Georgia Middle District Court
Judge:Clay D Land
Case #: 3:24-cv-00045
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:May 31, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Nov 28, 2024 3:20 AM EST
Defendant
CLARKE COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT
Represented By
TAYLOR WAYNE HENSEL
Buckley Christopher, P.C.
contact info
WILLIAM DRIGGERS
contact info
Defendant
ESS SOUTHEAST LLC
Represented By
SEAN KEENAN
contact info
Defendant
SUZANNE KENNEDY 30
Represented By
TAYLOR WAYNE HENSEL
Buckley Christopher, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
ASIA MCGEE
Represented By
WAYNE O ADAMS, III
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, April 24, 2025
45 45 order Order on Motion to Compel Order on Motion for Sanctions Thu 04/24 11:09 AM
This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER terminating29 Motion to Compel; terminating30 Motion to Compel; denying30 Motion for Sanctions. The Court ruled on these motions during a zoom video conference hearing. See the official transcript for more information. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 4/24/2025 (glg)
Related: [-]
44 44 minutes Motion Hearing Thu 04/24 11:07 AM
TEXT ONLY Minute Entry (content for administrative purposes only) for proceedings held before US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND: Motion Hearing held on 4/24/2025 re29 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendant Clarke County School District filed by ASIA MCGEE,18 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendant Clarke County School District filed by ASIA MCGEE,30 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendant ESS Southeast, LLC MOTION for Sanctions filed by ASIA MCGEE,38 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by SUZANNE KENNEDY, CLARKE COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT,19 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendant ESS Southeast, LLC filed by ASIA MCGEE (Court Reporter Joan Drammeh.). Plantiff's counsel- Wayne Adams. Defense counsel- Jaci Gilliland, Sean Keenan, Taylor Hensel. This hearing was held via Zoom video conference from the Columbus, GA courtroom. See the official transcript for more information. Court Reporter: Joan Drammeh.Time in Court: 9:28am. (glg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
43 43 notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Thu 04/17 11:32 AM
Motion Hearing set for 4/24/2025 09:30 AM in Columbus before US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND. NOTICE OF SETTING HEARING ON MOTION re29 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendant Clarke County School District ,30 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendant ESS Southeast, LLC MOTION for Sanctions. Hearing will occur via VIDEOCONFERENCE . Counsel has received connection information by separate email. Interested parties may obtain dial information by emailing Athens.ecf@gamd.uscourts.gov. (glg) Modified on 4/17/2025-to add counsel has been emailed the zoom information (glg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
42 42 11 pgs respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 04/02 6:31 PM
REPLY to Response filed by ASIA MCGEE re30 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendant ESS Southeast, LLC MOTION for Sanctions(ADAMS, WAYNE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Supplemental Declaration of Wayne Adams in Support of Combined Motions to Compel and for Sanctions Against ESS,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. 1-ESS's Fourth Supp. Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. 2-ESS's 2023 Corporate Tax Return,
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex. 3-ESS's Third Supp. Responses to Plaintiff's Interrogatories,
Att: 5 33 pgs Exhibit Ex. 4A-Pages 1-32 of Plaintiff's Responses to ESS's Interrogatories,
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex. 4B-Pages 33-66 of Plaintiff's Responses to ESS's Interrogatories,
Att: 7 Exhibit Ex. 5-Plaintiff's Responses to ESS's Requests for Production
Friday, March 21, 2025
41 41 20 pgs respm Response to Motion Fri 03/21 12:29 AM
RESPONSE filed by ESS SOUTHEAST LLC re30 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendant ESS Southeast, LLC MOTION for Sanctions(GILLILAND, JACI)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 11 pgs Exhibit Gilliland Declaration,
Att: 2 2 pgs Exhibit COS ESS Discovey Req,
Att: 3 2 pgs Exhibit COS Plaintiff Response to Discovery,
Att: 4 8 pgs Exhibit ESS Fourth Supp Response to RPD,
Att: 5 24 pgs Exhibit Transcript of ESS designee
Saturday, March 15, 2025
40 40 respm Reply to Response to Motion Sat 03/15 12:23 AM
REPLY to Response filed by ASIA MCGEE re29 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendant Clarke County School District(ADAMS, WAYNE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Supplemental Declaration of Wayne Adams,
Att: 2 7 pgs Exhibit Notes of In-Person Meeting,
Att: 3 Exhibit CCSD Policy on Discrimination Complaints,
Att: 4 Exhibit Worthy Dep., pp. 26-27,
Att: 5 Exhibit Wade to Drayton email, Aug. 7, 2023,
Att: 6 2 pgs Exhibit Wade Dep. p. 90,
Att: 7 Exhibit EEOC Notice of Charge of Discrimination. to CCSD,
Att: 8 Exhibit Redacted Litigation Hold Letter to CCSD
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
39 39 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 03/12 10:56 AM
This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting38 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery: Discovery to be complete by 3/21/2025. Dispositive motions due by 5/5/2025. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 03/12/2025 (and)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
38 38 4 pgs motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Tue 03/11 4:58 PM
JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by CLARKE COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT, SUZANNE KENNEDY filed by RHEA LEANA BOSTICK, I.(BOSTICK, RHEA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Order on Joint Motion to Extend Discovery Period
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
37 37 order Order on Motion to Continue Tue 03/04 11:10 AM
This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting36 Motion to Continue Hearing on Motion to Compel. Due to counsel's legitimate conflict, the hearing scheduled for April 9, 2025 is canceled. The Court will reset the hearing, if necessary, after receiving Defendants' response to the pending motions to compel. As the Court "hinted" earlier, the Court is perplexed as to why counsel cannot work out this discovery dispute without the Court's intervention. The Court again strongly encourages counsel to reconsider their positions and attempt to reach a satisfactory resolution of the matter without further waste of judicial (and client) resources. It is likely that any future hearing, if necessary, will be held in Columbus, adding additional expense to the bill of the client who the Court determines caused any unnecessary expense. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on March 4, 2025 (CDL)
Related: [-]
36 36 motion Continue Tue 03/04 8:05 AM
MOTION to Continue Hearing by ASIA MCGEE filed by WAYNE O ADAMS, III.(ADAMS, WAYNE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Memorandum in Support Verified Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Continuance
notice Notice of Hearing Tue 03/04 11:17 AM
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF Motion Hearing set for 4/9/2025 04:00 PM in Athens, GA before US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND. re 29 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendant Clarke County School District, 30 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendant ESS Southeast, LLCMOTION for Sanctions. (glg)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
35 35 104 pgs discov Deposition Mon 03/03 4:57 PM
DEPOSITION of Asia McGee taken on 1/31/2025 filed by CLARKE COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT. Related document:34 Certificate of Need to File Discovery filed by CLARKE COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT,29 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendant Clarke County School District filed by ASIA MCGEE, 33 Notice of Hearing on Motion,.(HENSEL, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 37 pgs Exhibit Exhibits 1-31 to AM Depo Transcript,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibits 32-40 to AM Depo Transcript
34 34 discov Certificate of Need to File Discovery Mon 03/03 4:45 PM
Certificate of Need to File Discovery by CLARKE COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT. Related document:32 Response to Motion filed by CLARKE COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT.(HENSEL, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]
33 33 notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Mon 03/03 3:14 PM
Motion Hearing set for 4/9/2025 04:00 PM in Athens, GA before US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND. NOTICE OF SETTING HEARING ON MOTION re29 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendant Clarke County School District ,30 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendant ESS Southeast, LLC MOTION for Sanctions. (glg)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
32 32 respm Response to Motion Fri 02/28 9:07 PM
RESPONSE filed by CLARKE COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT re18 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendant Clarke County School District (HENSEL, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]
31 31 misc Request for Local Rule 6.2/9.4 Clerk's Extension Fri 02/28 9:43 AM
Request for Local Rule 6.2 Clerks Extension by CLARKE COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT(BOSTICK, RHEA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support Brief in support
notice Notice of Clerk's Granting of Extension Fri 02/28 11:35 AM
Pursuant to 23 Text Only Order dated 12/26/2024, which states "plaintiff may file another motion to compel, and there will be no extensions to the briefing schedule for such motions. " the Request by CLARKE COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT for Extension Pursuant to Local Rule 6.2 re:31 Request for Local Rule 6.2 Clerks Extension by CLARKE COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT is DENIED . Also, the document attached to this filing is not a Request for Extension Pursuant to Local Rule 6.2, but a duplicate filing of 27 Motion to Compel and the Memorandum in Support filed by plaintiff.(ans)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
30 30 motion Compel Sanctions Thu 02/27 1:01 PM
MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendant ESS Southeast, LLC , MOTION for Sanctions by ASIA MCGEE filed by WAYNE O ADAMS, III.(ADAMS, WAYNE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Combined Motion to Compel and for Sanctions Against Defendant ESS,
Att: 2 Affidavit of Plaintiff's Attorney Wayne Adams,
Att: 3 Exhibit Defendant ESS's Responses to Plaintiff's First Requests for Production,
Att: 4 Exhibit Defendant ESS's Responses to Plaintiff's Amended First Interrogatories,
Att: 5 Exhibit Plaintiff's counsel's First Discovery Deficiencies Letter to ESS counsel,
Att: 6 5 pgs Exhibit Plaintiff's counsel's Second Discovery Deficiencies letter to ESS counsel,
Att: 7 Exhibit Defendant ESS's First Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production,
Att: 8 Exhibit Defendant ESS's First Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff's Interrogatories,
Att: 9 Exhibit Defendant ESS's Corporate Verification of ESS's Responses to Plaintiff's Interrogatories,
Att: 10 3 pgs Exhibit Plaintiff's counsel's letter to Defense counsel re scheduling depositions,
Att: 11 3 pgs Exhibit Plaintiff's counsel's email to ESS counsel with Preliminary List of 30(b)(6) dep. topics,
Att: 12 Exhibit Notice of Deposition of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of ESS,
Att: 13 5 pgs Exhibit Notice of Deposition of ESS employee Kayla Wade,
Att: 14 Exhibit Defendant ESS's Second Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff's Interrogatories,
Att: 15 Exhibit Defendant ESS's Second Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production,
Att: 16 Exhibit Defendant ESS's Third Supp Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production,
Att: 17 Exhibit Excerpts of Deposition of Plaintiff Asia McGee,
Att: 18 24 pgs Exhibit Excerpts of Deposition of ESS 30(b)(6) Deponent Kacey Graber,
Att: 19 Exhibit Deposition Exhibit 39 to Deposition of Kaycey Graber (Liability Insurance Policy Declarations),
Att: 20 Exhibit Deposition Exhibit 40 to Deposition of Kaycey Graber (ESS Consolidated income statement and Consolidated Financial Statements)
Friday, February 07, 2025
29 29 motion Compel Fri 02/07 1:08 PM
MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendant Clarke County School District by ASIA MCGEE filed by WAYNE O ADAMS, III.(ADAMS, WAYNE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery from Defendant Clarke County School District,
Att: 2 Affidavit Declaration of Plaintiff's Attorney Wayne Adams,
Att: 3 Exhibit Defendant's Initial Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production,
Att: 4 Exhibit Defendant's Initial Responses to Plaintiff's Interrogatories,
Att: 5 Exhibit Plaintiff's Counsel's First Discovery Deficiencies letter to CCSD's Counsel,
Att: 6 Exhibit Plaintiff's Counsel's Second Discovery Deficiency Letter to CCSD's counsel,
Att: 7 Exhibit Plaintiff counsel's Nov. 22 email to Plaintiff's counsel with additional discovery deficiencies,
Att: 8 Exhibit CCSD's First Supp Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production,
Att: 9 Exhibit CCSD's First Supp Responses to Plaintiff's Interrogatories,
Att: 10 Exhibit CCSD's Second Supp Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for production,
Att: 11 Exhibit Verification of Suzanne Kennedy to CCSD's Interrogatory Answers,
Att: 12 Exhibit CCSD's First Amended and Second Supp Responses to Plaintiff's Interrogatories,
Att: 13 Exhibit CCSD's Third Supp Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for production,
Att: 14 Exhibit Defendant ESS's Second Supp Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production,
Att: 15 Exhibit Defendant ESS's Second Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff's Interrogatories,
Att: 16 Exhibit Text messages between Plaintiff and Monica Drayton,
Att: 17 Exhibit Text messages between Plaintiff and Marie Stevens,
Att: 18 Exhibit Text messages between Plaintiff and Christina Watson,
Att: 19 Exhibit Group text chat between Angelica Bolton, Joakima ("Kama") Johnson, and Plaintiff,
Att: 20 Exhibit January, 2024 emails between Kayla Wade, Monica Drayton and K. Grader, and Drayton's statement,
Att: 21 Exhibit Group text chat between Plaintiff, Angelia Bolton, Joakima ("Kima") Johnson, and Marie Stevens
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
28 28 31 pgs answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 01/21 2:43 PM
ANSWER to13 Amended Complaint/Petition, by SUZANNE KENNEDY with Jury Demand.(HENSEL, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
27 27 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 01/02 1:16 PM
This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting26 Motion to Restrict Access to Unredacted Exhibits A-D to Case Participants. The Court grants Plaintiff's Motion (ECF No. 26) and hereby restricts access to Exhibits A-D within Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (ECF Nos. 13-1, 13-2, 13-3, and 13-4) to case participants only. The clerk is instructed to restrict access to those exhibits in accordance with this Order. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 01/02/25 (and)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
26 26 misc Restricted Document - Pursuant to Protective Order ONLY Mon 12/30 5:19 PM
Motion to Restrict Access to Unredacted Exhibits A-D to Case Participants filed pursuant to a protective order re13 Amended Complaint/Petition,. The attached document is restricted to court users and attorneys of record in the case. (ADAMS, WAYNE)
Related: [-]
25 25 1 pgs misc Exhibit Mon 12/30 4:59 PM
EXHIBIT(S) A,B,C and D Related [+] by ASIA MCGEE re13 Amended Complaint/Petition,(ADAMS, WAYNE)
Related: [-] dacted
Att: 1 Exhibit Redacted Ex. A to 1st Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Redacted Ex. B to 1st Amended Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit Redacted Ex. C to 1st Amended Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit Redacted Ex. D to 1st Amended Complaint
Friday, December 27, 2024
24 24 4 pgs notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 12/27 4:27 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by JACI GILLILAND on behalf of ESS SOUTHEAST LLC Attorney JACI GILLILAND added to party ESS SOUTHEAST LLC(pty:dft)(GILLILAND, JACI)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
23 23 order Order on Motion to Compel Thu 12/26 2:40 PM
This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER Plaintiffs motions to compel (ECF Nos.18 and19 ) are terminated. The Rules 16/26 Order requires that before any motion to compel is filed, counsel for the parties shall meet in person and attempt in good faith to resolve the discovery dispute. If the dispute remains unresolved and a motion is filed, counsel shall certify that they met in person in good faith and were nevertheless unable to resolve the dispute. In person means physically present in the same room and does not include virtual or remote presence. Plaintiffs present motions to compel contain no certification that counsel for the parties met in person to attempt to resolve the disputes. If Plaintiff contends that Defendants still have not met their discovery obligations as required by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, then counsel shall meet in person for a good faith conference. If the disputes are not resolved during the in-person conference, Plaintiff may file another motion to compel, and there will be no extensions to the briefing schedule for such motions. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 12/26/24 (and)
Related: [-]
22 22 2 pgs notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 12/26 1:16 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by DONSHER RHEA LEANA BOSTICK, I on behalf of CLARKE COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT, SUZANNE KENNEDY Attorney DONSHER RHEA LEANA BOSTICK, I added to party CLARKE COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT(pty:dft), Attorney DONSHER RHEA LEANA BOSTICK, I added to party SUZANNE KENNEDY(pty:dft)(BOSTICK, DONSHER RHEA)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Deficiency Thu 12/26 3:07 PM
Notice of Deficiency Related [+]; Notice to Counsel RHEA BOSTICK . The e-mail address on the document does not match your e-mail address in CM/ECF. If necessary, please update your e-mail address via PACER.(aen)
Related: [-] 22 Notice of Attorney Appearance, filed by SUZANNE KENNEDY, CLARKE COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT
Monday, December 23, 2024
notice Notice of Clerk's Granting of Extension Mon 12/23 8:43 AM
Notice of Clerk's Granting of Extension Pursuant to Local Rule 6.2 re:19 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendant ESS Southeast, LLC filed by ESS SOUTHEAST LLC.(aen)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
21 21 1 pgs misc Request for Local Rule 6.2/9.4 Clerk's Extension Fri 12/20 4:35 PM
Request for Local Rule 6.2 Clerks Extension re19 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendant ESS Southeast, LLC by ESS SOUTHEAST LLC (KEENAN, SEAN)
Related: [-]
20 20 1 pgs misc Request for Local Rule 6.2/9.4 Clerk's Extension Fri 12/20 1:57 PM
Request for Local Rule 6.2 Clerks Extension re19 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendant ESS Southeast, LLC by CLARKE COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT (HENSEL, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Clerk's Granting of Extension Fri 12/20 3:09 PM
Notice of Clerk's Granting of Extension Pursuant to Local Rule 6.2 re:19 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendant ESS Southeast, LLC filed by ASIA MCGEE. (aen)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 14, 2024
19 19 motion Compel Sat 12/14 4:14 PM
MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendant ESS Southeast, LLC by ASIA MCGEE filed by WAYNE O ADAMS, III.(ADAMS, WAYNE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 13 pgs Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Discovery from Defendant ESS Southeast, LLC,
Att: 2 Affidavit of Plaintiff's Attorney Wayne Adams,
Att: 3 Appendix Defendant's Initial Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production,
Att: 4 Appendix Defendant's Initial Responses to Plaintiff's First Amended Interrogatories,
Att: 5 15 pgs Appendix Plaintiff counsel's Initial Meet-and-Confer Letter to Defendant's counsel,
Att: 6 5 pgs Appendix Plaintiff counsel's Second Meet-and-Confer Letter to Defendant's counsel,
Att: 7 Appendix Defendant's Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff's Request for Production,
Att: 8 Appendix Defendant's Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff's First Amended Interrogatories,
Att: 9 Appendix Defendant's Corporate Verification of Responses to Plaintiff's First Amended Interrogatories
Thursday, December 12, 2024
18 18 motion Compel Thu 12/12 3:24 PM
MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendant Clarke County School District by ASIA MCGEE filed by WAYNE O ADAMS, III.(ADAMS, WAYNE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support Compel Discovery from Defendant Clarke County School District,
Att: 2 Affidavit Plaintiff's Attorney Wayne Adams,
Att: 3 Appendix Defendant's Initial Responses to Plaintiff's Request for Production,
Att: 4 Appendix Defendant's Initial Responses to Plaintiff's Interrogatories,
Att: 5 Appendix Plaintiff counsel's Initial Meet-and-Confer Letter to Plaintiff's Counsel,
Att: 6 Appendix Plaintiff counsel's Second Meet-and-Confer Letter to Plaintiff's Counsel,
Att: 7 Appendix Plaintiff counsel's Nov. 22 email to Plaintiff's counsel with additional discovery deficiencies,
Att: 8 Appendix Defendant's First Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production,
Att: 9 Appendix Defendant's First Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff's Interrogatories,
Att: 10 Appendix Defendant's Second Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production,
Att: 11 Appendix Defendant's Dec. 6 Verification of Responses to Interrogatory
Monday, December 02, 2024
17 17 61 pgs answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 12/02 2:40 PM
ANSWER to13 Amended Complaint/Petition, by ESS SOUTHEAST LLC with Jury Demand.(KEENAN, SEAN)
Related: [-]
16 16 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 12/02 12:15 PM
ANSWER to13 Amended Complaint/Petition, by CLARKE COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT with Jury Demand.(HENSEL, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
15 15 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 11/25 3:11 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SUZANNE KENNEDY as to SUZANNE KENNEDY. (HENSEL, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
14 14 service Summons Issued Tue 11/19 4:43 PM
Summons Issued as to SUZANNE KENNEDY. (aen)
Related: [-]
Saturday, November 16, 2024
13 13 42 pgs cmp Amended Complaint/Petition Sat 11/16 4:17 PM
AMENDED1 Complaint, against All Defendants by ASIA MCGEE(ADAMS, WAYNE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix EEOC Charge 410-2024-1147,
Att: 2 Appendix EEOC Charge 410-2024-2633,
Att: 3 Appendix Dismissal of Charge 410-2024-1147,
Att: 4 Appendix Dismissal of Charge 410-2024-2633
Thursday, September 19, 2024
12 12 order Scheduling/Discovery Order Thu 09/19 1:50 PM
SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER : Discovery to be complete by 3/6/2025. Dispositive motions due by 4/30/2025. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 9/19/22024. (ggs)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Protective Order Thu 09/19 9:18 AM
JOINT STIPULATED AND AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 9/19/2024. (ggs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 08/07 2:19 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by WILLIAM DRIGGERS on behalf of CLARKE COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT Attorney WILLIAM DRIGGERS added to party CLARKE COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT(pty:dft)(DRIGGERS, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
9 9 13 pgs order Order - Rules 16/26 Tue 08/06 1:30 PM
RULES 16/26 ORDER : Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 9/17/2024. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 8/6/2024. (ggs)
Related: [-]
8 8 3 pgs misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 08/06 10:08 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by ESS SOUTHEAST LLC identifying Corporate Parent ESS Northeast, LLC for ESS SOUTHEAST LLC. (KEENAN, SEAN)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
notice Notice of Deficiency Mon 08/05 8:44 AM
Notice of Deficiency Related [+]; All nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately. See Local Rule 87.1.(ggs)
Related: [-] 7 Answer to Complaint filed by ESS SOUTHEAST LLC
Friday, August 02, 2024
7 7 48 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Fri 08/02 4:24 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by ESS SOUTHEAST LLC with Jury Demand.(KEENAN, SEAN)Attorney SEAN KEENAN added to party ESS SOUTHEAST LLC(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 08/02 1:09 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by CLARKE COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT with Jury Demand.(HENSEL, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 06/26 9:41 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ASIA MCGEE as to ESS SOUTHEAST LLC. (ADAMS, WAYNE)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 06/24 11:27 AM
Summons Issued as to ESS SOUTHEAST LLC. (elp)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 06/17 1:13 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CLARKE COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT as to CLARKE COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT. (HENSEL, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 06/17 1:07 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by TAYLOR WAYNE HENSEL on behalf of CLARKE COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT Attorney TAYLOR WAYNE HENSEL added to party CLARKE COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT(pty:dft)(HENSEL, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
1 1 36 pgs misc Complaint Fri 05/31 3:13 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-4663184, $405 filed by ASIA MCGEE(ADAMS, WAYNE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. A, EEOC Charge against ESS Southeast, LLC,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. B, EEOC Charge against CCSD,
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex. C, Notice of Right to Sue ESS Southeast, LLC,
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex. D, Notice of Right to Sue CCSD