California Central District Court
Judge:Andre Birotte Jr
Referred: Alka Sagar
Case #: 2:24-cv-04435
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Fraud
Case Filed:May 28, 2024
Case in other court:Superior Court of California County of Los Angeles, 23STCV17025
Last checked: Sunday Nov 24, 2024 2:15 AM PST
Defendant
Wendy Curd
Represented By
George B Piggott
George B Piggott Law Offices Apc
contact info
Defendant
Steve Curd
Represented By
George B Piggott
George B Piggott Law Offices Apc
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Yellow Matter Entertainment, LLC
Represented By
Nadia Darkazalli Adams
Sheppard Mullin Richter And Hampton LLP
contact info
Amanda Brooke Zemel
Sheppard Mullin Richter And Hampton LLP
contact info
Travis J Anderson
Sheppard Mullin Richter And Hampton LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
45 45 stip Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days) Mon 04/28 11:51 AM
Third STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 06/16/2025 re Amended Complaint/Petition42 filed by Defendant Wendy Curd.(Piggott, George)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
44 44 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Wed 04/16 6:52 PM
Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Wendy Curd answer now due 4/30/2025, re Amended Complaint/Petition42 filed by Defendant Wendy Curd.(Piggott, George)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
43 43 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Fri 03/21 5:54 PM
First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Wendy Curd answer now due 4/21/2025, re Amended Complaint/Petition42 Wendy Curd.(Piggott, George)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
42 42 othcmp Amended Complaint/Petition Mon 03/17 4:56 PM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Amended Complaint/Petition20 , filed by Plaintiff Yellow Matter Entertainment, LLC(Anderson, Travis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Joint Development Agreement
Friday, March 07, 2025
41 41 2 pgs order Order Mon 03/10 9:33 AM
ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court HEREBY ORDERS Plaintiff Yellow Matter Entertainment, LLC to file a Second Amended Complaint within ten days of this Order. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint by 3/17/2025, the case will be dismissed. Defendant Wendy Curd's Proposed Order (Dkt. No. 39) is stricken. (gk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
40 40 misc Objection Tue 02/18 9:58 AM
OBJECTIONS to Notice of Lodging39 Wendy Curd's Proposed Judgment filed by Plaintiff Yellow Matter Entertainment, LLC. (Anderson, Travis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
39 39 notice Notice of Lodging Wed 02/12 2:58 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Order on Motion to Dismiss,38(Piggott, George)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Judgment
Friday, February 07, 2025
38 38 order Dismiss Mon 02/10 1:53 PM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.22 The Court GRANTS Defendant's Motion pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) with leave to amend. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) is GRANTED with leave to amend. Defendant is ORDERED to file a Proposed Judgment within 5 days of this Order. Plaintiff will have 5 days thereafter to object as to form. IT IS SO ORDERED. [See Order for details.] (san)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
37 37 respoth Amended Answer to Complaint Thu 12/05 12:01 PM
AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Steve Curd. (Piggott, George)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
36 36 2 pgs order Order Wed 12/04 8:24 PM
ORDER GRANTING LEAVE FOR DEFENDANT STEVE CURD TO FILE FIRST AMENDED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT35 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Defendant Steve Curd is granted leave to file his First Amended Answer to Complaint, in the form attached as Exhibit 1 to the Stipulation. (rolm)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
35 35 stip Amend/Correct Mon 12/02 6:00 PM
STIPULATION to AMEND Answer to Complaint (Discovery) filed by Plaintiff Steve Curd.(Piggott, George)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Leave for Defendant Steve Curd to File First Amended Answer to Complaint
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
34 34 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 10/08 11:34 AM
ORDER ON STIPULATION FOR ORDER MODIFYING SCHEDULING ORDER TO PROVIDE FOR A JURY TRIAL by Judge Andre Birotte Jr, re Stipulation to Amend/Correct33 : The Court, having reviewed the Parties' Stipulation to Modify Scheduling, and finding good cause therein, issues the following Order: The October 1, 2024, Scheduling Order (Dkt. 32) is hereby modified to provide for a Jury Trial with an estimated duration of 5-6 days. All other provisions in the Scheduling Order remain unchanged. (bm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
32 32 18 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 10/01 11:59 AM
ORDER RE: CIVIL JURY/COURT TRIAL I. SCHEDULE II. TRIAL PREPARATION III. CONDUCT OF ATTORNEYS AND PARTIES by Judge Andre Birotte Jr,. Court Trial set for 02/02/2026 at 8:30 a.m Final Pretrial Conference, Hearing on Motions In Limine set for 01/16/2026 at 11:00 a.m. [SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS AND DEADLINES.] (es)
Related: [-]
31 31 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 1) (Judge) (ADR-12) Tue 10/01 9:58 AM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 1 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Case ordered to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar for Settlement Conference. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 11/7/2025. (dta)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
30 30 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 09/25 3:25 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING DEFENDANTS MOTION (DKT.22 ) UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court has considered the matters raised with respect to the Motion and has concluded that pursuant to Local Rule 7.15, the matter can be decided without oral argument. The Court advises counsel that the Motion, noticed for hearing on 10/4/2024, has been taken under submission and off its motion calendar. No appearance by counsel is necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dta)
Related: [-]
29 29 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 09/25 3:23 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court has reviewed the Joint Rule 26(f) Report submitted by the parties, and determines that an in-person Scheduling Conference is unnecessary. Accordingly, the Court VACATES the 10/4/2024, Scheduling Conference. Order re Jury/Court Trial to issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dta)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
28 28 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Fri 09/20 5:57 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 10 days, filed by Plaintiff Yellow Matter Entertainment, LLC..(Anderson, Travis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet
Friday, August 02, 2024
27 27 respm Reply (Motion related) Fri 08/02 4:01 PM
REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Second and Third Causes of Action of First Amended Complaint 22 filed by Defendant Wendy Curd. (Piggott, George)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
26 26 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 07/26 3:03 PM
OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Second and Third Causes of Action of First Amended Complaint 22 filed by Plaintiff Yellow Matter Entertainment, LLC.(Adams, Nadia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Travis Anderson,
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Thursday, July 25, 2024
25 25 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Fri 07/26 10:30 AM
ORDER RE STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON WENDY CURDS MOTION TO DISMISS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court, having considered the parties' Stipulation24 , hereby ORDERS as follows: The hearing on Wendy Curd's Motion to Dismiss22 is rescheduled to 10/4/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. YME's brief in opposition to Wendy Curd's Motion will be filed and served on or before 8/26/2024. Wendy Curd's reply brief in support of the Motion will be filed and served no later than 8/2/2024. The Scheduling Conference is rescheduled to 10/4/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (gk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
24 24 stip Continue Thu 07/18 4:16 PM
STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Wendy Curd's Motion to Dismiss and Scheduling Conference from August 9 and August 2, 2024 to August 23, 2024 Re: Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only18 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Second and Third Causes of Action of First Amended Complaint 22 filed by Plaintiff Yellow Matter Entertainment, LLC.(Adams, Nadia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Continue Hearing on Motion to Dismiss and Scheduling Conference
Friday, July 12, 2024
23 23 respm Amendment (Motion related) Fri 07/12 5:47 PM
Amendment to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Second and Third Causes of Action of First Amended Complaint 22 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Wendy Curd. (Piggott, George)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Dismiss (cause or other) Fri 07/12 5:37 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Second and Third Causes of Action of First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Wendy Curd. Motion set for hearing on 8/9/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attorney George B Piggott added to party Wendy Curd(pty:dft)) (Piggott, George)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of George B. Piggott ISO Defendant Wendy Curd's Motion to Dismiss
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
21 21 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 06/18 11:49 AM
Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Yellow Matter Entertainment, LLC, identifying Yellow Matter Entertainment, LLC; Steven Slate Lintz; Deborah Lintz; Steve Curd; Wendy Curd. (Anderson, Travis)
Related: [-]
20 20 othcmp Amended Complaint/Petition Tue 06/18 11:48 AM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Amended Complaint, Complaint - (Discovery), JURY DEMAND, filed by Plaintiff Yellow Matter Entertainment, LLC(Anderson, Travis)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
19 19 2 pgs order Order Mon 06/17 2:37 PM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO AMEND COMPLAINT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court, having considered the parties' Stipulation16 , orders that Plaintiff Yellow Matter Entertainment, LLC ("YME") is permitted to file an amended complaint as to Defendant Wendy Curd only within three court days of today's date. Defendant Wendy Curd shall be required to file and serve a response to the amended complaint within 14 days of the date YME files its amended complaint. (gk)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
18 18 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Mon 06/10 9:59 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. set for 8/2/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (dta)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 06/10 8:32 AM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (dta)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
16 16 stip Amend/Correct Fri 06/07 3:52 PM
STIPULATION to Amended Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Yellow Matter Entertainment, LLC.(Adams, Nadia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
15 15 order Transferring Case (Related Case)(CV-34) Tue 06/04 4:03 PM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges. Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:24-cv-04303 AB(ASx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero and Judge Philip S. Gutierrez to Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:24-cv-04435 AB(ASx). Signed by Judge Andre Birotte Jr (rn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
14 14 notice Related Case(s) Thu 05/30 4:15 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Steve Curd. Second Amended Notice of Related Case Related Case(s): 2:24-cv-04303 AB (ASx) (Piggott, George)
Related: [-]
13 13 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Thu 05/30 12:51 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. This matter is set for a scheduling conference on August 16, 2024 at 2:00 p.m. See order for details. (lom)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 05/30 11:31 AM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Thu 05/30 10:44 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
Related: [-]
10 10 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Thu 05/30 10:43 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 05/30 10:42 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (et)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
8 8 misc Miscellaneous Document Tue 05/28 11:54 PM
Certificate of Service of Notice to Adverse Party of Removal of Action to Federal Court filed by Defendant steve curd re: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 (Piggott, George)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Amended Document (Non-Motion) Tue 05/28 11:11 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Defendant steve curd. Amendment to Notice of Related Case(s)4 (Piggott, George)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Joinder Tue 05/28 11:07 PM
JOINDER filed by Defendant Wendy Curd joining in Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 . (Piggott, George)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Miscellaneous Document Tue 05/28 11:01 PM
Demand for Jury Trial filed by Defendant steve curd re: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 (Piggott, George)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Related Case(s) Tue 05/28 10:52 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant steve curd. Related Case(s): 2:24-cv-04303 AB (ASx) (Piggott, George)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Disclosure Tue 05/28 10:44 PM
DISCLOSURE re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant steve curd (Piggott, George)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 05/28 10:37 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant steve curd. (Piggott, George)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 05/28 10:29 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California County of Los Angeles, case number 23STCV17025 Receipt No: ACACDC-37548250 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant steve curd. (Attorney George B Piggott added to party steve curd(pty:dft))(Piggott, George)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Thu 05/30 10:59 AM
CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Steve Curd, Wendy Curd, Does 1 to 5, inclusive, filed by Plaintiff Yellow Matter Entertainment, LLC. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 7/20/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT 1 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ). (et)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Thu 05/30 11:00 AM
CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF ANSWER TO COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Steve Curd. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 5/24/2024 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT 5 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ). (et)
Related: [-]
othcmp Amended Complaint Thu 05/30 11:09 AM
CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT, Upon the filing of the complaint, the plaintiff being ignorant of the true name of the defendant and having designated the defendant in the complaint to be DOE 1 and having discovered the true name of the defendant to be WENDY CURD, filed by Plaintiff Yellow Matter Entertainment, LLC. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 5/2/2024 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT 3 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ). (et)
Related: [-]