Peter Tolan v. Lockheed Martin Corporation et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Monica Ramirez Almadani |
Referred: | Karen L Stevenson |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-04763 |
Nature of Suit | 790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Labor/Mgmnt. Relations |
Case Filed: | Jun 06, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Los Angeles County Superior Court, 24STCV11173 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 21, 2024 3:35 AM PDT |
Defendant
Chris Henry
|
|
Defendant
Lockheed Martin Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Matt Townsley
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Peter Tolan
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/13/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, September 10, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
order
Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only
Tue 09/10 10:19 AM
Civil Trial Order and Pretrial Schedule and Deadlines by Judge Monica Ramirez Almadani. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/4/2025 at 3:00 p.m. See Order for details and deadlines set. (gga) |
|
Monday, September 09, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Mon 09/09 12:30 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 14, filed by Plaintiff Peter Tolan..(Fletcher, Loyst) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix | ||
Thursday, September 05, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Thu 09/05 2:03 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 14, filed by Plaintiff Peter Tolan.. (Fletcher, Loyst) |
|
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Tue 09/03 4:39 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Monica Ramirez Almadani. On August 22, 2024, Defendant Lockheed Martin Corporation submitted a Rule 26(f) Report12 . The Order Setting Scheduling Conference requires that the 26(f) Report be submitted and signed jointly. The 26(f) Report is signed only by Defendant's counsel. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS the parties to file an amended 26(f) Report by no later than September 5, 2024. The Courts prior order vacating the Scheduling Conference stands. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (gga) |
|
13 | 13
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Tue 09/03 9:42 AM
TEXT ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Monica Ramirez Almadani. The Court has considered the parties' Joint Rule 16(b)/26(f) Report with respect to the Scheduling Conference and has concluded that the hearing on 9/5/2024 is not necessary. The Court will issue a separate Civil Trial Order setting the deadlines and dates for this case. No appearances are necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (gga) |
|
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Thu 08/22 4:48 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Defendant Lockheed Martin Corporation's Scheduling Conference and Rule 26(f) Statement ; estimated length of trial 4-6 days, filed by Defendant Lockheed Martin Corporation..(Davidson, Africa) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix A - Schedule of Pretrial Dates Worksheet | ||
Friday, June 21, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Fri 06/21 3:15 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Monica Ramirez Almadani. Scheduling Conference set for 9/5/2024 at 01:30 p.m. Counsel must email the text-fillable Worksheet to Chambers at MRA_Chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov along with the Joint Rule 26(f) Report. *See Order for further details.* (gga) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix | ||
Wednesday, June 12, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint (Discovery)
Wed 06/12 4:10 PM
ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Lockheed Martin Corporation.(Davidson, Africa) |
|
Monday, June 10, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
cs_rasgn
Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV-89)
Mon 06/10 5:14 PM
ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 23-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Consuelo B. Marshall to Judge Monica Ramirez Almadani for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:24-cv-04763 MRA(KSx). (rn) |
|
8 | 8
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Mon 06/10 1:29 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Lockheed Martin Corporation, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 served on June 7, 2024. (Davidson, Africa) |
|
Friday, June 07, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Clerical Error (G-11)
Fri 06/07 2:36 PM
NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program5 was issued in error. Docket entry 5 should bedisregarded. (car) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Fri 06/07 2:13 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) |
|
5 | 5
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Fri 06/07 2:12 PM
[NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR ISSUED ON 6/7/2024, SEE ITEM7 ] NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) Modified on 6/7/2024 (car) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 06/07 2:12 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (car) |
|
Thursday, June 06, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 06/06 4:53 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Certification of Interested Entities or Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lockheed Martin Corporation filed by Defendant Lockheed Martin Corporation (Davidson, Africa) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 06/06 4:48 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Davidson, Africa) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 06/06 4:46 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior, case number 24STCV11173 Receipt No: ACACDC-37608935 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Attorney Africa E. Davidson added to party Lockheed Martin Corporation(pty:dft))(Davidson, Africa) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Matthew Towsley, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Kristopher Henry | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Fri 06/07 2:16 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 100, inclusive, Chris Henry, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Matt Townsley. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Peter Tolan. Filed in State Court on 5/3/2024 Submitted with Attachment 1 to Notice of Removal1 (car) |