International Union of Operating Engineers Local No. 478 Health Fund v. Eli Lilly And Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:23-md-03080
Lead case: 2:23-md-03080
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Brian R Martinotti |
Referred: | Rukhsanah L Singh |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-06303 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | May 21, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Connecticut, 3:24-cv-00743 |
Last checked: Friday Jul 05, 2024 5:34 AM EDT |
Defendant
EXPRESS SCRIPTS ADMINISTRATORS LLC.
|
|
Defendant
UnitedHealth Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. L.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
Optumrx Inc.
|
|
Defendant
OptumInsight Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Optum Inc.
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK INC.
|
|
Defendant
MEDCO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.
|
|
Defendant
Express Scripts Inc.
1 Express Way
St. Louis, MO 63121 |
|
Defendant
EXPRESS SCRIPTS PHARMACY INC.
|
|
Defendant
EVERNORTH HEALTH INC.
|
|
Defendant
ESI Mail Pharmacy Services, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
|
|
Defendant
CVS PHARMACY INC.
|
|
Defendant
CVS HEALTH CORPORATION
|
|
Defendant
CAREMARK RX L.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
CAREMARK PCS HEALTH LLC
|
|
Defendant
CAREMARK L.L.C.
|
|
Plaintiff
International Union of Operating Engineers Local No. 478 Health Fund
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 08/01 5:44 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against CAREMARK L.L.C., CAREMARK PCS HEALTH LLC, CAREMARK RX L.L.C., CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, CVS PHARMACY INC., ELI LILLY AND COMPANY, ESI Mail Pharmacy Services, Inc., EVERNORTH HEALTH INC., EXPRESS SCRIPTS ADMINISTRATORS LLC., EXPRESS SCRIPTS PHARMACY INC., Express Scripts Inc., MEDCO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC., NOVO NORDISK INC., Optum Inc., OptumInsight Inc., Optumrx Inc., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. L.L.C., UnitedHealth Group Inc, filed by International Union of Operating Engineers Local No. 478 Health Fund.(TIMMONS, BECCA) |
|
Tuesday, June 11, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 06/11 3:07 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by International Union of Operating Engineers Local No. 478 Health Fund. ESI Mail Pharmacy Services, Inc. waiver sent on 6/4/2024, answer due 8/5/2024; EVERNORTH HEALTH INC. waiver sent on 6/4/2024, answer due 8/5/2024; EXPRESS SCRIPTS ADMINISTRATORS LLC. waiver sent on 6/4/2024, answer due 8/5/2024; EXPRESS SCRIPTS PHARMACY INC. waiver sent on 6/4/2024, answer due 8/5/2024; Express Scripts Inc. waiver sent on 6/4/2024, answer due 8/5/2024; MEDCO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC. waiver sent on 6/4/2024, answer due 8/5/2024. (BOGLE, BRANDON) |
|
Monday, June 10, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 06/10 12:52 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by International Union of Operating Engineers Local No. 478 Health Fund. NOVO NORDISK INC. waiver sent on 6/4/2024, answer due 8/5/2024. (BOGLE, BRANDON) |
|
Friday, May 31, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 05/31 12:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by BRANDON LEE BOGLE on behalf of All Plaintiffs (BOGLE, BRANDON) |
|
Friday, May 24, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 05/24 10:50 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM FRANKLIN CASH, III on behalf of International Union of Operating Engineers Local No. 478 Health Fund (CASH, WILLIAM) |
|
Thursday, May 23, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 05/23 5:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by BECCA TIMMONS on behalf of International Union of Operating Engineers Local No. 478 Health Fund (TIMMONS, BECCA) |
|
Wednesday, May 22, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 05/22 5:52 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew D. Schultz on behalf of International Union of Operating Engineers Local No. 478 Health Fund (Schultz, Matthew) |
|
Tuesday, May 21, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
mdl
MDL Notice to Counsel
Tue 05/21 2:01 PM
Clerk's Notice to Counsel: Pursuant to CTO Number 14 entered in MDL No. 3080, District of Connecticut case number 3:24-cv-743 has been transferred to the District of New Jersey and assigned civil action number: 24-cv-6303. In Re: Insulin Pricing Litigation, MDL 3080. (krg, ) |
|
20 | 20
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Court Transfer
Tue 05/21 1:49 PM
Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Connecticut; Case Number 3:24-cv-00743. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Tue 05/21 1:56 PM
Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh added. (krg, ) |
||
utility
Create Case Association
Tue 05/21 1:57 PM
Cases associated to 2:23-md-03080-BRM-RLS. (krg, ) |
||
Monday, May 20, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 05/21 11:53 AM
MDL Transfer Order. Case transferred to District of New Jersey. Signed by Clerk Tiffany D. Pete, MDL Panel on May 20, 2024. Signed by Clerk on 5/20/2024.(Gaskins, A) Modified to change file date on 5/21/2024 (Gaskins, A) |
|
Att: 1 Letter | ||
18 | 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to OptumInsight, Inc. waiver sent on 5/14/2024, answer due 7/13/2024 filed by International Union of Operating Engineers Local No. 478 Health Fund. (Bartlett, Kenneth) | |
17 | 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to UnitedHealth Group, Inc. waiver sent on 5/14/2024, answer due 7/13/2024 filed by International Union of Operating Engineers Local No. 478 Health Fund. (Bartlett, Kenneth) | |
16 | 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to OptumRx, Inc. waiver sent on 5/14/2024, answer due 7/13/2024 filed by International Union of Operating Engineers Local No. 478 Health Fund. (Bartlett, Kenneth) | |
15 | 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Optum, Inc. waiver sent on 5/14/2024, answer due 7/13/2024 filed by International Union of Operating Engineers Local No. 478 Health Fund. (Bartlett, Kenneth) | |
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 05/21 12:31 PM
JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Gaskins, A) |
||
Friday, May 17, 2024 | ||
14 | 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to CVS Health Corporation waiver sent on 5/9/2024, answer due 7/8/2024 filed by International Union of Operating Engineers Local No. 478 Health Fund. (Bartlett, Kenneth) | |
13 | 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Caremark PCS Health, LLC waiver sent on 5/9/2024, answer due 7/8/2024 filed by International Union of Operating Engineers Local No. 478 Health Fund. (Bartlett, Kenneth) | |
12 | 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Caremark RX, LLC waiver sent on 5/9/2024, answer due 7/8/2024 filed by International Union of Operating Engineers Local No. 478 Health Fund. (Bartlett, Kenneth) | |
11 | 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Caremark, LLC waiver sent on 5/9/2024, answer due 7/8/2024 filed by International Union of Operating Engineers Local No. 478 Health Fund. (Bartlett, Kenneth) | |
10 | 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to CVS Pharmacy, Inc. waiver sent on 5/9/2024, answer due 7/8/2024 filed by International Union of Operating Engineers Local No. 478 Health Fund. (Bartlett, Kenneth) | |
Thursday, May 16, 2024 | ||
9 | 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC waiver sent on 5/9/2024, answer due 7/8/2024 filed by International Union of Operating Engineers Local No. 478 Health Fund. (Bartlett, Kenneth) | |
8 | 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Eli Lilly And Company waiver sent on 5/3/2024, answer due 7/2/2024 filed by International Union of Operating Engineers Local No. 478 Health Fund. (Bartlett, Kenneth) | |
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
7 | 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of5 Standing Protective Order,3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines,1 Complaint filed by International Union of Operating Engineers Local No. 478 Health Fund,6 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction, 2 Notice re: Disclosure Statement,4 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 4/23/2024.(Gaskins, A) | |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
6 | 6 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (Gaskins, A) | |
5 | 5 Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 4/22/2024.(Gaskins, A) | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 4/22/2024.(Gaskins, A) | |
3 | 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/21/2024 Discovery due by 10/22/2024 Dispositive Motions due by 11/26/2024 Signed by Clerk on 4/22/2024.(Gaskins, A) | |
2 | 2 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 4/22/2024.(Maturo, F.) | |
1 | 1 205 pgs COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $405 receipt number BCTDC-7732157.), filed by International Union of Operating Engineers Local No. 478 Health Fund.(Bartlett, Kenneth) | |
Judge Alvin W. Thompson and Judge Maria E. Garcia added. (Freberg, B) |