New York Southern District Court
Judge:Andrew L Carter, Jr
Case #: 1:24-cv-04065
Nature of Suit245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability
Cause28:1442 Notice of Removal - Suit against Federal Officer
Case Filed:May 28, 2024
Terminated:Jun 21, 2024
Case in other court:New York Supreme Court, New York County, 152325/2024
Last checked: Sunday Nov 24, 2024 5:12 AM EST
Defendant
Doe Defendants 1-20
Defendant
The 3M Company
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC, LLC,
Defendant
The Chemours Company,
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products, LP
Represented By
Thomas J. Herten
Archer & Greiner, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc.
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
Defendant
E. I. DuPont De Nemours and Company
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
Defendant
DuPont De Nemours Inc.
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals, Inc.
196122 E County Road 40
Woodward, OK 73801
Defendant
Corteva, Inc.
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
Defendant
Chemicals, Inc.
12321 Hatcherville
Baytown, TX 77520
Defendant
Chemguard Inc.
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143
Represented By
Thomas J. Herten
Archer & Greiner, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Chemdesign Products Inc.
2 Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Kings Mountain, NC 28086
Defendant
Arkema, Inc.
Defendant
Archroma U.S. Inc.
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
Plaintiff
Susan Venable
Plaintiff
Philip Stern
Plaintiff
Amy Stevens
Plaintiff
Robin Stevens
Plaintiff
Lester Summers
Plaintiff
Ulises Tecles
Plaintiff
Theresa Perrault
Plaintiff
Ruben Perez
Plaintiff
Jody Pendergast
Plaintiff
Robert Thomas
Plaintiff
Sergei Thomas
Plaintiff
Logan Thompson
Plaintiff
Lanaye Peeples
Plaintiff
Charles Smith
Plaintiff
Craig Walker
Plaintiff
Shawn Walker
Plaintiff
Michael Walters
Plaintiff
Alicia Watts
Plaintiff
Burton Watts
Plaintiff
James Weighill
Plaintiff
Pamela Wetter
Plaintiff
Donald Whedon
Plaintiff
Anthony Whitehurst
Plaintiff
Marcia Pearce
Plaintiff
Allen Patterson
Plaintiff
James Roberts
Plaintiff
Stephen Petite
Plaintiff
Justin Pfaltzgraff
Plaintiff
Edmond Prawl
Plaintiff
James Prendergast
Plaintiff
Monica Price
Plaintiff
Leonard Purcell
Plaintiff
Richard Raygoza
Plaintiff
John Reeves
Plaintiff
Tami Richardson
Plaintiff
Christina Rino
Plaintiff
Jeremy Ritter
Plaintiff
Tanisha Roberson
Plaintiff
Alpha Peters
Plaintiff
Sheila Robinson
Plaintiff
Juan Rogers
Plaintiff
Mary Rye
Plaintiff
Timothy Sadlier
Plaintiff
Melanie Santana
Plaintiff
Angela Schullo
Plaintiff
Eduardo Sendejo
Plaintiff
Anne Serby
Plaintiff
Libby Shields
Plaintiff
Angela Slade
Plaintiff
Lynette Smedley


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, June 21, 2024
4 4 transfer MDL Conditional Transfer Out Order Fri 07/12 1:11 PM
CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina. (Signed by MDL Panel on 6/21/2024) (vba)
Related: [-]
transfer MDL Transfer Out Fri 07/12 1:12 PM
MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina.(vba)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Thu 05/30 9:48 AM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Judge Edgardo Ramos is no longer assigned to the case. (tro)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Wed 05/29 2:03 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(sj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 05/29 2:03 PM
Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (sj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 05/29 2:04 PM
Case Designated ECF. (sj)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Wed 05/29 3:55 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Judge Analisa Torres is no longer assigned to the case. (tro)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
3 3 service Certificate of Service Other Tue 05/28 2:13 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal and Civil Cover Sheet served on All Parties on 05/28/2024. Document filed by Chemguard Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP(as successor in interest to The Ansul Company), Tyco Fire Products, LP(individually)..(Herten, Thomas)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 05/28 2:12 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Herten, Thomas)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Tue 05/28 2:10 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 152325/2024. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29406765).Document filed by Tyco Fire Products, LP(as successor in interest to The Ansul Company), Tyco Fire Products, LP(individually), Chemguard Inc...(Herten, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - NY State Court Complaint