Kansas District Court
Judge:John W Broomes
Referred: Angel D Mitchell
Case #: 2:24-cv-02231
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:May 31, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Nov 28, 2024 3:01 AM CST
Defendant
Seward County, Kansas, Board of Commissioners
Represented By
Andrew D. Holder
Fisher, Patterson, Sayler & Smith, Llp - Overland Park
contact info
Plaintiff
Trena Moser
Represented By
Austin Oneil Jaspers
Jaspers Law LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
27 27 order Pretrial Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 04/23 2:08 PM
PRETRIAL ORDER ENTERED Estimated trial time 5 days. Mediation deadline 11/26/2025. Mediation Notice or Confidential Settlement Report Due to Magistrate Judge on 9/26/2025. Dispositive motion deadline 5/9/2025. Jury Trial set for 1/12/2026 at 09:00 AM in KC Courtroom before District Judge John W. Broomes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 04/23/2025. (kmc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
26 26 minutes Pretrial Conference - Final Tue 04/15 10:40 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell: FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE was held on 4/15/2025. As discussed in further detail on the record, the parties must resubmit their draft pretrial order in Word format as an attachment to an email sent to ksd_mitchell_chambers@ksd.uscourts.gov, by April 22, 2025. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (alh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
25 25 notice Notice (Other) Wed 04/09 4:08 PM
NOTICE OF CHANGED CONFERENCE CALL NUMBER FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES AND HEARINGS WITH MAGISTRATE JUDGE ANGEL D. MITCHELL. Judge Mitchell's conference call number has changed. From this date on, please use only 913-423-1010, Conference ID 172 480 243, for all telephonic conferences and hearings with Judge Mitchell. Previous orders have directed the parties to call 888-363-4749 for conferences and hearings. From this date, do NOT call 888-363-4749 for any conferences or hearings with Judge Mitchell. (alh)
Related: [-]
24 24 discov Amended Notice to Take Deposition Wed 04/09 9:53 AM
AMENDED NOTICE by Plaintiff Trena Moser of taking deposition of April Warden on April 16, 2025. (Jaspers, Austin)
Related: [-]
23 23 discov Amended Notice to Take Deposition Wed 04/09 9:52 AM
AMENDED NOTICE by Plaintiff Trena Moser of taking deposition of Organizational Representative on 4/16/2025. (Jaspers, Austin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
22 22 discov Notice to Take Deposition Thu 04/03 3:23 PM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Trena Moser of taking deposition of April Warden on April 9, 2025 (Jaspers, Austin)
Related: [-]
21 21 discov Notice to Take Deposition Thu 04/03 3:10 PM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Trena Moser of taking deposition of Organizational Representative on April 9, 2025 (Jaspers, Austin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
20 20 discov Notice to Take Deposition Thu 03/27 2:04 PM
NOTICE by Defendant Seward County, Kansas, Board of Commissioners of taking deposition of Trena Moser on 4/4/2025 (Holder, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
19 19 notice Notice of Service Tue 12/31 1:19 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE by Seward County, Kansas, Board of Commissioners of Defendant's Responses to Opening Discovery (Holder, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
18 18 misc Certificate of Service Fri 12/27 3:14 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff and (2) Defendant's First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff by Seward County, Kansas, Board of Commissioners. (Holder, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
17 17 notice Joint Mediation Notice Fri 12/20 11:52 AM
JOINT MEDIATION NOTICE - Mediation to be held January 29, 2024 by Seward County, Kansas, Board of Commissioners (Holder, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
16 16 12 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Wed 11/27 11:28 AM
PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 15 Joint Motion Requesting the Entry of a Protective Order. With minor, non-substantive revisions, the court enters the proposed order submitted by the parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 11/27/2024. (bal)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
15 15 motion Protective Order Mon 11/25 11:08 AM
Joint Motion Requesting the Entry of a Protective Order. In accordance with the Guidelines for Agreed Protective Orders, the parties jointly moved for the entry of a protective order by emailing a copy of their proposed order to the Magistrate Judge's chambers on November 25, 2024. Related [+] (alh)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Tue 11/12 1:51 PM
ORDER denying 13 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 11/12/2024. (jal)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, November 08, 2024
13 13 motion Protective Order Fri 11/08 2:31 PM
Joint Motion Requesting the Entry of a Protective Order. In accordance with the Guidelines for Agreed Protective Orders, the parties jointly moved for the entry of a protective order by emailing a copy of their proposed order to the Magistrate Judge's chambers on November 8, 2024. Related [+] (alh)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell
Friday, October 25, 2024
12 12 order Scheduling Order Fri 10/25 12:15 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Mediation Notice or Confidential Settlement Report Due to Magistrate Judge by 12/20/2024. Mediation deadline 2/21/2025. Discovery deadline 3/28/2025. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/7/2025. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/15/2025 at 10:00 AM by Telephone ADM - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 3977627 before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Dispositive motion deadline 5/9/2025. The parties expect the jury trial of this case to take approximately 5 trial days. The court will subsequently set this case for trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 10/25/2024. (ca)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
11 11 minutes Scheduling Conference Thu 10/24 10:50 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE was held on 10/24/2024. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (alh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Tue 10/15 4:30 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Initial Rule 26(a) Disclosures by Seward County, Kansas, Board of Commissioners. (Holder, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
9 9 order Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling Thu 09/12 2:50 PM
INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Fed. R. Civ. P. 1 mandates the "just, speedy, and inexpensive" determination of this action. With this goal in mind, U.S. Magistrate Judge Mitchell will conduct a Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 scheduling conference on 10/24/2024 at 10:30 AM by phone (ADM - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 3977627). The parties, in person and/or through counsel, must confer as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) by 10/4/2024. By 10/15/2024, plaintiff must submit a red-lined version of the proposed scheduling order that shows all changes to the court's form proposed scheduling order, and a clean version of the proposed scheduling order. Both versions of the document must be submitted in Word format as an attachment to an email sent to ksd_mitchell_chambers@ksd.uscourts.gov. The parties must serve their Rule 26(a)(1)(A) initial disclosures by 10/15/2024, and email copies of the initial disclosures to the undersigned judge's chambers with the proposed scheduling order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 9/12/2024. (mam)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 08/30 9:16 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by Seward County, Kansas, Board of Commissioners. (Holder, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
7 7 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 08/15 3:37 PM
ORDER granting6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. The motion is granted as unopposed. Defendant Board of County Commissioners of Seward County, Kansas must answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by August 30, 2024. For future reference, however, the court cautions counsel that the Local Rules were amended to require all motions for an extension of time to be "filed as soon as practicable and in no event less than 3 days before the specified time." D. Kan. Rule 6.1(a). Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 8/15/2024. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (alh)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 08/15 12:34 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Seward County, Kansas, Board of Commissioners. (Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell.) (Holder, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
5 5 order Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer Tue 07/30 4:30 PM
CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 8/16/2024 for Defendant Board of County Commissioners of Seward County, Kansas to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 7/30/2024. (nac)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Entry of Appearance Tue 07/30 3:57 PM
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Andrew D. Holder on behalf of Board of County Commissioners of Seward County, Kansas. (Holder, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
service Summons Issued Tue 06/11 4:55 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Board of County Commissioners of Seward County, Kansas. (issued to Attorney for service) Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge Form provided to counsel for service with complaint. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (nac)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
notice Notice of Judge Assignment Mon 06/03 9:37 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge (nac)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
3 3 misc Designation of Place of Trial Fri 05/31 9:06 PM
DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Trena Moser - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Jaspers, Austin)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 05/31 9:02 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Trena Moser. (Jaspers, Austin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (attorney) Fri 05/31 8:59 PM
COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $405, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6360899.), filed by Trena Moser.(Jaspers, Austin)
Related: [-]