City of Portsmouth, Virginia v. Eli Lilly and Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:23-md-03080
Lead case: 2:23-md-03080
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Brian R Martinotti |
Referred: | Rukhsanah L Singh |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-06331 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | May 22, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Virginia Eastern, 2:24-cv-00276 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 06, 2024 5:12 AM EDT |
Defendant
EVERNORTH HEALTH INC.
|
|
Defendant
UnitedHealth Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC
|
|
Defendant
Optumrx Inc.
|
|
Defendant
OptumInsight Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Optum Inc.
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK INC.
|
|
Defendant
MEDCO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.
|
|
Defendant
Express Scripts Inc.
1 Express Way
St. Louis, MO 63121 |
|
Defendant
EXPRESS SCRIPTS PHARMACY INC.
|
|
Defendant
EXPRESS SCRIPTS ADMINISTRATORS LLC.
|
|
Defendant
ESI Mail Pharmacy Services, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
|
|
Defendant
CVS PHARMACY INC.
|
|
Defendant
CVS HEALTH CORPORATION
|
|
Defendant
CAREMARK RX L.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
CAREMARK PCS HEALTH LLC
|
|
Defendant
CAREMARK L.L.C.
|
|
Plaintiff
City of Portsmouth, Virginia
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 08/01 6:23 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against CAREMARK L.L.C., CAREMARK PCS HEALTH LLC, CAREMARK RX L.L.C., CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, CVS PHARMACY INC., ELI LILLY AND COMPANY, ESI Mail Pharmacy Services, Inc., EVERNORTH HEALTH INC., EXPRESS SCRIPTS ADMINISTRATORS LLC., EXPRESS SCRIPTS PHARMACY INC., Express Scripts Inc., MEDCO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC., NOVO NORDISK INC., Optum Inc., OptumInsight Inc., Optumrx Inc., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, UnitedHealth Group Inc, filed by City of Portsmouth, Virginia.(FINNELL, ROBERT) |
|
Wednesday, May 22, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
mdl
MDL Notice to Counsel
Wed 05/22 2:06 PM
Clerk's Notice to Counsel: Pursuant to CTO Number 14 entered in MDL No. 3080, Eastern District of Virginia case number 2:24-cv-276 has been transferred to the District of New Jersey and assigned civil action number: 24-cv-6331. In Re: Insulin Pricing Litigation, MDL 3080. (krg, ) |
|
5 | 5
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Court Transfer
Wed 05/22 2:01 PM
Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Virginia Eastern; Case Number 2:24-cv-00276. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 05/22 2:03 PM
Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh added. (krg, ) |
||
utility
Create Case Association
Wed 05/22 2:03 PM
Case associated to 2:23-md-03080-BRM-RLS. (krg, ) |
||
Tuesday, May 21, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 05/22 1:20 PM
CERTIFIED COPY OF MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER In Re: Insulin Pricing Litigation, MDL No 3080, transferring specified action to the District of New Jersey. Signed by the Clerk of the Panel. Certified copy received in EDVA, Norfolk Division from the District of New Jersey on 5/21/2024. (afar) |
|
Thursday, May 09, 2024 | ||
3 | 3 ORDER granting2 Motion for Pro hac vice for Robert Finnell on behalf of City of Portsmouth, Virginia. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 5/7/24. (bwell) | |
Monday, May 06, 2024 | ||
2 | 2 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert K. Finnell and Certification of Local Counsel J. Chapman Petersen Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9510100. by City of Portsmouth, Virginia.(Petersen, John) | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
1 | 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-9498298.), filed by City of Portsmouth, Virginia.(Petersen, John) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. (epri, ) |