Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:John F Murphy
Case #: 2:24-cv-02226
Nature of Suit443 Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations
Cause42:405 Fair Housing Act
Case Filed:May 24, 2024
Case in other court:Court of Common Pleas Philadelphia, 230601052
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 20, 2024 4:40 AM EST
Cross Claimant
Valley Forge Medical Center and Hospital
Represented By
DANIEL J. DIVIS
Gerolamo Mcnulty Divis & Lewbart PC
contact info
JOSEPH L. GARBARINO, III
Gerolamo Mcnulty Divis & Lewbart
contact info
Cross Defendant
Chaminda R. Jayawardena
Represented By
GARY A. BRIENZA
Peters Moritz Peischl Zulick Landes & Brienza LLP
contact info
Cross Defendant
Re/Max Achievers
Represented By
JOSH J.T. BYRNE
Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin
contact info
Jacob Henry Goldberg Schultz
Marshall Dennehey, P.C.
contact info
Cross Defendant
Unity Sober Living Homes, LLC
Defendant
Chaminda R. Jayawardena
241 W. Wyoming Avenue
Philadelphia, PA 19139
Represented By
MARK W. FIDANZA
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
GARY A. BRIENZA
Peters Moritz Peischl Zulick Landes & Brienza LLP
contact info
Defendant
Re/Max Achievers
1425 S. Collegeville Road
Collegeville, PA 19426
Represented By
MARK W. FIDANZA
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
JOSH J.T. BYRNE
Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin
contact info
Jacob Henry Goldberg Schultz
Marshall Dennehey, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Unity Sober Living Homes, LLC
448 Walnut Street
Pottstown, PA 19464
Represented By
MARK W. FIDANZA
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
ROBERT J. BIRCH
Robert J. Birch, Esq., PC
contact info
Defendant
Valley Forge Medical Center and Hospital
1033 W. Germantown Pike
Norristown, PA 19403
Represented By
MARK W. FIDANZA
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
DANIEL J. DIVIS
Gerolamo Mcnulty Divis & Lewbart PC
contact info
Jacob Henry Goldberg Schultz
Marshall Dennehey, P.C.
contact info
JOSEPH L. GARBARINO, III
Gerolamo Mcnulty Divis & Lewbart
contact info
Plaintiff
John McCready
70 Mill Street
Medford, NJ 08055
Represented By
MARK W. FIDANZA
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Christina Bowen
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Julia Lueddeke
Reed Smith
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
72 72 misc Praecipe/Request (Not Default) Mon 04/28 8:50 PM
attach the following Statement of Undisputed Facts as Exhibit E to Defendant Unity Sober Living Homes, LLCs Motion for Summary Judgment filed at docket #67 by Unity Sober Living Homes, LLC.(BIRCH, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Statement of Undisputed Facts
Friday, April 25, 2025
71 71 motion Summary Partial Judgment Fri 04/25 7:14 PM
MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by John McCready.Memorandum of Law, Declaration of Mark Fidanza, Certificate of Service.(FIDANZA, MARK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order In Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment,
Att: 2 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment,
Att: 3 Declaration OF MARK W. FIDANZA,
Att: 4 Exhibit Plaintiff's Statement of Undisputed Material Facts,
Att: 5 Appendix Records Appendix
70 70 motion Exclude Fri 04/25 7:02 PM
MOTION to Exclude THE EXPERT REPORT OF ENIS HARTZ, OR ALTERNATIVELY, TO PRECLUDE MS. HARTZ FROM TESTIFYING AT TRIAL filed by John McCready.Memorandum, Declaration, Certificate of Service.(FIDANZA, MARK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Memorandum OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO STRIKE THE EXPERT REPORT OF ENIS HARTZ, OR ALTERNATIVELY, TO PRECLUDE MS. HARTZ FROM TESTIFYING AT TRIAL,
Att: 3 Declaration OF MARK W. FIDANZA,
Att: 4 Exhibit A - PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT AND LAY OPINION DISCLOSURES,
Att: 5 Exhibit B - Re/Max Achievers Expert and Lay Opinion Testimony Disclosures,,
Att: 6 Exhibit C - Expert Report of Enis L. Hartz,
Att: 7 Exhibit D - Excerpted Deposition Transcript of Enis Hartz,
Att: 8 Exhibit E - EMAIL EXCHANGE WITH COUNSEL FOR RE/MAX
69 69 motion Summary Judgment Fri 04/25 5:08 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Re/Max Achievers.Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service.(BYRNE, JOSH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix Statement of Undisputed Facts,
Att: 2 Exhibit A 1 PL CP,
Att: 3 Exhibit A 2 PL CP,
Att: 4 Exhibit B PL Amended CP,
Att: 5 Exhibit C1 Notice of Removal,
Att: 6 Exhibit C2 Notice of Removal,
Att: 7 Exhibit D Dep of Jayawardena,
Att: 8 Exhibit E Dep of Salkowski,
Att: 9 Exhibit F1 Dep of Plaintiff,
Att: 10 Exhibit F2 Dep of Plaintiff,
Att: 11 Exhibit F3 Dep of Plaintiff,
Att: 12 Exhibit G PL RSP to RFA,
Att: 13 Exhibit H1 Dep of Hinton,
Att: 14 Exhibit H2 Dep of Hinton
68 68 motion Preclude Fri 04/25 4:16 PM
MOTION to Preclude DEFENDANTS EXPERT JONATHAN A. BEATTY FROM TESTIFYING AT TRIAL filed by John McCready.Memorandum of Law, Declaration of Mark Fidanza, Certificate of Service.(FIDANZA, MARK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Memorandum OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO PRECLUDE DEFENDANTS EXPERT JONATHAN A. BEATTY FROM TESTIFYING AT TRIAL,
Att: 3 Declaration OF MARK W. FIDANZA,
Att: 4 Exhibit A - DR. BEATTY REPORT,
Att: 5 Exhibit B - UNITY'S EXPERT AND LAY OPINION DISCLOSURES,
Att: 6 Exhibit C - DR. BEATTY DEPOSITION,
Att: 7 Exhibit D - DR. VALDEZ REPORT,
Att: 8 Exhibit E - FRIENDS HOSPITAL RECORDS,
Att: 9 Exhibit F - GOODWILL AMBULANCE RECORDS,
Att: 10 Exhibit G - POTTSTOWN MEDICAL RECORDS,
Att: 11 Exhibit H - PENN MEDICINE RECORDS,
Att: 12 Exhibit I - EAGLEVILLE RECORDS
67 67 motion Summary Partial Judgment Fri 04/25 2:46 PM
MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Unity Sober Living Homes, LLC.Memorandum.(BIRCH, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Exhibit Deposition of John McCready,
Att: 3 Exhibit Unity's Rules,
Att: 4 Exhibit Deposition Enis Hartz,
Att: 5 Exhibit Deposition Darnell Hinton,
Att: 6 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, April 24, 2025
66 66 2 pgs order Order Thu 04/24 4:15 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PURSUANT TO FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), PLAINTIFF VOLUNTARILY DISMISSES WITH PREJUDICE THE CLAIMS ALLEGED IN THE AMENDED COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN F MURPHY ON 4/24/25. 4/24/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
Related: [-]
65 65 misc Stipulation Thu 04/24 1:12 PM
STIPULATION by John McCready. (FIDANZA, MARK)
Related: [-]