Arizona District Court
Judge:Stephen M Mcnamee
Case #: 2:24-cv-01251
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:May 28, 2024
Terminated:Sep 25, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Nov 24, 2024 2:58 AM MST
Defendant
Primal Health LP
Plaintiff
Deborah Schick
Represented By
Ryan Lee McBride
Kazerouni Law Group Apc - San Diego, Ca
contact info
David James McGlothlin
Kazerouni Law Group Apc - Bethany Home
contact info


Docket last updated: 64 minutes ago
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 09/25 9:46 AM
ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to terminate this action in its entirety. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 9/25/24. (EJA)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Entire Case/Action Mon 09/23 11:45 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Deborah Schick. (McBride, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
5 5 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 09/13 4:56 PM
ORDER - Plaintiff is notified that this matter will be dismissed if Plaintiff fails to show good cause no later than 9/24/24, for its failure to serve the summons and complaint. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 9/13/24. (NKS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 05/28 1:24 PM
Summons Issued as to Primal Health LP. (REK)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc New Case Opened Tue 05/28 1:22 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-23086346. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Stephen M McNamee. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 24-01251 PHX-SMM. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Submitted Tue 05/28 1:21 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Deborah Schick. (submitted by Ryan McBride) (REK)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 05/28 1:19 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number AAZDC-23086346 filed by Deborah Schick. (submitted by Ryan McBride)(REK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet