Edgar White v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03312 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | May 31, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 15, 2024 5:39 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC
|
|
Defendant
E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corp
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Edgar White
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, September 16, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Mon 09/16 5:59 PM
ORDER This Order Relates to: The motion to amend (Dkt. No. 6052 (in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG; (9) in case 2:20-cv-03287-RMG; (10) in case 2:20-cv-03430-RMG; (7) in case 2:21-cv-00812-RMG; (4) in case 2:21-cv-01925-RMG; (4) in case 2:21-cv-03794-RMG; (4) in case 2:21-cv-03984-RMG; (4) in case 2:22-cv-00141-RMG; (4) in case 2:22-cv-00327-RMG; (4) in case 2:22-cv-00954-RMG; (4) in case 2:22-cv-01346-RMG; (4) in case 2:22-cv-01563-RMG; (4) in case 2:22-cv-02506-RMG; (4) in case 2:22-cv-03461-RMG; (4) in case 2:22-cv-03706-RMG; (4) in case 2:22-cv-04237-RMG; (4) in case 2:22-cv-04487-RMG; (4) in case 2:22-cv-04675-RMG; (4) in case 2:23-cv-00300-RMG; (4) in case 2:23-cv-00414-RMG; (4) in case 2:23-cv-00524-RMG; (4) in case 2:23-cv-02279-RMG; (4) in case 2:23-cv-03002-RMG; (4) in case 2:23-cv-05119-RMG; (4) in case 2:23-cv-06123-RMG; (4) in case 2:24-cv-00035-RMG; (4) in case 2:24-cv-00769-RMG; (4) in case 2:24-cv-01581-RMG; (4) in case 2:24-cv-03312-RMG) is GRANTED and Plaintiffs are directed to promptly file the amended complaint. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 9/16/2024.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
|
Monday, September 09, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Amend/Correct
Mon 09/09 4:24 PM
First MOTION to Amend/Correct by Cheryl Rhodes, Alan Stevens, Ken See, Rickey Bone, Woody Walters, Larry Carbo, Ronnie McClung, George Craycraft, Nancy Taylor, Garfield Williams, Jeffrey Cole, Roger Vines, Leonard Schwarz, Richard Price, Edgar White, James Bonar, Andrea Foster, Steven Gallegos, Kenneth Wehr, Jerome Murphy, Warren Jones, Elliot Stepteaux, Lon Holliday, Jr, Philip Gilbert, Lucille Allee, George Monaghan. Response to Motion due by 9/23/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Zgoda, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Memo in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Redlined Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Redlined Amended complaint, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Redlined Amended complaint, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit Redlined Amended complaint, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit Redlined Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit Redlined Amended Compalint, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit Redlined Amended complaint, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit Redlined Amended complaint, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit Redline Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 21 Exhibit Redlined Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 22 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 23 Exhibit Redlined Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 24 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 25 Exhibit Redlined Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 26 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 27 Exhibit Redlined Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 28 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 29 Exhibit Redlined Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 30 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 31 Exhibit Redlined amended complaint, | ||
Att: 32 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 33 Exhibit Redlined Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 34 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 35 Exhibit Redlined Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 36 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 37 Exhibit Redlined Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 38 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 39 Exhibit Redlined Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 40 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 41 Exhibit Redlined Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 42 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 43 Exhibit Redlined amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 44 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 45 Exhibit Redlined Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 46 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 47 Exhibit Redlined Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 48 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 49 Exhibit Redlined Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 50 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 51 Exhibit Redlined Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 52 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 53 Exhibit Redlined Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 54 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 55 Exhibit Redlined Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 56 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 57 Exhibit Redlined Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 58 Exhibit | ||
Monday, June 24, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Mon 06/24 4:04 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) (associated as of 5/31/2024), Edgar White v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-03312-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Middle Florida (sshe, ) |
|
Thursday, June 06, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 06/06 2:26 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jbin, ) |
|
Friday, May 31, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
39
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 06/06 2:25 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $405 receipt number ASCDC-11798886.), filed by Edgar White. Service due by 8/29/2024 (jbin, ) |