Utah District Court
Judge:Howard C Nielson, Jr
Case #: 2:24-cv-00356
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:May 20, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Nov 16, 2024 3:46 AM MST
Defendant
Mountain Life Church
Represented By
Heidi G. Goebel
Goebel Anderson PC
contact info
Gene C. Schaerr
Schaerr Jaffe LLP
contact info
Zachary E. Peterson
Goebel Anderson PC
contact info
Thomas R. Lee
Schaerr Jaffe
contact info
John J. Nielsen
contact info
Plaintiff
Cullen Wood
Represented By
James R. Marsh
Marsh Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Mitchell A. Stephens
James Dodge Russell & Stephens PC
contact info
Cori J. Iacopelli
Marsh Law Firm PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 4:33 AM MDT
Friday, April 11, 2025
28 28 notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Fri 04/11 4:34 PM
NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re:15 MOTION to Dismiss : (Notice generated by HCN chambers) Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2025 at 02:00 PM before Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. **Non-courtroom hearing to be held via Zoom Conference.** (mlp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
27 27 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel Wed 11/20 10:30 AM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL of John Nielsen filed by John J. Nielsen on behalf of Mountain Life Church (Nielsen, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
26 26 respm Reply Memorandum/Reply to Response to Motion Thu 09/19 10:15 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Mountain Life Church. (Peterson, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
25 25 20 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Thu 09/05 9:01 PM
Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Cullen Wood. (Iacopelli, Cori)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
24 24 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 08/28 1:27 PM
ORDER granting 23 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to 15 Motion to Dismiss : Response due by 9/5/2024. Reply due by 9/19/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge C. Bennett on 8/28/24. (dle)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
23 23 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 08/26 2:32 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Cullen Wood. Motions referred to Jared C. Bennett.(Iacopelli, Cori)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
21 21 misc Stipulation Mon 08/26 1:59 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time by Cullen Wood.(Iacopelli, Cori)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
notice Notice of Deficiency Mon 08/26 2:23 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re21 Stipulation. The document Stipulation must be filed as a Motion for Extension. Additionally, the docket event type and text should specify what type of extension is being requested (i.e., Response/Reply) and be linked to the document to which the response will be filed. The clerk requests the filer of the original document to refile the pleading. The new pleading will receive a new document number on the docket. (dle)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
20 20 3 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Tue 08/06 9:31 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas R. Lee on behalf of Mountain Life Church (Lee, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Fri 08/02 3:00 PM
ORDER granting 18 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Gene C. Schaerr for Mountain Life Church. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.A Pro Hac Vice Attorney who fails to register for CM/ECF access will not receive notifications of electronic filings. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 8/2/24. (dle)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry) Fri 08/02 1:04 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Gene Schaerr , Registration fee $ 50, receipt number AUTDC-5142682, Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at[LINK:https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html] . Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at[LINK:https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing] . filed by Defendant Mountain Life Church.(Nielsen, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 08/02 12:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Nielsen on behalf of Mountain Life Church (Nielsen, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 08/01 11:00 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Heidi G. Goebel on behalf of Mountain Life Church (Goebel, Heidi)
Related: [-]
15 15 15 pgs motion Dismiss Thu 08/01 10:27 AM
MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Mountain Life Church. (Peterson, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
utility Reassignment to District Judge Thu 06/27 11:31 AM
NOTICE OF NON-CONSENT Consent to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge under DUCivR 72-4 has not been obtained. Case randomly assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr and Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett. Magistrate Judge is automatically referred under 28 U.S.C636(b)(1)(A). Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett no longer assigned as the presiding judge to the case. (mh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
misc Received Consent /Reassignment Form Tue 06/11 4:21 PM
RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Cullen Wood. (mh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment Wed 06/05 11:17 AM
NOTICE OF PRESIDING MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, and DUCivR 72-4, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail to the address on the form. Please do not efile the Consent Form in the case. Notice emailed or mailed to Defendant Mountain Life Church, Plaintiff Cullen Wood. Form due by 6/26/2024. (mh)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Availability of Judicial Settlement Conference Wed 06/05 10:01 AM
NOTICE OF AVAILABILITY OF JUDICIAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. For the benefit of the public and the bar, the District of Utah offers judicial settlement conference as an alternative for dispute resolution assistance in all civil cases and bankruptcy adversary proceedings. The court offers this alternative because, when compared with litigation, it can resolve a dispute faster, at less expense, and with solutions that are better able to meet the parties' needs and interests. Parties may file a stipulated motion for judicial settlement conference. A form[LINK:motion] is available on the court's website. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Mountain Life Church, Plaintiff Cullen Wood. (alf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 06/04 10:58 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Cullen Wood (Iacopelli, Cori)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 05/29 12:53 PM
ORDER granting 7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney James R. Marsh for Cullen Wood. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.A Pro Hac Vice Attorney who fails to register for CM/ECF access will not receive notifications of electronic filings. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 5/29/2024. (mh)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 05/29 12:49 PM
ORDER granting 6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Cori J. Iacopelli for Cullen Wood. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.A Pro Hac Vice Attorney who fails to register for CM/ECF access will not receive notifications of electronic filings. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 5/29/2024. (mh)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
7 7 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry) Fri 05/24 1:43 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of James R. Marsh , Registration fee $ 50, receipt number AUTDC-5072671, Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at[LINK:https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html] . Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at[LINK:https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing] . filed by Plaintiff Cullen Wood.(Stephens, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission
6 6 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry) Fri 05/24 1:39 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Cori J. Iacopelli , Registration fee $ 50, receipt number AUTDC-5072652, Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at[LINK:https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html] . Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at[LINK:https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing] . filed by Plaintiff Cullen Wood.(Stephens, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
5 5 notice Notice PHV Requirements Wed 05/22 2:43 PM
NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance Pro Hac Vice emailed to attorney James R. Marsh and Cori J. Iacopelli for Cullen Wood (sg)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
4 4 5 pgs order Order to Propose Schedule Mon 05/20 1:10 PM
ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 5/20/2024. (haa)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Electronically Mon 05/20 10:50 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Mountain Life Church. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg)
Related: [-]
2 2 18 pgs cmp Complaint (Atty) Mon 05/20 10:12 AM
COMPLAINT against Mountain Life Church with filing fee $405.00 previously paid receipt number AUTDC-506640 filed by Cullen Wood. (Stephens, Mitchell) Modified on 5/20/2024 (sg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-GRACE Report on MLC Pastor Scott Fine,
Att: 2 1 pgs Civil Cover Sheet
1 1 misc Remark - New Case Mon 05/20 9:46 AM
Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett. Plaintiff Cullen Wood is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 405.00 by the end of the business day. NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts[LINK:PDF version] and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (sg)
Related: [-]