440
|
|
440
motion
Compensation - Application (Attorney)
Fri 09/06 5:23 PM
Application for Compensation Third Staffing and Compensation Report of Novo Advisors, LLC for the period August 1, 2024 to August 31, 2024 Filed by iSun, Inc.. Objections due by 9/20/2024. (Busenkell, Michael)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A-C
|
| |
Att: 2
Notice
|
439
|
|
439
misc
Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required
Fri 09/06 4:02 PM
Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required for Combined First Monthly Fee Application Of England Securities, LLC For Compensation For Services Rendered and Reimbursement Of Expenses Incurred For The Period From June 3, 2024 Through July 31, 2024 Related [+] Filed by iSun, Inc.. (Busenkell, Michael)
|
438
|
|
438
claims
Certificate of Mailing
Wed 09/04 8:17 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Nadia Alazri . Filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC. Related [+] (Garabato, Sid)
|
437
|
|
437
claims
Certificate of Mailing
Wed 09/04 6:18 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Betina Wheelon . Filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC. Related [+] (Garabato, Sid)
|
436
|
|
436
claims
Certificate of Mailing
Wed 09/04 2:14 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Nadia Alazri . Filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC. Related [+] (Garabato, Sid)
|
435
|
|
435
notice
Bar Date - Notice
Wed 09/04 11:29 AM
Notice of Bar Date Notice of (I) Deadline For Filing of Proofs of Claim, Including 503(B)(9) Claims, and Administrative Expense Requests by Creditors on or Before October 17, 2024, at 5:00 P.M. and (II) Deadline Requiring Filing of Proofs of Claim by Governmental Units on or Before April 15, 2025 at 5:00 P.M. Filed by iSun, Inc.. Proofs of Claims due by 10/17/2024. (Busenkell, Michael)
Related: [-]
|
434
|
|
434
order
Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim
Wed 09/04 9:12 AM
Order (I) Establishing Deadlines For Submitting Proofs of Claim, Including Requests For Payment Under Section 503(b)(9), (II) Approving The Form and Manner For Submitting Such Proofs of Claim, (III) Establishing Deadline For Submitting Administrative Claims and (IV) Approving Notice Thereof Filed by iSun, Inc. Related [+] Order Signed on 9/4/2024. (DRG)
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit 1
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit 2
|
| |
Att: 3
Exhibit 3
|
433
|
|
433
misc
Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required
Tue 09/03 5:30 PM
Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required for First Combined Monthly Fee Application of Benesch, Friedlander, Coplan & Aronoff LLP, for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred as Delaware Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the Period from June 18, 2024 Through July 31, 2024 Related [+] Filed by Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Martinez, Juan)
|
432
|
|
432
misc
Certificate of No Objection
Tue 09/03 12:52 PM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Debtors' Motion For Entry of an Order (I) Establishing Deadlines For Submitting Proofs of Claim, Including Requests For Payment Under Section 503(b)(9), (II) Approving The Form and Manner For Submitting Such Proofs of Claim, (III) Establishing Deadline For Submitting Administrative Claims and (IV) Approving Notice Thereof Related [+] Filed by iSun, Inc.. (Brown, Amy)
|
431
|
|
431
misc
Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required
Tue 09/03 12:12 PM
Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required for Second Monthly Application of Gellert Seitz Busenkell & Brown, LLC, as Counsel to The Debtors and Debtors-In-Possession For Compensation For Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred for the period July 1, 2024 to July 31, 2024 Related [+] Filed by iSun, Inc.. (Busenkell, Michael)
|
430
|
|
430
answer
Objection
Tue 09/03 11:59 AM
Limited Objection of Merchants Fleet to Debtors' Motion Seeking Entry of an Order Authorizing the Rejection of the Merchant Fleet Agreements Nunc Pro Tunc to August 20, 2024 and Granting Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Merchants Automotive Group, Inc. d/b/a Merchants Fleet (Demmy, John)
|
| |
Att: 1
Certificate of Service
|
429
|
|
429
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 09/03 10:29 AM
Order Approving Stipulation By and Between the Debtors, Soltage LLC, Tavrida Electric North America, Inc., and TerraSmart Related [+] Order Signed on 9/3/2024. (DRG)
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit
|
428
|
|
428
misc
Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required
Fri 08/30 5:16 PM
Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required Certificate of No Objection Regarding the First Monthly Fee Application of Dundon Advisers LLC, Financial Advisor for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred for the Period from June 18, 2024, to July 31, 2024 Related [+] Filed by Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Martinez, Juan)
|
427
|
|
427
misc
Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required
Fri 08/30 5:14 PM
Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required Certificate of No Objection Regarding the First Combined Monthly Fee Application of Seward & Kissel LLP, for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred as Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the Period from June 18, 2024 Through July 31, 2024 Related [+] Filed by Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Martinez, Juan)
|
426
|
|
426
misc
Certification of Counsel(Aty)
Fri 08/30 4:28 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Stipulation By and Between the Debtors, Soltage, LLC, Tavrida Electric North America, Inc., and TerraSmart Filed by Soltage, LLC. (Earle, Katharina)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Proposed Form of Order
|
425
|
|
425
order
Appear pro hac vice
Fri 08/30 9:43 AM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Hannah-Kaye Fleming, Esq. Related [+] Order Signed on 8/30/2024. (AMH)
|
424
|
|
424
order
Appear pro hac vice
Fri 08/30 9:36 AM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Alissa Brice Castaneda, Esq. Related [+] Order Signed on 8/30/2024. (AMH)
|