District Of Columbia District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-00202
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2024
Last checked: Saturday May 25, 2024 3:34 AM EDT
Defendant
JOSEPH RUBEN BAER (1)
Represented By
Maria Jacob
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Paul Vincent Courtney
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/02/2024 9:58 PM EST
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
1 1 1 pgs SEALED COMPLAINT as to JOSEPH RUBEN BAER (1). (zstd) [1:24-mj-00144-RMM *SEALED*]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Statement of Facts
3 3 MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to JOSEPH RUBEN BAER.(zstd) [1:24-mj-00144-RMM *SEALED*]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
4 4 ORDER granting3 Motion to Seal Case as to JOSEPH RUBEN BAER (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather on 4/24/2024. (zstd) [1:24-mj-00144-RMM *SEALED*]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
5 5 3 pgs INDICTMENT as to JOSEPH RUBEN BAER (1) count(s) 1. (FORFEITURE ALLEGATION) (zljn)
Related: [-]
7 7 MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to JOSEPH RUBEN BAER.(zljn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
8 8 ORDER granting7 Motion to Seal Case as to JOSEPH RUBEN BAER (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Moxila A. Upadhyaya on 04/25/2024. (zljn)
Related: [-]