Elijah Taylor v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03251 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | May 30, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 14, 2024 5:59 AM EDT |
Defendant
Clariant Corp
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corp
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corp
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Co
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Co
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corp
|
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corp
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Co
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corp
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corp
|
|
Defendant
Allstar Fire Equipment
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
|
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Elijah Taylor
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, June 17, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Mon 06/17 3:55 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) (associated as of 5/30/2024), Elijah Taylor v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-03251-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Northern Texas (Dallas Division) (sshe, ) |
|
Wednesday, June 05, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 06/05 10:21 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jbin, ) |
|
Thursday, May 30, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
40
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 06/05 10:16 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $405 receipt number ASCDC-11795110.), filed by Elijah Taylor. Service due by 8/28/2024 (jbin, ) |