Town Of Siler City v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03154 |
Nature of Suit | 245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | May 22, 2024 |
Case in other court: | North Carolina Middle, 1:24-cv-00365 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 06, 2024 5:38 AM EDT |
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
The Ansul Company
141 Junny Road
Angier, NC 27501 |
|
Defendant
Raytheon Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company
974 Centre Road
Wilmington, DE 19805 |
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Defendant John Does 1-49
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Incorporated
Agent Schok K. Moza 12321 Hatcherville
Baytown, TX 77520 |
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma U.S. Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Angus Fire
|
|
Defendant
AGC Inc
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemical Americas, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Town Of Siler City
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, June 04, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
service
Summons Issued
Tue 06/04 12:45 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
Thursday, May 23, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Thu 05/23 1:56 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: North Carolina Middle (associated as of 5/22/2024), 1:24-cv-00365, Town Of Siler City v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-03154-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
13 | 13
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Thu 05/23 1:42 PM
Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Middle; Case Number 1:24-cv-00365. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Wednesday, May 22, 2024 | ||
12 | 12 MDL TRANSFER LETTER to individual courts Per MDL re: Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-190) which became effective on 5/21/2024 and to be transferred to District of South Carolina. (sh) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 5/23/2024.] | |
11 | 11 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-190) Re: MDL 2873 transferring this action to the District of South Carolina for the reasons stated in the Order of December 7, 2018. Received and filed on May 21, 2024. (sh) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 5/23/2024.] | |
Monday, May 13, 2024 | ||
10 | 10 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 5/13/2024; that the Consent Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint is hereby GRANTED, and that if this action is transferred to the In re Aqueous Film-Forming Foam Products multidistrict litigation ("AFFF MDL"), then the deadlines for all Defendants to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint shall be in accordance with the established rules and procedures in the AFFF MDL. Should the Judicial Panel on the Multidistrict Litigation ("JPML") decline to transfer this action to the AFFF MDL, Defendants Tyco Fire Products, LP and Chemguard, Inc. shall have through and including the 28th day after such disposition by the JPML to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint. (sh) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 5/23/2024.] | |
Friday, May 10, 2024 | ||
Motions Referred: RE:9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Petition for Removal, , to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD (rw) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 5/23/2024.] | ||
Thursday, May 09, 2024 | ||
9 | 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Petition for Removal, by CHEMGUARD, INC., TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP.(BLAKE, CHRISTOPHER) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 5/23/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, May 06, 2024 | ||
7 | 7 Notice of Right to Consent.. (cc) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 5/23/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Consent to Jurisdiction | ||
6 | 6 Summons Issued as to 3M COMPANY. (State Court document originally filed in Chatham County Superior Court, Case Number 24CVS246, issued 03/28/2024, listed as Exhibit B to1 Petition for Removal). (cc) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 5/23/2024.] | |
Case ASSIGNED to CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (cc) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 5/23/2024.] | ||
Friday, May 03, 2024 | ||
5 | 5 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by TOWN OF SILER CITY. (State court documents originally filed in Chatham County Superior Court, case number 24CVS246, listed as Exhibit A to the1 Petition for Removal). (cc) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 5/23/2024.] | |
Thursday, May 02, 2024 | ||
4 | 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Control International PLC for CHEMGUARD, INC. (BLAKE, CHRISTOPHER) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 5/23/2024.] | |
3 | 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Control International PLC for TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP.. (BLAKE, CHRISTOPHER) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 5/23/2024.] | |
2 | 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney CHRISTOPHER J. BLAKE on behalf of Defendants CHEMGUARD, INC., TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP (BLAKE, CHRISTOPHER) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 5/23/2024.] | |
1 | 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Chatham County Superior Court, case number 24CVS246 against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCMDC-3824430.), filed by TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP, CHEMGUARD, INC..(BLAKE, CHRISTOPHER) Modified on 5/3/2024 to add other court information. (cc) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 5/23/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |