MRRC Hold Co.
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Craig T Goldblatt |
Case #: | 1:24-bk-11164 |
Case Filed: | Jun 05, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 10,001-25,000 |
Est. Assets | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
MRRC Hold Co., Debtor
2200 Faraday Ave Ste 250
Carlsbad, CA 92008-7234 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
1. | Rubio's Coastal Grill files for Chapter 11 bankruptcy after saying 48 California locations to close (kcra.com) |
Submitted Thu 06/06/2024 | |
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Friday, July 05, 2024 | ||
153 | 153
7
pgs
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice
Fri 07/05 12:33 PM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by MRRC Hold Co.. Hearing scheduled for 7/9/2024 at 01:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Riley, Richard) |
|
152 | 152
misc
Certification of Counsel(Aty)
Fri 07/05 12:23 PM
Certification of Counsel //Certification of Counsel Regarding Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Establishing Procedures for Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for Retained Professionals, and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed by MRRC Hold Co.. (Riley, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
151 | 151
misc
Certification of Counsel(Aty)
Fri 07/05 10:50 AM
Certification of Counsel //Certification of Counsel Regarding Motion of the Debtors to Establish Deadlines for Filing Proofs of Claim and Approving the Form and Manner of Notice Thereof Filed by MRRC Hold Co.. (Riley, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Wednesday, July 03, 2024 | ||
150 | 150
misc
Certification of Counsel(Aty)
Wed 07/03 6:44 PM
Certification of Counsel //Certification of Counsel Regarding Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing Debtors to Retain Force Ten Partners, LLC to Provide Nicholas Rubin as Chief Restructuring Officer and Restructuring Advisor Personnel, as Necessary, Effective as of the Petition Date; (II) Approving the Retention Agreement; and (III) Granting Related Relief Filed by MRRC Hold Co.. (Riley, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
149 | 149
misc
Certification of Counsel(Aty)
Wed 07/03 6:14 PM
Certification of Counsel //Certification of Counsel Regarding Further Revised Bid Procedures Order Filed by MRRC Hold Co.. (Riley, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
148 | 148
misc
Certification of Counsel(Aty)
Wed 07/03 5:43 PM
Certification of Counsel //Certification of Counsel Regarding Application for Entry of an Order Authorizing Retention and Employment of Raines Feldman Littrell LLP as Attorneys for the Debtors Effective as of the Petition Date Filed by MRRC Hold Co.. (Riley, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
147 | 147
misc
Certification of Counsel(Aty)
Wed 07/03 4:57 PM
Certification of Counsel //Certification of Counsel Regarding Application/Motion to Employ/Retain Whiteford, Taylor & Preston LLC as Attorneys for the Debtors Effective as of the Petition Date Filed by MRRC Hold Co.. (Riley, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
146 | 146
misc
Certification of Counsel(Aty)
Wed 07/03 4:30 PM
Certification of Counsel //Certification of Counsel Regarding Further Revised Proposed Order Regarding Debtors' First Omnibus Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing (A) Rejection of Certain Unexpired Leases and (B) Abandonment of Certain Personal Property in Connection Therewith, Each Effective as of the Petition Date; and (II) Granting Certain Related Relief Filed by MRRC Hold Co.. (Riley, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Tuesday, July 02, 2024 | ||
145 | 145
notice
Assumption of Lease/Executory Contract - Notice
Tue 07/02 8:45 PM
Notice of Assumption of Lease/Executory Contract //Notice to Contract Parties of Potential Assumption and Assignment of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases [Objection Deadline: July 17, 2024] . Filed by MRRC Hold Co.. (Riley, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
144 | 144
misc
Affidavit/Declaration of Service
Tue 07/02 7:08 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service re: Final Order (I) Authorizing Payment of Certain Prepetition Taxes and Fees; and (II) Granting Related Relief (Docket No. 116), Final Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to (A) Pay Certain Prepetition Claims of Critical Vendors, Section 503(b)(9) Claimants, and PACA/PASA Claimants; (II) Authorizing Banks to Honor and Process Check and Electronic Transfer Requests; and (III) Granting Related Relief (Docket No. 119), Final Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to (A) Continue Their Insurance Policies and (B) Pay and Honor All Obligations with Respect Thereto; (II) Authorizing Continuation of Insurance Premium Financing Arrangements; and (III) Granting Related Relief (Docket No. 121), Agenda for Hearing Scheduled for July 2, 2024 at 1:00 P.M. (Eastern Time) (Docket No. 125), and Final Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to (A) Obtain Senior Secured Postpetition Financing and (B) Utilize Cash Collateral, (II) Granting Liens and Superpriority Administrative Expense Claims, (III) Modifiying the Automatic Stay, (IV) Scheduling a Final Hearing, (V) Granting Adequate Protection, and (VI) Granting Related Relief (Docket No. 126) . Filed by Stretto. (Betance, Sheryl) |
|
143 | 143
misc
Affidavit/Declaration of Service
Tue 07/02 6:47 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service (Supplemental) re: Debtors First Omnibus Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing (A) Rejection of Certain Unexpired Leases and (B) Abandonment of Certain Personal Property in Connection Therewith, Each Effective as of the Petition Date; and (II) Granting Certain Related Relief (Docket No. 11), Notice of (A) Entry of Interim Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Certain Prepetition Claims of Critical Vendors, Section 503(B)(9) Claimants, and PACA/PASA Claimants; (II) Authorizing Banks to Honor and Process Check and Electronic Transfer Requests; and (III) Granting Related Relief (Docket No. 64), and Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case (Docket No. 97) . Filed by Stretto. (Betance, Sheryl) |
|
142 | 142
misc
Schedules/Statements
Tue 07/02 4:43 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. //Statement of Financial Affairs for Rubio's Incentives, LLC (Case No. 24-11166 Filed by MRRC Hold Co.. (Riley, Richard) |
|
141 | 141
misc
Schedules/Statements
Tue 07/02 4:41 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. //Schedules of Assets and Libilities for Rubio's Incentives, LLC (Case No. 24-11166 Filed by MRRC Hold Co.. (Riley, Richard) |
|
140 | 140
5
pgs
order
Order
Tue 07/02 4:36 PM
Final Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to (A) Pay Prepetition Wages, Employee Benefits Obligations and Other Compensation, (B) Continue Employee Benefits Programs and Pay Related Administrative Obligations; and (II) Granting Related Relief . Signed on 7/2/2024. (DCY) |
|
139 | 139
misc
Schedules/Statements
Tue 07/02 4:36 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. //Statement of Financial Affairs for Rubio's Restaurants, Inc. (Case No. 24-11165 Filed by MRRC Hold Co.. (Riley, Richard) |
|
138 | 138
misc
Schedules/Statements
Tue 07/02 4:35 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. //Schedules of Assets and Liabilities for Rubio's Restaurants, Inc. (Case No. 24-11165 Filed by MRRC Hold Co.. (Riley, Richard) |
|
137 | 137
8
pgs
order
Order
Tue 07/02 4:34 PM
Final Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to (A) Continue to Operate Their Cash Management Systems, (B) Honor Certain Prepetition Obligations Related Thereto, (C) Maintain Existing Business Forms, and (D) Continue Certain Intercompany Transactions; and (II) Granting Related Relief . Signed on 7/2/2024. (DCY) |
|
136 | 136
misc
Schedules/Statements
Tue 07/02 4:28 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. //Statement of Financial Affairs for MRRC Hold Co. (Case No. 24-11164 Filed by MRRC Hold Co.. (Riley, Richard) |
|
135 | 135
misc
Schedules/Statements
Tue 07/02 4:25 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. //Schedules of Assets and Liabilities for MRRC Hold Co. (Case No. 24-11164 Filed by MRRC Hold Co.. (Riley, Richard) |
|
134 | 134
audio
Tue 07/02 2:10 PM
Court Date & Time [07/02/2024 01:03:01 PM]. File Size [ 23006 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:48:50 ]. (admin) |
|
133 | 133
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice
Tue 07/02 10:02 AM
Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by MRRC Hold Co.. Hearing scheduled for 7/2/2024 at 01:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Riley, Richard) |
|
132 | 132
misc
Exhibit
Tue 07/02 9:21 AM
Exhibit(s) //Notice of Filing of Revised Proposed Bid Procedures Order Filed by MRRC Hold Co.. (Riley, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
131 | 131
misc
Certification of Counsel(Aty)
Tue 07/02 9:09 AM
Certification of Counsel //Certification of Counsel Regarding Amended Final Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to (A) Pay Prepetition Wages, Employee Benefits Obligations and Other Compensation, (B) Continue Employee Benefits Programs and Pay Related Administrative Obligations; and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed by MRRC Hold Co.. (Riley, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
130 | 130
misc
Certification of Counsel(Aty)
Tue 07/02 9:01 AM
Certification of Counsel //Certification of Counsel Regarding Amended Final Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to (A) Continue to Operate Their Cash Management Systems, (B) Honor Certain Prepetition Obligations Related Thereto, (C) Maintain Existing Business Forms, and (D) Continue Certain Intercompany Transactions; and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed by MRRC Hold Co.. (Riley, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Monday, July 01, 2024 | ||
129 | 129
misc
Declaration in Support
Mon 07/01 9:46 PM
Declaration in Support of Holly Conger of Landlord Val Vista South, LLC's Objection Filed by Val Vista South, LLC. (Sullivan, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
128 | 128
misc
Exhibit
Mon 07/01 5:57 PM
Exhibit(s) //Notice of Filing of Revised Proposed Order Regarding Debtors' First Omnibus Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing (A) Rejection of Certain Unexpired Leases and (B) Abandonment of Certain Personal Property in Connection Therewith, Each Effective as of the Petition Date; and (II) Granting Certain Related Relief Filed by MRRC Hold Co.. (Riley, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
127 | 127
misc
Affidavit/Declaration of Service
Mon 07/01 12:21 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service (Supplemental) re: Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case (Docket No. 97) . Filed by Stretto. (Betance, Sheryl) |
|
Friday, June 28, 2024 | ||
126 | 126
30+
pgs
order
Order
Fri 06/28 1:59 PM
Final Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to (A) Obtain Senior Secured Postpetition Financing and (B) Utilize Cash Collateral, (II) Granting Liens and Superpriority Administrative Expense Claims, (III) Modifying the Automatic Stay, (IV) Scheduling a Final Hearing, and (V) Granting Adequate Protection, and (VI) Granting Related Relief Signed on 6/28/2024. (NAB) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
125 | 125
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice
Fri 06/28 12:03 PM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by MRRC Hold Co.. Hearing scheduled for 7/2/2024 at 01:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Francella, Thomas) |
|
124 | 124
misc
Certification of Counsel(Aty)
Fri 06/28 11:56 AM
Certification of Counsel //Certification of Counsel Regarding Debtors Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Debtors to (A) Obtain Postpetition Financing and (B) Utilize Cash Collateral, (II) Granting Liens and Superpriority Administrative Expense Claims, (III) Granting Adequate Protection, (IV) Modifying the Automatic Stay, (V) Scheduling a Final Hearing, and (VI) Granting Related Relief Filed by MRRC Hold Co.. (Francella, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
123 | 123
3
pgs
misc
Rule 2019 Statement - Attorney
Fri 06/28 9:28 AM
Rule 2019 Statement of Arizona Public Service Company, Salt River Project, San Diego Gas and Electric Company, Southern California Edison Company, Southern California Gas Company, and Tucson Electric Power Company Filed by Arizona Public Service Company, Salt River Project, San Diego Gas and Electric Company, Southern California Edison Company, Southern California Gas Company, and Tucson Electric Power Company. (Buck, Kate) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service |