging in. ) (at)
Related: [-]
18 18 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kevin C Knight appearing for USA (Knight, Kevin)
Related: [-]
19 19 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Richard H Hart, Jr appearing for Cain Botello, Jr as CJA Counsel (Hart, Richard)
Related: [-]
30 30 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Gabriela A Leija appearing for Juan Carlos Espinoza as Federal Public Defender (Leija, Gabriela)
Related: [-]
31 31 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Ramuel R Figueroa appearing for Juan Carlos Espinoza as Federal Public Defender (Figueroa, Ramuel)
Related: [-]
32 32 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries: Detention Hearing as to Jaime Reyes Delgado held on 5/3/2024. Interpreter SWORN. Govt seeking detention. Defense proffers release. Deft is released on O/R bond w/conditions. (Tape #10:09:09-10:37:01) (kah)
Related: [-]
33 33 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Jaime Reyes Delgado (10) O/R bond signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries on 5/3/2024. (cc: all counsel, USM, PTS) (kah)
Related: [-]
34 34 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jacob A Manian appearing for Andrew Sabo as CJA Counsel (Manian, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 05, 2024
35 35 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Christopher J Cherella appearing for Cain Botello, Sr as Retained Counsel (Cherella, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Mario Garcia-Puentes. Detention Hearing set for 5/7/2024 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 284, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI 53202 before Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries. (cc: all counsel)(amb)
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Victoriano Botello. Detention Hearing set for 5/7/2024 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 284, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI 53202 before Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries. (cc: all counsel)(amb)
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Juan Carlos Espinoza. Detention Hearing set for 5/7/2024 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 284, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI 53202 before Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries. (cc: all counsel)(amb)
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF TIME CHANGE FOR HEARING as to Marco Medel. The Detention Hearing set for 5/6/2024 HAS BEEN MOVED FROM 10:30 AM TO 01:00 PM in Courtroom 284, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI 53202 before Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries. (cc: all counsel, USM, PTS, FDS)(kah)
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Roberto Aviles-Rogel. Detention Hearing set for 5/7/2024 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 284, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI 53202 before Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries. (cc: all counsel)(amb)
Related: [-]
36 36 PRETRIAL SERVICES REPORT - BOND STUDY ( Restricted ) filed by US Pretrial Office as to Marco Medel ( NOTICE: Counsel for the defendant is required to provide a copy of this document to the defendant. Parties allowed to view this document may do so by logging in. ) (at)
Related: [-]
37 37 PRETRIAL SERVICES REPORT - BOND STUDY ( Restricted ) filed by US Pretrial Office as to Cain Botello, Sr ( NOTICE: Counsel for the defendant is required to provide a copy of this document to the defendant. Parties allowed to view this document may do so by logging in. ) (at)
Related: [-]
38 38 PRETRIAL SERVICES REPORT - BOND STUDY ( Restricted ) filed by US Pretrial Office as to Cain Botello, Jr ( NOTICE: Counsel for the defendant is required to provide a copy of this document to the defendant. Parties allowed to view this document may do so by logging in. ) (at)
Related: [-]
39 39 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: John S Schiro appearing for Marco Medel as CJA Counsel (Schiro, John)
Related: [-]
40 40 PRETRIAL SERVICES REPORT - BOND STUDY ( Restricted ) filed by US Pretrial Office as to Andrew Sabo ( NOTICE: Counsel for the defendant is required to provide a copy of this document to the defendant. Parties allowed to view this document may do so by logging in. ) (at)
Related: [-]
41 41 PRETRIAL SERVICES REPORT - BOND STUDY ( Restricted ) filed by US Pretrial Office as to Jayme Congleton ( NOTICE: Counsel for the defendant is required to provide a copy of this document to the defendant. Parties allowed to view this document may do so by logging in. ) (at)
Related: [-]
42 42 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries: Detention Hearing as to Cain Botello, Sr held on 5/6/2024. Defense asks for continuance. Detention Hearing continued to 5/9/2024 01:00 PM in Courtroom 284, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI 53202 before Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries. (Tape #9:30:58-9:32:23) (kah)
Related: [-]
43 43 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries: Detention Hearing as to Jayme Congleton held on 5/6/2024. Parties agree to release Deft on home detention. Deft is released on O/R bond w/conditions. (Tape #11:05:15-11:08:56) (kah)
Related: [-]
44 44 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Jayme Congleton (9) O/R bond signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries on 5/6/2024. (cc: all counsel, USM, PTS) (kah)
Related: [-]
45 45 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries: Detention Hearing as to Cain Botello, Jr held on 5/6/2024. Govt seeking detention. Defense not contesting detention at this time. Deft is ordered DETAINED on the presumption. (Tape #9:01:17-9:02:50) (kah)
Related: [-]
46 46 PRETRIAL SERVICES REPORT - BOND STUDY ( Restricted ) filed by US Pretrial Office as to Roberto Aviles-Rogel ( NOTICE: Counsel for the defendant is required to provide a copy of this document to the defendant. Parties allowed to view this document may do so by logging in. ) (at)
Related: [-]
47 47 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Cain Botello, Jr signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries on 5/6/2024. (cc: all counsel, USM, PTS) (kah)
Related: [-]
48 48 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: John Binder appearing for Mario Garcia-Puentes as CJA Counsel (Binder, John)
Related: [-]
49 49 PRETRIAL SERVICES REPORT - BOND STUDY ( Restricted ) filed by US Pretrial Office as to Juan Carlos Espinoza ( NOTICE: Counsel for the defendant is required to provide a copy of this document to the defendant. Parties allowed to view this document may do so by logging in. ) (at)
Related: [-]
50 50 PRETRIAL SERVICES REPORT - BOND STUDY ( Restricted ) filed by US Pretrial Office as to Mario Garcia-Puentes ( NOTICE: Counsel for the defendant is required to provide a copy of this document to the defendant. Parties allowed to view this document may do so by logging in. ) (at)
Related: [-]
51 51 1 pgs Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries: Detention Hearing as to Andrew Sabo held on 5/6/2024. Defense is not contesting detention at this time. Deft is ordered detained on the presumption. (Tape #10:06:18-10:07:21) (kah)
Related: [-]
52 52 3 pgs ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Andrew Sabo signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries on 5/6/2024. (cc: all counsel, USM, PTS) (kah)
Related: [-]
53 53 Unopposed MOTION to Adjourn Detention Hearing by Mario Garcia-Puentes.(Binder, John)
Related: [-]
54 54 1 pgs Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries: Detention Hearing as to Marco Medel held on 5/6/2024. Defense does not contest detention at this time. Deft is ordered detained on the presumption. (Tape #1:02:45-1:04:02) (kah)
Related: [-]
55 55 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Marco Medel signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries on 5/6/2024. (cc: all counsel, USM, PTS) (kah)
Related: [-]
56 56 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Thomas J Erickson appearing for Jayme Congleton as CJA Counsel (Erickson, Thomas)
Related: [-]
57 57 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Zaki Zehawi appearing for Roberto Aviles-Rogel as CJA Counsel (Zehawi, Zaki)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
TEXT ONLY ORDER as to Mario Garcia-Puentes granting motion to adjourn. Hearing to be rescheduled. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries on 5-7-24. (cc: all counsel) (Dries, Stephen)
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF HEARING CHANGE as to Mario Garcia-Puentes. The Detention Hearing originally set for 5/7/2024 at 10:30 AM HAS BEEN CHANGED TO 5/10/2024 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 284, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI 53202 before Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries. (cc: all counsel)(amb)
Related: [-]
58 58 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Victor E Plantinga appearing for Victoriano Botello as CJA Counsel (Plantinga, Victor)
Related: [-]
59 59 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries: Detention Hearing as to Juan Carlos Espinoza held on 5/7/2024. Interpreter sworn. Parties request to continue detention hearing. Detention Hearing continued to 5/10/2024 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 284, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI 53202 before Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries. (Court Reporter Liberty) (amb)
Related: [-]
60 60 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries: Detention Hearing as to Roberto Aviles-Rogel held on 5/7/2024. Interpreter sworn. Parties request to continue detention hearing. Detention Hearing continued to 5/20/2024 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 284, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI 53202 before Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries. (Court Reporter Liberty) (amb)
Related: [-]
61 61 TEXT ONLY ORDER APPOINTING CJA COUNSEL signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries as to Cain Botello, Sr: The court is satisfied that the defendant is financially unable to obtain counsel and the appointment of counsel is in the interest of justice; Jeffrey W Jensen for Cain Botello, Sr appointed effective 5/3/2024 - 5/5/2024. (cc: all counsel) (asc)
Related: [-]
62 62 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries: Detention Hearing as to Victoriano Botello held on 5/7/2024. Parties request to continue detention hearing. Detention Hearing continued to 5/14/2024 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 284, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI 53202 before Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries. (Court Reporter Liberty) (amb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
63 63 First MOTION for Bond by Cain Botello, Jr.(Hart, Richard)
Related: [-]
64 64 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Mark D Richards appearing for Victoriano Botello as Retained Counsel along with Attorney Natalie Wisco (Richards, Mark)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Cain Botello, Jr. Detention Hearing set for 5/14/2024 03:00 PM in Courtroom 284, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI 53202 before Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries. (cc: all counsel, USM, PTS)(kah)
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF HEARING CHANGE as to Victoriano Botello. Per defense's request, the Detention Hearing originally set for 5/14/2024 at 10:30 AM HAS BEEN CHANGED TO 5/15/2024 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 284, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI 53202 before Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries. (cc: all counsel)(amb)
Related: [-]
65 65 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michael J Steinle appearing for Cain Botello, Jr as Retained Counsel (Steinle, Michael)
Related: [-]
66 66 TEXT ONLY ORDER APPOINTING CJA COUNSEL for Cain Botello, Jr signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries on 5/9/2024 : The court is satisfied that the defendant is financially unable to obtain counsel and the appointment of counsel is in the interest of justice; Richard Hart appointed effective 5/2/2024 - 5/9/2024. (cc: all counsel) (kah)
Related: [-]
67 67 TEXT ONLY ORDER APPOINTING CJA COUNSEL for Victoriano Botello signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries on 5/9/2024 : The court is satisfied that the defendant is financially unable to obtain counsel and the appointment of counsel is in the interest of justice; Victor Plantinga appointed effective 5/3/2024 - 5/8/2024. (cc: all counsel) (kah)
Related: [-]
68 68 MOTION for Release from Custody by Mario Garcia-Puentes.(Binder, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Tax Documentation - W-2s,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Firearm Documentation
Friday, May 10, 2024
69 69 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries: Detention Hearing as to Cain Botello, Sr held on 5/10/2024. Govt seeking detention. Defense proffers release on conditions. Deft is ordered DETAINED. (Tape #1:00:00-1:26:23) (kah)
Related: [-]
70 70 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Cain Botello, Sr signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries on 5/10/2024. (cc: all counsel, USM) (kah)
Related: [-]
71 71 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jeffrey William Jensen, Jr appearing for Marco Medel as CJA Counsel (Jensen, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
72 72 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries: Detention Hearing as to Juan Carlos Espinoza held on 5/10/2024. Defense reserves arguments and rests on the presumption. Defense to file motion to reopen detention hearing at a later date. Courts orders defendant detained based on the presumption. (Court Reporter Liberty) (amb)
Related: [-]
73 73 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Juan Carlos Espinoza signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries on 5/10/2024. (cc: all counsel) (amb)
Related: [-]
74 74 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries: Detention Hearing as to Mario Garcia-Puentes held on 5/10/2024. Government seeking detention. Defense proffers release with conditions. Court orders defendant released on O/R Bond with conditions. (Court Reporter Liberty) (amb) [2:24-mj-00368-SCD]
Related: [-]
75 75 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Mario Garcia-Puentes signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries on 5/10/2024. (cc: all counsel) (amb) [2:24-mj-00368-SCD]
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
76 76 PRETRIAL SERVICES REPORT - BOND STUDY ( Restricted ) filed by US Pretrial Office as to Victoriano Botello ( NOTICE: Counsel for the defendant is required to provide a copy of this document to the defendant. Parties allowed to view this document may do so by logging in. ) (at)
Related: [-]
77 77 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Natalie L Wisco appearing for Victoriano Botello as Retained Counsel (Wisco, Natalie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries on 5/14/2024 granting63 Motion for Bond. (cc: all counsel) (kah)
Related: [-]
78 78 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries: Detention Hearing as to Cain Botello, Jr held on 5/14/2024. Govt not seeking detention. Deft is released on O/R bond w/conditions. (Tape #3:00:10-3:02:36) (kah)
Related: [-]
79 79 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Cain Botello Jr (2) O/R bond signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries on 5/14/2024. (cc: all counsel, USM, PTS) (kah)
Related: [-]
80 80 16 pgs INDICTMENT as to Cain Botello, Sr (1) counts 1, 2, 3; Cain Botello, Jr (2) counts 9, 10, 11; Victoriano Botello (3) count 1; Juan Carlos Espinoza (4) counts 1, 4-5; Marco Medel (5) counts 1, 6, 7; Roberto Aviles-Rogel (6) counts 1, 4; Jayme Congleton (7) count 1; Andrew Sabo (8) counts 1, 8; Mario Garcia-Puentes (9) counts 1, 2; Jaime Reyes Delgado (10) count 13; Leonardo Tecpil (11) counts 1, 5, 12. (lz) (lz).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (5/15/2024) Information Sheet,
Att: 2 (5/15/2024) Unredacted Indictment