New Jersey District Court
Judge:Julien Xavier Neals
Referred: Leda D Wettre
Case #: 2:24-cv-06475
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:May 28, 2024
Terminated:Nov 25, 2024
Case in other court:District of Columbia, 1:24-cv-00759
Last checked: Sunday Nov 24, 2024 5:22 AM EST
Defendant
IFORTRESS MANUFACTURING, LLC
Represented By
ALLISON BROOKE GOTFRIED
Venable LLP
contact info
Defendant
IFORTRESS, INC.
Represented By
ALLISON BROOKE GOTFRIED
Venable LLP
contact info
Notice Only
PHV RALPH A. DENGLER
Notice Only
PHV DAVID LUDWIG
Notice Only
PHV KEVIN W. WEIGAND
Notice Only
PHV DAVID TRINNES
Plaintiff
HAYES GROUP INTERNATIONAL
Represented By
ROLANDO A. DIAZ
Dunlap Bennett & Ludwig, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, November 25, 2024
43 43 2 pgs order Order of Dismissal Wed 11/27 12:55 PM
STIPULATION & ORDER OF DISMISSAL with prejudice. Signed by Judge Julien Xavier Neals on 11/25/2024. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
42 42 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (aty) Fri 11/22 4:43 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice Pursuant to FRCP 41 by HAYES GROUP INTERNATIONAL. (DIAZ, ROLANDO)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
41 41 order Scheduling Order Fri 09/27 12:00 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 1/15/2025 at 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Amended Pleadings due by 1/10/2025. Fact Discovery due by 4/30/2025. Joinder of Parties due by 1/10/2025.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 9/27/2024. (ld, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Wed 09/25 12:24 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 9/25/2024. (LM, )
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
40 40 discov Joint Discovery Plan Fri 09/20 12:28 PM
Joint Discovery Plan by HAYES GROUP INTERNATIONAL.(DIAZ, ROLANDO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
39 39 respm Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion Tue 08/27 2:16 PM
REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by IFORTRESS, INC. re31 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint (GOTFRIED, ALLISON)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
38 38 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 08/20 1:24 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition filed by HAYES GROUP INTERNATIONAL re31 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint (DIAZ, ROLANDO)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice counsel added Mon 08/12 10:29 AM
Pro Hac Vice counsel, DAVID TRINNES, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
37 37 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Thu 08/08 10:22 AM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice David Trinnes to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 250 receipt number ANJDC-15575249.) (DIAZ, ROLANDO)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
36 36 2 pgs order Order Wed 08/07 12:10 PM
ORDER admitting PHV as to DAVID TRINNES, ESQ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 8/7/2024. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
35 35 misc Letter Tue 08/06 12:34 PM
Letter from from Rolando Diaz, Esq. to Hon. Leda D. Wettre, U.S.M.J. re Pro Hac Vice Application.(DIAZ, ROLANDO)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of Rolando Diaz, Esq.,
Att: 2 Certification of David Trinnes, Esq.,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
34 34 respm Letter Rule 7.1 Tue 07/30 1:54 PM
Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re31 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint . (DIAZ, ROLANDO)
Related: [-]
33 33 misc Letter Tue 07/30 1:21 PM
Letter re32 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings. (GOTFRIED, ALLISON)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 07/30 2:52 PM
Set Deadlines as to31 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint . Motion set for 8/19/2024 before Judge Julien Xavier Neals. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (lag, )
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 07/30 2:54 PM
Reset Deadlines as to31 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint . Motion set for 9/3/2024 before Judge Julien Xavier Neals. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
32 32 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 07/29 4:36 PM
LETTER ORDER scheduling Initial Conference on 9/25/2024 at 12:00 PM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 7/29/2024. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
31 31 motion Dismiss Fri 07/26 5:15 PM
MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint by IFORTRESS, INC.. Responses due by 8/5/2024.(GOTFRIED, ALLISON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
30 30 misc Diversity Disclosure Statement Fri 07/26 5:09 PM
Diversity Disclosure Statement by IFORTRESS, INC.. (GOTFRIED, ALLISON)
Related: [-]
29 29 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Fri 07/26 4:58 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by IFORTRESS, INC.. (GOTFRIED, ALLISON)
Related: [-]
28 28 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 07/26 2:32 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against IFORTRESS, INC., filed by HAYES GROUP INTERNATIONAL.(DIAZ, ROLANDO)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J,
Att: 11 Exhibit K,
Att: 12 Exhibit L,
Att: 13 Exhibit M,
Att: 14 Exhibit N,
Att: 15 Exhibit O,
Att: 16 Exhibit P,
Att: 17 Exhibit Q,
Att: 18 Exhibit R,
Att: 19 Exhibit S,
Att: 20 Exhibit T,
Att: 21 Exhibit U,
Att: 22 Exhibit V,
Att: 23 Exhibit W,
Att: 24 Exhibit X,
Att: 25 Exhibit Y,
Att: 26 Exhibit Z
Friday, July 19, 2024
27 27 order Order Fri 07/19 3:09 PM
TEXT ORDER - This matter comes before the Court upon the pre-motion letter filed by Defendant regarding its proposed motion to dismiss. (ECF No.23 ) Having read the parties' submissions, including Plaintiff's response (ECF No.26 ), the Court does not believe that a pre-motion conference would be productive at this time. Therefore, Defendant may proceed by filing its proposed motion. Prior to, Plaintiff may file an amended complaint, by July 26, 2024, to correct the case caption and reflect the proper Defendant. So Ordered by Judge Julien Xavier Neals on 7/19/2024. (kd)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice counsel added Fri 06/21 11:22 AM
Pro Hac Vice counsel, RALPH A. DENGLER, ESQ., and KEVIN W. WEIGAND, ESQ., has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ld, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
26 26 misc Letter Tue 06/18 10:32 AM
Letter from David Ludwig re23 Letter. (DIAZ, ROLANDO)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
25 25 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Mon 06/17 4:39 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Kevin W. Weigand to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (GOTFRIED, ALLISON)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Mon 06/17 4:39 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Ralph A. Dengler to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (GOTFRIED, ALLISON)
Related: [-]
misc Pro Hac Vice Fee Received Mon 06/17 11:15 AM
Pro Hac Vice fee as to RALPH A. DENGLER and KEVIN W. WEIGAND $ 500, receipt number TRE139029 (jal, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice counsel added Wed 06/12 10:05 AM
Pro Hac Vice counsel, DAVID LUDWIG, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
23 23 misc Letter Tue 06/11 4:47 PM
Letter. (GOTFRIED, ALLISON)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
22 22 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Mon 06/10 11:55 AM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice David Ludwig to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 250 receipt number ANJDC-15433281.) (DIAZ, ROLANDO)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
21 21 3 pgs order Order Fri 06/07 4:30 PM
ORDER ADMITTING DAVID LUDWIG PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 6/7/2024. (sm)
Related: [-]
20 20 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 06/07 3:54 PM
ORDER granting18 and19 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of RALPH A. DENGLER and KEVIN W. WEIGAND. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 6/7/2024. (wh)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 06/07 12:57 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kevin W. Weigand by IFORTRESS MANUFACTURING, LLC.(GOTFRIED, ALLISON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Kevin W. Weigand,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
18 18 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 06/07 12:38 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Ralph A. Dengler by IFORTRESS MANUFACTURING, LLC.(GOTFRIED, ALLISON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Ralph Dengler,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration - Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 06/04 2:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ALLISON BROOKE GOTFRIED on behalf of IFORTRESS MANUFACTURING, LLC (GOTFRIED, ALLISON)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
16 16 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 05/31 12:45 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice David Ludwig by HAYES GROUP INTERNATIONAL.(DIAZ, ROLANDO)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of David Ludwig,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 05/31 4:37 PM
Set Deadlines as to16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice David Ludwig . Motion set for 7/1/2024 before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
notice Notice of Judicial Preferences Thu 05/30 3:04 PM
Notice of Judicial Preferences.[LINK:Click here] for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (kd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
15 15 misc Diversity Disclosure Statement Tue 05/28 7:03 PM
Diversity Disclosure Statement by HAYES GROUP INTERNATIONAL. (DIAZ, ROLANDO)
Related: [-]
14 14 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 05/28 7:02 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against IFORTRESS MANUFACTURING, LLC, filed by HAYES GROUP INTERNATIONAL.(DIAZ, ROLANDO)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J,
Att: 11 Exhibit K,
Att: 12 Exhibit L,
Att: 13 Exhibit M,
Att: 14 Exhibit N,
Att: 15 Exhibit O,
Att: 16 Exhibit P,
Att: 17 Exhibit Q,
Att: 18 Exhibit R,
Att: 19 Exhibit S,
Att: 20 Exhibit T,
Att: 21 Exhibit U,
Att: 22 Exhibit V,
Att: 23 Exhibit W,
Att: 24 Exhibit X,
Att: 25 Exhibit Y,
Att: 26 Exhibit Z
13 13 transfer Case Transferred In - District Court Transfer Tue 05/28 1:00 PM
Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:24-cv-00759. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 05/28 3:09 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Julien Xavier Neals and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (ak, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
12 12 ORDER granting the Motion to Transfer this Case to the US District Court for the District of New Jersey. Plaintiff shall have until and including 14 daysfrom the date of this Order to file an Amended Complaint with the District of New Jerse. (Transfer due by 5/24/2024) (Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 5/13/24) (tj)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
11 11 Consent MOTION to Transfer Case and Set Deadlines by HAYES GROUP INTERNATIONAL. (Ludwig, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
10 10 MOTION to Dismiss by IFORTRESS MANUFACTURING, LLC.(Weigand, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
9 9 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by IFORTRESS MANUFACTURING, LLC (Weigand, Kevin)
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER granting7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). [LINK:Click for instructions] . Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on April 24, 2024. (lcmo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
7 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Ralph Albert Dengler, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10846634. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by IFORTRESS MANUFACTURING, LLC.(Weigand, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Ralph Albert Dengler,
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 4/24/2024 (tj)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
6 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by IFORTRESS MANUFACTURING, LLC.(Weigand, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
5 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin William Weigand on behalf of IFORTRESS MANUFACTURING, LLC (Weigand, Kevin)
Related: [-]
MINUTE ORDER granting6 Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant shall file a response on or before April 24, 2024. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on April 8, 2024. (lcmo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
4 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. IFORTRESS MANUFACTURING, LLC served on 3/20/2024, answer due 4/10/2024 (Ludwig, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
3 3 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to IFORTRESS MANUFACTURING, LLC. (znmw)
Related: [-]
Case Assigned to Judge Paul L. Friedman. (znmw)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
2 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by HAYES GROUP INTERNATIONAL (Ludwig, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against IFORTRESS MANUFACTURING, LLC with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-10758009) filed by HAYES GROUP INTERNATIONAL.(Ludwig, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Exhibit,
Att: 9 Exhibit,
Att: 10 Exhibit,
Att: 11 Exhibit,
Att: 12 Exhibit,
Att: 13 Exhibit,
Att: 14 Exhibit,
Att: 15 Exhibit,
Att: 16 Exhibit,
Att: 17 Exhibit,
Att: 18 Exhibit,
Att: 19 Exhibit,
Att: 20 Exhibit,
Att: 21 Exhibit,
Att: 22 Exhibit