Maine District Court
Judge:Nancy Torresen
Case #: 1:24-cv-00185
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1981 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:May 20, 2024
Terminated:Dec 23, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Nov 16, 2024 5:46 AM EST
Defendant
PURITAN MEDICAL PRODUCTS COMPANY LLC
Represented By
PETER BENNETT
The Bennett Law Firm
contact info
FREDERICK B. FINBERG
The Bennett Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
DUPREME AMMONDS
Represented By
BRADEN ALEXANDER BEARD
Johnson & Webbert, LLP
contact info
RYAN M. SCHMITZ
Johnson & Webbert, LLP
contact info
DAVID G. WEBBERT
Johnson & Webbert, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, December 23, 2024
14 14 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 12/23 2:40 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation of Dismissal by DUPREME AMMONDS. (BEARD, BRADEN)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
order Order on Motion to Extend Time Fri 11/08 3:24 PM
ORDER granting12 Motion to Extend Time to Stay of All Deadlines Pending Completion of Settlement By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (jam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
12 12 misc Status Report Wed 11/06 3:07 PM
STATUS REPORT by DUPREME AMMONDS. (BEARD, BRADEN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 10/10 12:11 PM
SET Deadlines: The next Status Report is due by 11/6/2024. (mlm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
11 11 misc Status Report Wed 10/09 12:09 PM
STATUS REPORT by DUPREME AMMONDS. (BEARD, BRADEN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 08/21 9:20 AM
Set Deadlines: Status Report due by 10/15/2024. (slg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
order Order on Motion to Stay Tue 08/20 1:53 PM
ORDER granting9 Motion to Stay By MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID M. COHEN. The parties shall provide the court with a joint status report no later than October 15, 2024 to update the court on the status of the settlement negotiations and inform the court whether the stay should be lifted. If the settlement negotiations are not successful, the parties shall file any potential objections to the court's Scheduling Order, and a proposed revised Scheduling Order, at the time they file the joint status report. (COHEN, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
9 9 motion Stay Mon 08/19 2:45 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay Deadlines Pending Parties' Efforts to Resolve Case by DUPREME AMMONDS Responses due by 9/9/2024. (BEARD, BRADEN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 08/14 10:34 AM
Case Reassigned to JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (nrg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
8 8 misc Declaration Regarding Consent to Magistrate Judge Tue 08/13 7:24 PM
DECLARATION Regarding Consent to Magistrate Judge. The Parties DECLINE consent to the Magistrate Judge. (BEARD, BRADEN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 07/30 1:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by PETER BENNETT on behalf of PURITAN MEDICAL PRODUCTS COMPANY LLC (BENNETT, PETER)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Scheduling Order Tue 07/30 11:58 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/17/2024. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 12/24/2024. Motions due by 1/7/2025. Ready for Trial on 3/5/2025. Declaration Regarding Consent to Magistrate Judge due by 8/13/2024. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (mlm)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
5 5 misc Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement Mon 07/29 3:12 PM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by PURITAN MEDICAL PRODUCTS COMPANY LLC. (FINBERG, FREDERICK)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 07/29 3:09 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,, by PURITAN MEDICAL PRODUCTS COMPANY LLC.(FINBERG, FREDERICK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 06/05 2:10 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed PURITAN MEDICAL PRODUCTS COMPANY LLC waiver sent on 5/31/2024. (BEARD, BRADEN)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Answer Deadline Wed 06/05 4:17 PM
SET Answer Deadline Regarding Waiver of Service Executed for PURITAN MEDICAL PRODUCTS COMPANY LLC: Answer due by 7/30/2024. (nrg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
misc Case Opening Filing Fee Paid Tue 05/21 9:18 AM
Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMEDC-2956982.), filed by DUPREME AMMONDS.(BEARD, BRADEN)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 05/21 8:53 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (cjd)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 05/21 8:53 AM
COMPLAINT against PURITAN MEDICAL PRODUCTS COMPANY LLC with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. , filed by DUPREME AMMONDS. (Service of Process Deadline 8/19/2024) Fee due by 5/22/2024.(cjd)
Related: [-]