Gagne et al v. Mesa, City of et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Diane J Humetewa |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01337 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jun 04, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Jul 19, 2024 1:48 AM MST |
Defendant
C Orr
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Casey Ibarra
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
T Intrieri
|
|
Defendant
Madison Kelly
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Shawn Kurian
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Unknown Lewinson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Marques Maldonado
|
|
Defendant
Mark Mask
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mesa, City of
|
|
Defendant
Alejandro Navarro
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jess Nicholson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kayla Hong
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Nicholas Plott
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lee Rankin
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
D Samons
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
A Stefick
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kyle Thomas
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Treve Widmer
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Daryl Woodward
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
James McCormick
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Unknown Parties
|
|
Defendant
Scott Freeman
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Matthew Adair
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Matt Brown
|
|
Defendant
Dan Butler
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kyle Cameron
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kade Carrasco
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Matthew Chuey
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bryant Clover
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kevin Cost
|
|
Defendant
Jeff Cutler
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Shawn Freeman
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Unknown Gangawere
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
J George
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Andrew Gonzalez
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Robert Goodrich
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
J Gutierrez
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Matthew Harris
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Gagne
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Suzette Gagne
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Thursday, September 12, 2024 | ||
72 | 72
order
Order on Stipulation
Thu 09/12 1:29 PM
ORDER granting the Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss (Doc.70 ). Plaintiffs shall file their Response on or before October 21, 2024. Absent extraordinary circumstances, no further extensions shall be granted for this deadline. ORDERED by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 9/12/2024. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG) |
|
70 | 70
misc
Stipulation
Thu 09/12 12:47 PM
STIPULATION Plaintiffs Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Christopher Gagne.(Brunner, Jordan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time | ||
Monday, September 09, 2024 | ||
71 | 71
motion
Dismiss Counts/Claims
Thu 09/12 1:24 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : ALL CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANTS ORR AND COST; COUNT TWO (THE MONELL CLAIM); COUNT FOUR; AND COUNT FIVE by Matthew Adair, Matt Brown, Kyle Cameron, Matthew Chuey, Kevin Cost, Shawn Freeman, Robert Goodrich, Matthew Harris, Mesa, City of, Alejandro Navarro, C Orr, Kyle Thomas. (LFIG) (Motion filed per Doc. 67) |
|
69 | 69
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 09/09 11:59 AM
NOTICE re: Filing Non-Electronic Exhibits by Matthew Adair, Matt Brown, Kyle Cameron, Matthew Chuey, Kevin Cost, Shawn Freeman, Robert Goodrich, Matthew Harris, Alejandro Navarro, C Orr, Kyle Thomas re: 68 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, . |
|
68 | 68
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 09/09 11:01 AM
ORDER granting Defendants City of Mesa, Harris, Navarro, Cameron, Adair, Chuey, Goodrich, Freeman, Thomas, and Brown ("Moving Defendants") Motion to File and Seal Non-Electronic Exhibits (Doc.64 ). Moving Defendants may file exhibits 3, 5, 7-9 and 11 to Defendants' Answer (Doc.63 ) on a flash drive in accordance with the Clerk of Court's policies and procedures for filing non-electronic exhibits. Exhibits 5 and 7-9 shall be filed under seal. Ordered by Judge Diane J Humetewa. (CR) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) |
|
67 | 67
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
Mon 09/09 9:50 AM
ORDER granting Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (Doc.65 ). Defendants may file its 22-page Partial Motion to Dismiss, currently lodged at (Doc.66 ). Ordered by Judge Diane J Humetewa.(CR)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) |
|
Friday, September 06, 2024 | ||
66 | 66
respoth
Lodged Proposed Document
Fri 09/06 3:21 PM
LODGED Proposed Partial Motion to Dismiss re:65 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Partial Motion to Dismiss . Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Matthew Adair, Matt Brown, Kyle Cameron, Matthew Chuey, Kevin Cost, Shawn Freeman, Robert Goodrich, Matthew Harris, Mesa, City of, Alejandro Navarro, C Orr, Kyle Thomas. |
|
65 | 65
motion
File Excess Pages
Fri 09/06 3:17 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Partial Motion to Dismiss by Matthew Adair, Matt Brown, Kyle Cameron, Matthew Chuey, Kevin Cost, Shawn Freeman, Robert Goodrich, Matthew Harris, Mesa, City of, Alejandro Navarro, C Orr, Kyle Thomas. |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
64 | 64
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 09/06 3:08 PM
MOTION to File and Seal Non-Electronic Exhibits Exhibits re:63 Answer to Amended Complaint, by Matthew Adair, Matt Brown, Kyle Cameron, Matthew Chuey, Kevin Cost, Shawn Freeman, Robert Goodrich, Matthew Harris, Mesa, City of, Alejandro Navarro, C Orr, Kyle Thomas. |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
63 | 63
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Fri 09/06 3:05 PM
Partial ANSWER to60 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Matt Brown, Kyle Cameron, Matthew Chuey, Kevin Cost, Shawn Freeman, Robert Goodrich, Matthew Harris, Mesa, City of, Alejandro Navarro, Kyle Thomas. |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Index, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1-13 | ||
Thursday, September 05, 2024 | ||
62 | 62
minute_ord
Minute Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Thu 09/05 9:51 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the Court's Order (Doc.5 ), Unknown Parties (named as: ABC Partnerships I-X, XYZ Corporations I-X, John Does I-X, and Jane Does I-X) are hereby terminated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG) |