Richard Geiss v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03315 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | May 31, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 15, 2024 5:40 AM EDT |
Defendant
PBI Performance Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Products USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
Innotex Corp
|
|
Defendant
Johnson Controls Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
LN Curtis & Sons
|
|
Defendant
Lion Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
Mallory Safety and Supply LLC
|
|
Defendant
Milliken & Company
|
|
Defendant
Municipal Emergency Services Inc
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Defendant
Perimeter Solutions LP
|
|
Defendant
Safety Components Fabric Technologies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Southern Mills Inc
|
|
Defendant
Stedfast USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Veridian Limited
|
|
Defendant
W.L. Gore & Associates Inc
|
|
Defendant
Fire-Dex LLC
|
|
Defendant
Allstar Fire Equipment Co
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
CB Garment Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Fire & Security Americas Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Incorporated
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corp
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Daikin America Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
DuPont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
EIDP Inc
|
|
Defendant
Fire Service Plus Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Richard Geiss
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, June 26, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Wed 06/26 1:25 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) (associated as of 5/31/2024), Richard Geiss v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-03315-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Eastern Pennsylvania (CLERK'S NOTICE: This event was originally misfiled on 6/24/2024 in the wrong member case, 2:24-cv-03115-RMG, and has since been removed; refiled in the correct member case this date) (sshe, ) |
|
Thursday, June 06, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 06/06 10:29 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jbin, ) |
|
Friday, May 31, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
54
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 06/06 10:28 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $405 receipt number ASCDC-11799015.), filed by Richard Geiss. Service due by 8/29/2024 (jbin, ) |