Hernandez v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03155 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | May 22, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Kentucky Eastern, 2:24-cv-00075 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 06, 2024 5:38 AM EDT |
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products L.P.
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
EIDP Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Corporation
13995 Pasteur Boulevard
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33418 |
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
|
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Elizabeth Hernandez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, May 23, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice Other
Thu 05/23 2:24 PM
NOTICE TO NEW COUNSEL : MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) is open as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. All counsel of record are directed to take the steps necessary to be registered as electronic filers in the District of South Carolina if not previously done so ( See CMO No. 3 pg. 17 Electronic Filing at 22. footnote 5 (ECF Multidistrict Litigation Attorney Registration Form - available at the link at the end of this NOTICE). Judge Gergel directs that CMO Nos. 1 - 29, (including any supplemental CMO Nos. i.e., 2.A, etc.) govern all cases in the MDL proceedings and can be viewed in the Lead case. Counsel will be notified by Liaison Counsel re new Case Management Orders and other new documents posted in the lead case. Please contact lead liaison counsel before calling the Court (contact information available at the link at the end of this NOTICE). PLEASE also read CLERKS NOTICE (s) TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 and QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE (s) filed in the Lead case. NOTICE of Hearing : Next Monthly Status Conference will be In-Person (absent further Order from the Court) set for 7/19/2024 9:00 AM. The conference will be conducted in Charleston Courtroom #1, U. S. Court House, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable Richard M Gergel. See the District Court's website containing information on the MDL at[LINK:MDL-2873] (sshe, ) (Entered: 05/23/2024) |
|
13 | 13
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Thu 05/23 2:15 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Kentucky Eastern (associated as of 5/22/2024), 2:24-cv-00075, Hernandez v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-03155-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
11 | 11
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Thu 05/23 2:03 PM
Case transferred in from District of Kentucky Eastern; Case Number 2:24-cv-00075. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Tuesday, May 21, 2024 | ||
10 | 10 CERTIFIED ORDER received from District of South Carolina re: Case Transfer to the MDL Panel pursuant to CTO No. 190 filed in MDL Case Number 2873. (SLG)cc: COR [Transferred from Kentucky Eastern on 5/23/2024.] | |
9 | 9 INFORMATION COPY OF MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER: MDL No. 2873 (SLG) [Transferred from Kentucky Eastern on 5/23/2024.] | |
Monday, May 13, 2024 | ||
8 | 8 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT RETURN re5 Summons Issued/Reissued. (SLG) [Transferred from Kentucky Eastern on 5/23/2024.] | |
Friday, May 10, 2024 | ||
7 | 7 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Chemguard, Inc., filed by Elizabeth Hernandez. (SLG) [Transferred from Kentucky Eastern on 5/23/2024.] | |
Monday, May 06, 2024 | ||
Conflict Check run. (TBB) [Transferred from Kentucky Eastern on 5/23/2024.] | ||
NOTICE FOR ATTORNEY TO UPDATE ADDRESS to Mark E. Yonts: It appears the address listed on your filing1 Complaint is different than the address registered with our Court. Pursuant to the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures governing ECF, a request to update your address must be processed through your PACER account. Please visit the Court's website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov for information or contact the Help Desk at 1-866-485-6349. cc: COR (TBB) [Transferred from Kentucky Eastern on 5/23/2024.] | ||
Friday, May 03, 2024 | ||
6 | 6 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR Re: PDF DOCUMENT: Error: INCORRECT document attached to docket entry by docket clerk; INCORRECT re3 Summons Issued/Reissued, ; Correct document attached to this entry. *TJG* cc: COR (TJG) [Transferred from Kentucky Eastern on 5/23/2024.] | |
5 | 5 Summons Issued as to AGC Chemicals Americas Inc., Chemdesign Products, Inc., Chemguard, Inc., Dupont De Nemours, Inc., Dynax Corporation, National Foam, Inc., Tyco Fire Products L.P., UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc. (including attested copies of the complaint and certified mail return receipts) for service through Kentucky Secretary of State and ready for pick up at the Office of the Clerk. (TJG) [Transferred from Kentucky Eastern on 5/23/2024.] | |
4 | 4 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to assigned U.S. Magistrate Judge at Covington to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, to hold such hearings as may be required, and to rule on nondispositive motions, except motions in limine. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of this court to the undersigned. The final pretrial conference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge; 3) Discovery disputes shall be resolved in the following manner: (1) Parties to meet/confer in an attempt to resolve disputes; (2) If parties unable to resolve such disputes formally, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreements by telephone conference with the Magistrate Judge; 3) If parties unable to resolve their disputes after conference with the Magistrate Judge, they may file appropriate written motions with the Court, which shall include the certification required. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 1/13/2011.(TBB)cc: COR [Transferred from Kentucky Eastern on 5/23/2024.] | |
3 | 3 Summons Issued as Defendants Clariant Corp., Corteva, Inc., EIDP, Inc., Kidde-Fenway, 3M Co., Arkema, Inc., BASF Corp., Carrier Corp., The Chemnours Co. FC, LLC, The Chemours Co. and returned to counsel electronically for service. (TBB) (TJG). Modified text on 5/6/2024 (TJG). [Transferred from Kentucky Eastern on 5/23/2024.] | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT (Filing fee $405; receipt number AKYEDC-5830490), filed by Elizabeth Hernandez.(TBB) [Transferred from Kentucky Eastern on 5/23/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons |