Missouri Western District Court
Judge:Stephen R Bough
Case #: 6:24-cv-03164
Nature of Suit893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters
Cause33:1365 Environmental Matters
Case Filed:Jun 03, 2024
Terminated:Oct 04, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Nov 30, 2024 3:14 AM CST
Defendant
3M Company
Plaintiff
City Utilities of Springfield, MO
Represented By
Nicolle B. Brito
contact info
Mark J. Dearman
contact info
Dorothy P. Antullis
contact info
Frank Paul Calamita, III
Aqualaw, PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, October 25, 2024
15 15 order Order Fri 10/25 10:52 AM
Pursuant to the MDL Transfer Order (Dkt.13 ), transferring the case to the District of South Carolina, the Court WITHDRAWS the order requesting joint status report (Dkt. 14 ). Signed on 10/25/2024 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Sandusky, Karri)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
14 14 order Order Fri 10/04 4:25 PM
On July 24, 2024, the Court ordered that the parties file a joint status report or a stipulation of dismissal by October 7, 2024. A Joint Status Report has been filed. Therefore, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties file a status report or a stipulation of dismissal within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. Signed on 10/4/2024 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Sandusky, Karri)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc MDL Conditional Transfer Order Fri 10/04 4:23 PM
MDL TRANSFER ORDER, from Nathaniel M. Gorton, Acting Chair, transferring case to District of South Carolina to be included in MDL No. 2873. Signed on 10/4/24. Case electronically transferred. (Siegert, Karen)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Status Report Fri 10/04 1:17 PM
STATUS REPORT by City Utilities of Springfield, MO. (Calamita, Frank)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
11 11 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 07/24 2:09 PM
RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by City Utilities of Springfield, MO. (Calamita, Frank)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Order Wed 07/24 11:38 AM
On July 24, 2024, the parties filed a joint status report. (Doc. #9 .) On June 27, 2024, the Court ordered the parties to file a joint status report within 30 days, given the extension of time for Defendant 3M Company to file its responsive pleading 28 days after the JPML issues a final order regarding consolidating this case into an MDL. As the parties have informed the Court that it expects a ruling from the JPML around October 7, 2024, the parties are ORDERED to submit a status report on or before October 7, 2024. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Peters, Tracey)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Status Report Wed 07/24 11:07 AM
STATUS REPORT by City Utilities of Springfield, MO. (Calamita, Frank)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
8 8 order Order Thu 06/27 10:07 AM
Before the Court is a Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. (Doc. #7 .) For good cause show, the motion is GRANTED. Defendant 3M Company may file its responsive pleading 28 days after the JPML has issued a final order determining whether to transfer this action to the AFFF Products Liability Litigation MDL. It is also hereby ORDERED that the parties file a status report within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. Signed on 6/27/2024 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Peters, Tracey)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Stipulation Thu 06/27 9:44 AM
STIPULATION for extension of time to file responsive pleading by City Utilities of Springfield, MO. (Calamita, Frank)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
6 6 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 06/07 7:32 AM
ORDER granting3 ,4 , &5 motions to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorneys Nicolle B. Brito, Dorothy P. Antullis and Mark J. Dearman for City Utilities of Springfield, MO allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at [LINK:PACER] . This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Lock, Tania)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
5 5 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 06/06 2:31 PM
Motion to allow Nicolle B. Brito to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-9046452) filed by Frank Paul Calamita, III on behalf of City Utilities of Springfield, MO. (Calamita, Frank)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 06/06 2:29 PM
Motion to allow Dorothy P. Antullis to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-9046443) filed by Frank Paul Calamita, III on behalf of City Utilities of Springfield, MO. (Calamita, Frank)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 06/06 2:27 PM
Motion to allow Mark J. Dearman to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-9046405) filed by Frank Paul Calamita, III on behalf of City Utilities of Springfield, MO. (Calamita, Frank)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
2 2 notice Notice of MAPN Mon 06/03 1:45 PM
NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to outside neutral category I. (Siegert, Karen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 MAP General Order
1 1 32 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 06/03 12:42 PM
COMPLAINT against 3M Company filed by Frank Paul Calamita, III on behalf of City Utilities of Springfield, MO. Filing fee $405, receipt number AMOWDC-9038854. Service due by 9/3/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Calamita, Frank)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Proposed Summons
notice Notice of Docket Modification Mon 06/03 1:22 PM
NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 6/3/2024 as Document No. 1-5, Summons. The Summons attached to the motion has been deleted. Any Summons should include the case number and sent to the Clerk's Office through CM/ECF Civil Events > E-Mail the Court > E-Mail Proposed Summons to be Issued. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Siegert, Karen)
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued Mon 06/03 1:50 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to 3M Company. (Siegert, Karen)
Related: [-]